EP1659543 - Security system and portable device usable therein [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.02.2011 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.02.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 23.03.2011 [2011/12] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KABUSHIKI KAISHA TOKAI RIKA DENKI SEISAKUSHO 260, Toyota 3-chome Ohguchi-cho Niwa-gun Aichi 480-0195 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2006/21] | For all designated states KABUSHIKI KAISHA TOKAI RIKA DENKI SEISAKUSHO 260, Toyota 3-chome, Ohguchi-cho Niwa-gun Aichi 480-0195 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Okada, Hirofumi c/o KK TOKAI RIKA DENKI SEISAKUSHO 260, Toyota 3-chome,Ohguchi-cho Niwa-gun, Aichi 480-0195 / JP | [2006/21] | Representative(s) | Skuhra, Udo ATTENTION: ADDRESS INACTIVE - USE ASS-NR - CDR / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/33] | Skuhra, Udo Reinhard-Skuhra-Weise & Partner GbR Patentanwälte Friedrichstrasse 31 80801 München / DE | ||
Former [2006/21] | Skuhra, Udo Reinhard-Skuhra-Weise & Partner GbR Patentanwälte Postfach 44 01 51 80750 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 06002455.1 | 10.12.2003 | [2006/21] | Priority number, date | JP20020359039 | 11.12.2002 Original published format: JP 2002359039 | [2006/21] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1659543 | Date: | 24.05.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/21] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1659543 | Date: | 31.05.2006 | [2006/22] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1659543 | Date: | 14.04.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/15] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.04.2006 | Classification | IPC: | G07C9/00, B60R25/00 | [2006/22] | CPC: |
B60R25/24 (EP,US);
B60R25/243 (EP,US);
E05B19/0082 (EP,US);
G07C9/00309 (EP,US);
G07C9/00944 (EP,US);
G07C2009/00952 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2006/21] | G07C9/00 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2007/06] |
Former [2006/21] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Sicherheitssystem und darin verwendete tragbare Vorrichtung | [2006/21] | English: | Security system and portable device usable therein | [2006/21] | French: | Système de sécurité et dispositif portable utilisable au sein de celui-ci | [2006/21] | Examination procedure | 16.06.2006 | Examination requested [2006/31] | 08.08.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 08.02.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.10.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 23.04.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.08.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.10.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.12.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.02.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 19.02.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP03028520.9 / EP1429294 | Opposition(s) | 17.01.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.12.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.12.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.12.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.12.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US6275141 (WALTER GERHARD [US]) [Y] 1-6 * abstract * * column 2, line 63 - column 3, line 52 * * column 9, line 58 - column 10, line 22 *; | [Y]WO0120110 (KIEKERT AG [DE], et al) [Y] 1-6 * abstract * * page 3, line 5 - line 29 * * page 5, line 10 - line 21 *; | [A]EP0987389 (VALEO ELECTRONIQUE [FR]) [A] 1-6 * the whole document * | by applicant | JP2002247656 | WO0120110 |