EP1688088 - Monitoring system used in health care [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 23.01.2009 Database last updated on 01.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.01.2009 | Refusal of application | published on 25.02.2009 [2009/09] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Aipermon GmbH & Co. KG Zamdorfer Strasse 100 81677 München / DE | [2007/33] |
Former [2006/32] | For all designated states Actimon GmbH & Co. KG Otto-Hahn-Strasse 3 69190 Walldorf / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Wegertseder, Dominik Dr.-Mach-Strasse 105 85540 Haar / DE | 02 /
Schweizer, Thomas Forstinningerstrasse 60 85560 Ebersberg / DE | [2006/32] | Representative(s) | Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte PartG mbB Friedenheimer Brücke 21 80639 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2006/32] | Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte Grafinger Strasse 2 81671 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 06002500.4 | 07.02.2006 | [2006/32] | Priority number, date | DE20051005632 | 08.02.2005 Original published format: DE102005005632 | [2006/32] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1688088 | Date: | 09.08.2006 | Language: | DE | [2006/32] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.06.2006 | Classification | IPC: | A61B5/00, G06F19/00 | [2006/32] | CPC: |
A61B5/721 (EP);
A61B5/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/32] | Title | German: | Datenerfassungseinrichtung zur Erfassung von physiologischen Parametern | [2006/32] | English: | Monitoring system used in health care | [2006/32] | French: | Système pour la mesure des paramètres physiologiques | [2006/32] | Examination procedure | 14.09.2006 | Examination requested [2006/43] | 17.11.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 19.03.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.05.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 30.11.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.09.2008 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 30.09.2008 | 23.09.2008 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 30.09.2008 | Date of oral proceedings | 30.09.2008 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 01.10.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2009/09] | 11.10.2008 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2009/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.02.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2003004403 (DRINAN DARREL [US], et al) [X] 1-11 * page 4, paragraph 52 * * page 5, paragraph 65 * * page 6, paragraph 70 * * page 9, paragraph 96 * * page 9, paragraph 100 * * page 10, paragraph 106 * * page 11, paragraph 118 * * claim 1 * * claim 50 * * claims 65-71 *; | [X]EP1363224 (MICROLIFE INTELLECTUAL PROP [CH]) [X] 1-11 * abstract *; | [X] - REIDY S., "IBM Mobile Health Toolkit", (200410), URL: http://www-5.ibm.com/services/ch/bcs/bcsserv/on_demand_innovation/download_odis/mobile_health_toolkit.pdf, (20060524), XP002374023 [X] 1-11 * page 2 - page 9 * | [A] - LIND L ET AL, "Requirements and prototyping of a home health care application based on emerging java technology", INTERNATIONAL JOURNAL OF MEDICAL INFORMATICS, ELSEVIER SCIENTIFIC PUBLISHERS, SHANNON, IR, (20021218), vol. 68, no. 1-3, ISSN 1386-5056, pages 129 - 139, XP004396924 [A] 1-11 * page 112, paragraphs 2.3-2.5 * * page 136, paragraph 4.1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S1386-5056(02)00071-0 |