EP1703345 - Decentral reaction to cam-axis errors [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.03.2011 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.10.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 06.11.2013 [2013/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Bosch Rexroth AG Heidehofstrasse 31 70184 Stuttgart / DE | [2006/38] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Rüpel, Wolfgang Spessartstrasse 28 97833 Frammersbach / DE | 02 /
Schultze, Stephan Glöserwiesenweg 4 97816 Lohr am Main / DE | [2006/38] | Application number, filing date | 06002027.8 | 01.02.2006 | [2006/38] | Priority number, date | DE20051012024 | 16.03.2005 Original published format: DE102005012024 | [2006/38] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1703345 | Date: | 20.09.2006 | Language: | DE | [2006/38] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1703345 | Date: | 23.07.2008 | [2008/30] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1703345 | Date: | 05.05.2010 | Language: | DE | [2010/18] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.06.2008 | Classification | IPC: | G05B19/042 | [2006/38] | CPC: |
G05B19/4062 (EP,US);
G05B2219/42277 (EP,US);
G05B2219/42287 (EP,US);
G05B2219/42313 (EP,US);
G05B2219/43174 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/38] | Title | German: | Dezentrale Fehlerreaktion bei Kurvenscheibenachsen | [2006/38] | English: | Decentral reaction to cam-axis errors | [2006/38] | French: | Réaction décentralisée à une erreur sur un axe d'une came | [2006/38] | Examination procedure | 23.01.2009 | Examination requested [2009/11] | 27.02.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.06.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.10.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.01.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 27.01.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 08.02.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/15] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.02.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 01.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 05.05.2010 | CZ | 05.05.2010 | DK | 05.05.2010 | EE | 05.05.2010 | FI | 05.05.2010 | HU | 05.05.2010 | IE | 05.05.2010 | LT | 05.05.2010 | LV | 05.05.2010 | NL | 05.05.2010 | PL | 05.05.2010 | RO | 05.05.2010 | SE | 05.05.2010 | SI | 05.05.2010 | SK | 05.05.2010 | TR | 05.05.2010 | BG | 05.08.2010 | GR | 06.08.2010 | ES | 16.08.2010 | IS | 05.09.2010 | PT | 06.09.2010 | AT | 01.02.2011 | LU | 01.02.2011 | [2013/45] |
Former [2013/44] | CY | 05.05.2010 | |
CZ | 05.05.2010 | ||
DK | 05.05.2010 | ||
EE | 05.05.2010 | ||
FI | 05.05.2010 | ||
IE | 05.05.2010 | ||
LT | 05.05.2010 | ||
LV | 05.05.2010 | ||
NL | 05.05.2010 | ||
PL | 05.05.2010 | ||
RO | 05.05.2010 | ||
SE | 05.05.2010 | ||
SI | 05.05.2010 | ||
SK | 05.05.2010 | ||
TR | 05.05.2010 | ||
