EP1693264 - Pneumatic brake booster with reduced dead zone and master brake cylinder for such a booster [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.06.2010 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.10.2012 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 21.11.2012 [2012/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ROBERT BOSCH GMBH Wernerstrasse 1 70442 Stuttgart / DE | [2006/34] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Anderson, Christ 166 rue Montmartre 75002 Paris / FR | 02 /
Michon, Jean-Pierre 19 rue des Sources 77178 Saint Pathus / FR | 03 /
Attard, Jean-Marc 38 Ter Avenue des Acacias 60340 Villers Sous St Leu / FR | 04 /
Sprocq, Raynald 15 rue des Bourguignons 77450 Esbly / FR | [2006/34] | Representative(s) | Hurwic, Aleksander Wiktor, et al Bosch Systèmes de Freinage Service Brevets 126, rue de Stalingrad 93700 Drancy / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2006/34] | Hurwic, Aleksander Wiktor, et al Bosch Systèmes de Freinage, 126, rue de Stalingrad 93700 Drancy / FR | Application number, filing date | 06002110.2 | 02.02.2006 | [2006/34] | Priority number, date | FR20050001811 | 18.02.2005 Original published format: FR 0501811 | [2006/34] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1693264 | Date: | 23.08.2006 | Language: | FR | [2006/34] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1693264 | Date: | 19.08.2009 | Language: | FR | [2009/34] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.06.2006 | Classification | IPC: | B60T13/565, B60T13/57 | [2006/34] | CPC: |
B60T13/565 (EP);
B60T13/57 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/34] | Title | German: | Pneumatischer Bremskraftverstärker mit reduziertem Todweg und Hauptbremszylinder für einen solchen Verstärker | [2006/34] | English: | Pneumatic brake booster with reduced dead zone and master brake cylinder for such a booster | [2006/34] | French: | Servomoteur d'assistance pneumatique au freinage a course morte reduite et maître-cylindre de freinage pour un tel servomoteur | [2006/34] | Examination procedure | 23.02.2007 | Examination requested [2007/15] | 24.04.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.07.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 09.07.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 20.05.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.02.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 19.08.2009 | CY | 19.08.2009 | CZ | 19.08.2009 | DK | 19.08.2009 | EE | 19.08.2009 | FI | 19.08.2009 | IE | 19.08.2009 | IT | 19.08.2009 | LT | 19.08.2009 | LV | 19.08.2009 | NL | 19.08.2009 | PL | 19.08.2009 | RO | 19.08.2009 | SE | 19.08.2009 | SI | 19.08.2009 | SK | 19.08.2009 | TR | 19.08.2009 | BG | 19.11.2009 | GR | 20.11.2009 | ES | 30.11.2009 | IS | 19.12.2009 | PT | 21.12.2009 | LU | 02.02.2010 | HU | 20.02.2010 | BE | 28.02.2010 | CH | 28.02.2010 | LI | 28.02.2010 | MC | 01.03.2010 | [2012/47] |
Former [2012/43] | AT | 19.08.2009 | |
CY | 19.08.2009 | ||
CZ | 19.08.2009 | ||
DK | 19.08.2009 | ||
EE | 19.08.2009 | ||
FI | 19.08.2009 | ||
IE | 19.08.2009 | ||
IT | 19.08.2009 | ||
LT | 19.08.2009 | ||
LV | 19.08.2009 | ||
NL | 19.08.2009 | ||
PL | 19.08.2009 | ||
RO | 19.08.2009 | ||
SE | 19.08.2009 | ||
SI | 19.08.2009 | ||
SK | 19.08.2009 | ||
BG | 19.11.2009 | ||
GR | 20.11.2009 | ||
ES | 30.11.2009 | ||
IS | 19.12.2009 | ||
PT | 21.12.2009 | ||
LU | 02.02.2010 | ||
HU | 20.02.2010 | ||
BE | 28.02.2010 | ||
CH | 28.02.2010 | ||
LI | 28.02.2010 | ||
MC | 01.03.2010 | ||
Former [2012/42] | AT | 19.08.2009 | |
CY | 19.08.2009 | ||
CZ | 19.08.2009 | ||
DK | 19.08.2009 | ||
EE | 19.08.2009 | ||
FI | 19.08.2009 | ||
IE | 19.08.2009 | ||
IT | 19.08.2009 | ||
LT | 19.08.2009 | ||
LV | 19.08.2009 | ||
NL | 19.08.2009 | ||
PL | 19.08.2009 | ||
RO | 19.08.2009 | ||
SE | 19.08.2009 | ||
SI | 19.08.2009 | ||
SK | 19.08.2009 | ||
BG | 19.11.2009 | ||
GR | 20.11.2009 | ||
ES | 30.11.2009 | ||
IS | 19.12.2009 | ||
PT | 21.12.2009 | ||
HU | 20.02.2010 | ||
BE | 28.02.2010 | ||
CH | 28.02.2010 | ||
LI | 28.02.2010 | ||
MC | 01.03.2010 | ||
Former [2011/16] | AT | 19.08.2009 | |
CY | 19.08.2009 | ||
CZ | 19.08.2009 | ||
DK | 19.08.2009 | ||
EE | 19.08.2009 | ||
FI | 19.08.2009 | ||
IE | 19.08.2009 | ||
IT | 19.08.2009 | ||
LT | 19.08.2009 | ||
LV | 19.08.2009 | ||
NL | 19.08.2009 | ||
PL | 19.08.2009 | ||
RO | 19.08.2009 | ||
SE | 19.08.2009 | ||
SI | 19.08.2009 | ||
SK | 19.08.2009 | ||
BG | 19.11.2009 | ||
GR | 20.11.2009 | ||
ES | 30.11.2009 | ||
IS | 19.12.2009 | ||
PT | 21.12.2009 | ||
BE | 28.02.2010 | ||
CH | 28.02.2010 | ||
LI | 28.02.2010 | ||
MC | 01.03.2010 | ||
Former [2011/02] | AT | 19.08.2009 | |
CY | 19.08.2009 | ||
CZ | 19.08.2009 | ||
DK | 19.08.2009 | ||
EE | 19.08.2009 | ||
FI | 19.08.2009 | ||
IE | 19.08.2009 | ||
LT | 19.08.2009 | ||
LV | 19.08.2009 | ||
NL | 19.08.2009 | ||
PL | 19.08.2009 | ||
RO | 19.08.2009 | ||
SE | 19.08.2009 | ||
SI | 19.08.2009 | ||
SK | 19.08.2009 | ||
BG | 19.11.2009 | ||
GR | 20.11.2009 | ||
ES | 30.11.2009 | ||
IS | 19.12.2009 | ||
PT | 21.12.2009 | ||
CH | 28.02.2010 | ||
LI | 28.02.2010 | ||
MC | 01.03.2010 | ||
Former [2010/25] | AT | 19.08.2009 | |
CY | 19.08.2009 | ||
CZ | 19.08.2009 | ||
DK | 19.08.2009 | ||
EE | 19.08.2009 | ||
FI | 19.08.2009 | ||
IE | 19.08.2009 | ||
LT | 19.08.2009 | ||
LV | 19.08.2009 | ||
NL | 19.08.2009 | ||
PL | 19.08.2009 | ||
RO | 19.08.2009 | ||
SE | 19.08.2009 | ||
SI | 19.08.2009 | ||
SK | 19.08.2009 | ||
BG | 19.11.2009 | ||
ES | 30.11.2009 | ||
IS | 19.12.2009 | ||
PT | 21.12.2009 | ||
Former [2010/20] | AT | 19.08.2009 | |
CY | 19.08.2009 | ||
DK | 19.08.2009 | ||
EE | 19.08.2009 | ||
FI | 19.08.2009 | ||
IE | 19.08.2009 | ||
LT | 19.08.2009 | ||
LV | 19.08.2009 | ||
NL | 19.08.2009 | ||
PL | 19.08.2009 | ||
SE | 19.08.2009 | ||
SI | 19.08.2009 | ||
BG | 19.11.2009 | ||
ES | 30.11.2009 | ||
IS | 19.12.2009 | ||
PT | 21.12.2009 | ||
Former [2010/17] | AT | 19.08.2009 | |
CY | 19.08.2009 | ||
FI | 19.08.2009 | ||
LT | 19.08.2009 | ||
LV | 19.08.2009 | ||
NL | 19.08.2009 | ||
PL | 19.08.2009 | ||
SE | 19.08.2009 | ||
SI | 19.08.2009 | ||
BG | 19.11.2009 | ||
ES | 30.11.2009 | ||
IS | 19.12.2009 | ||
PT | 21.12.2009 | ||
Former [2010/16] | AT | 19.08.2009 | |
CY | 19.08.2009 | ||
FI | 19.08.2009 | ||
LT | 19.08.2009 | ||
LV | 19.08.2009 | ||
NL | 19.08.2009 | ||
PL | 19.08.2009 | ||
SE | 19.08.2009 | ||
SI | 19.08.2009 | ||
ES | 30.11.2009 | ||
IS | 19.12.2009 | ||
PT | 21.12.2009 | ||
Former [2010/13] | AT | 19.08.2009 | |
FI | 19.08.2009 | ||
LT | 19.08.2009 | ||
LV | 19.08.2009 | ||
NL | 19.08.2009 | ||
PL | 19.08.2009 | ||
SE | 19.08.2009 | ||
SI | 19.08.2009 | ||
ES | 30.11.2009 | ||
IS | 19.12.2009 | Documents cited: | Search | [DA]FR2696143 (ALLIEDSIGNAL EUROP SERVICES [FR]) [DA] 1* abstract *; | [A]US6467390 (HARTH RALF [DE], et al) [A] 1-10 * column 1, line 1 - column 4, line 33 *; | [A]FR2824036 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [A] 1-10 * page 1, line 1 - page 3, line 31; figure 1 *; | [DA]FR2856363 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [DA] 1 * abstract * | by applicant | FR2696143 | FR2856363 |