BG | 05.08.2010 | ||
GR | 06.08.2010 | ||
ES | 16.08.2010 | ||
IS | 05.09.2010 | ||
PT | 06.09.2010 | ||
AT | 01.02.2011 | ||
LU | 01.02.2011 | ||
Former [2013/42] | CY | 05.05.2010 | |
CZ | 05.05.2010 | ||
DK | 05.05.2010 | ||
EE | 05.05.2010 | ||
FI | 05.05.2010 | ||
IE | 05.05.2010 | ||
LT | 05.05.2010 | ||
LV | 05.05.2010 | ||
NL | 05.05.2010 | ||
PL | 05.05.2010 | ||
RO | 05.05.2010 | ||
SE | 05.05.2010 | ||
SI | 05.05.2010 | ||
SK | 05.05.2010 | ||
BG | 05.08.2010 | ||
GR | 06.08.2010 | ||
ES | 16.08.2010 | ||
IS | 05.09.2010 | ||
PT | 06.09.2010 | ||
AT | 01.02.2011 | ||
LU | 01.02.2011 | ||
Former [2013/25] | CY | 05.05.2010 | |
CZ | 05.05.2010 | ||
DK | 05.05.2010 | ||
EE | 05.05.2010 | ||
FI | 05.05.2010 | ||
IE | 05.05.2010 | ||
LT | 05.05.2010 | ||
LV | 05.05.2010 | ||
NL | 05.05.2010 | ||
PL | 05.05.2010 | ||
RO | 05.05.2010 | ||
SE | 05.05.2010 | ||
SI | 05.05.2010 | ||
SK | 05.05.2010 | ||
GR | 06.08.2010 | ||
ES | 16.08.2010 | ||
IS | 05.09.2010 | ||
PT | 06.09.2010 | ||
AT | 01.02.2011 | ||
LU | 01.02.2011 | ||
Former [2013/07] | CY | 05.05.2010 | |
CZ | 05.05.2010 | ||
DK | 05.05.2010 | ||
EE | 05.05.2010 | ||
FI | 05.05.2010 | ||
IE | 05.05.2010 | ||
LT | 05.05.2010 | ||
LV | 05.05.2010 | ||
NL | 05.05.2010 | ||
PL | 05.05.2010 | ||
RO | 05.05.2010 | ||
SE | 05.05.2010 | ||
SI | 05.05.2010 | ||
SK | 05.05.2010 | ||
GR | 06.08.2010 | ||
ES | 16.08.2010 | ||
IS | 05.09.2010 | ||
PT | 06.09.2010 | ||
AT | 01.02.2011 | ||
Former [2011/12] | CY | 05.05.2010 | |
CZ | 05.05.2010 | ||
DK | 05.05.2010 | ||
EE | 05.05.2010 | ||
FI | 05.05.2010 | ||
IE | 05.05.2010 | ||
LT | 05.05.2010 | ||
LV | 05.05.2010 | ||
NL | 05.05.2010 | ||
PL | 05.05.2010 | ||
RO | 05.05.2010 | ||
SE | 05.05.2010 | ||
SI | 05.05.2010 | ||
SK | 05.05.2010 | ||
GR | 06.08.2010 | ||
ES | 16.08.2010 | ||
IS | 05.09.2010 | ||
PT | 06.09.2010 | ||
Former [2011/08] | CY | 05.05.2010 | |
DK | 05.05.2010 | ||
EE | 05.05.2010 | ||
FI | 05.05.2010 | ||
IE | 05.05.2010 | ||
LT | 05.05.2010 | ||
LV | 05.05.2010 | ||
NL | 05.05.2010 | ||
PL | 05.05.2010 | ||
SE | 05.05.2010 | ||
SI | 05.05.2010 | ||
GR | 06.08.2010 | ||
ES | 16.08.2010 | ||
IS | 05.09.2010 | ||
PT | 06.09.2010 | ||
Former [2011/03] | CY | 05.05.2010 | |
FI | 05.05.2010 | ||
LT | 05.05.2010 | ||
LV | 05.05.2010 | ||
NL | 05.05.2010 | ||
PL | 05.05.2010 | ||
SE | 05.05.2010 | ||
SI | 05.05.2010 | ||
GR | 06.08.2010 | ||
ES | 16.08.2010 | ||
IS | 05.09.2010 | ||
Former [2011/02] | FI | 05.05.2010 | |
LT | 05.05.2010 | ||
LV | 05.05.2010 | ||
NL | 05.05.2010 | ||
SE | 05.05.2010 | ||
SI | 05.05.2010 | ||
GR | 06.08.2010 | ||
ES | 16.08.2010 | ||
IS | 05.09.2010 | ||
Former [2010/45] | NL | 05.05.2010 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE19934044 (MANNESMANN AG [DE]) [A] 1-16 * column 3, lines 46-62; figure 3 *; | [PA]EP1600834 (FANUC LTD [JP]) [PA] 1-16* abstract * | by applicant | DE19934044 |