EP1727395 - Method and apparatus for charging hearing aids inductively [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.06.2009 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.09.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, TR | published on 02.11.2011 [2011/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Audia Akustik GmbH Franz-Mehring-Strasse 13 99610 Sömmerda / DE | [2006/48] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Steinbrecher, Helmut Albert-Träger-Strasse 2 99625 Kölleda / DE | 02 /
Kupper, Lutz Bahnhofstrasse 1 99636 Ostramondra / DE | 03 /
Panitzsch, Frank Rote Erde 10 99625 Burgwenden / DE | [2006/48] | Representative(s) | Liedtke, Klaus Liedtke & Partner Patentanwälte Gerhart-Hauptmann-Strasse 10-11 99096 Erfurt / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2006/48] | Liedtke, Klaus Liedtke & Partner Patentanwälte Elisabethstrasse 10 99096 Erfurt / DE | Application number, filing date | 06002561.6 | 08.02.2006 | [2006/48] | Priority number, date | DE20051024227 | 25.05.2005 Original published format: DE102005024227 | [2006/48] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1727395 | Date: | 29.11.2006 | Language: | DE | [2006/48] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1727395 | Date: | 18.07.2007 | [2007/29] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1727395 | Date: | 20.08.2008 | Language: | DE | [2008/34] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.06.2007 | Classification | IPC: | H04R25/00 | [2006/48] | CPC: |
H04R25/30 (EP,US);
H02J50/10 (EP,US);
H02J50/80 (EP,US);
H02J7/0044 (EP,US);
H02J7/35 (EP);
H04R2225/33 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/48] | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zum induktiven Laden von Hörgeräten | [2006/48] | English: | Method and apparatus for charging hearing aids inductively | [2006/48] | French: | Procédé et dispositif pour le chargement de prothèses auditives de manière inductive | [2006/48] | Examination procedure | 23.03.2007 | Examination requested [2007/18] | 17.01.2008 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 25.04.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.07.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 01.07.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 25.05.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.12.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 20.08.2008 | CZ | 20.08.2008 | EE | 20.08.2008 | FI | 20.08.2008 | IE | 20.08.2008 | LT | 20.08.2008 | LV | 20.08.2008 | PL | 20.08.2008 | RO | 20.08.2008 | SI | 20.08.2008 | SK | 20.08.2008 | TR | 20.08.2008 | BG | 20.11.2008 | GR | 21.11.2008 | IS | 20.12.2008 | PT | 20.01.2009 | LU | 08.02.2009 | HU | 21.02.2009 | BE | 28.02.2009 | MC | 28.02.2009 | [2011/43] |
Former [2011/32] | CZ | 20.08.2008 | |
EE | 20.08.2008 | ||
FI | 20.08.2008 | ||
IE | 20.08.2008 | ||
LT | 20.08.2008 | ||
LV | 20.08.2008 | ||
PL | 20.08.2008 | ||
RO | 20.08.2008 | ||
SI | 20.08.2008 | ||
SK | 20.08.2008 | ||
BG | 20.11.2008 | ||
GR | 21.11.2008 | ||
IS | 20.12.2008 | ||
PT | 20.01.2009 | ||
LU | 08.02.2009 | ||
HU | 21.02.2009 | ||
BE | 28.02.2009 | ||
MC | 28.02.2009 | ||
Former [2011/22] | CZ | 20.08.2008 | |
EE | 20.08.2008 | ||
FI | 20.08.2008 | ||
IE | 20.08.2008 | ||
LT | 20.08.2008 | ||
LV | 20.08.2008 | ||
PL | 20.08.2008 | ||
RO | 20.08.2008 | ||
SI | 20.08.2008 | ||
SK | 20.08.2008 | ||
BG | 20.11.2008 | ||
GR | 21.11.2008 | ||
IS | 20.12.2008 | ||
PT | 20.01.2009 | ||
LU | 08.02.2009 | ||
BE | 28.02.2009 | ||
MC | 28.02.2009 | ||
Former [2011/02] | CZ | 20.08.2008 | |
EE | 20.08.2008 | ||
FI | 20.08.2008 | ||
IE | 20.08.2008 | ||
LT | 20.08.2008 | ||
LV | 20.08.2008 | ||
PL | 20.08.2008 | ||
RO | 20.08.2008 | ||
SI | 20.08.2008 | ||
SK | 20.08.2008 | ||
BG | 20.11.2008 | ||
GR | 21.11.2008 | ||
IS | 20.12.2008 | ||
PT | 20.01.2009 | ||
BE | 28.02.2009 | ||
MC | 28.02.2009 | ||
Former [2010/25] | CZ | 20.08.2008 | |
EE | 20.08.2008 | ||
FI | 20.08.2008 | ||
IE | 20.08.2008 | ||
LT | 20.08.2008 | ||
LV | 20.08.2008 | ||
PL | 20.08.2008 | ||
RO | 20.08.2008 | ||
SI | 20.08.2008 | ||
SK | 20.08.2008 | ||
BG | 20.11.2008 | ||
IS | 20.12.2008 | ||
PT | 20.01.2009 | ||
BE | 28.02.2009 | ||
MC | 28.02.2009 | ||
Former [2010/13] | CZ | 20.08.2008 | |
EE | 20.08.2008 | ||
FI | 20.08.2008 | ||
IE | 20.08.2008 | ||
LT | 20.08.2008 | ||
LV | 20.08.2008 | ||
RO | 20.08.2008 | ||
SI | 20.08.2008 | ||
SK | 20.08.2008 | ||
BG | 20.11.2008 | ||
IS | 20.12.2008 | ||
PT | 20.01.2009 | ||
BE | 28.02.2009 | ||
MC | 28.02.2009 | ||
Former [2010/01] | CZ | 20.08.2008 | |
EE | 20.08.2008 | ||
FI | 20.08.2008 | ||
IE | 20.08.2008 | ||
LT | 20.08.2008 | ||
LV | 20.08.2008 | ||
RO | 20.08.2008 | ||
SI | 20.08.2008 | ||
SK | 20.08.2008 | ||
BG | 20.11.2008 | ||
IS | 20.12.2008 | ||
PT | 20.01.2009 | ||
MC | 28.02.2009 | ||
Former [2009/28] | CZ | 20.08.2008 | |
FI | 20.08.2008 | ||
IE | 20.08.2008 | ||
LT | 20.08.2008 | ||
LV | 20.08.2008 | ||
RO | 20.08.2008 | ||
SI | 20.08.2008 | ||
SK | 20.08.2008 | ||
BG | 20.11.2008 | ||
IS | 20.12.2008 | ||
PT | 20.01.2009 | ||
Former [2009/15] | FI | 20.08.2008 | |
LT | 20.08.2008 | ||
LV | 20.08.2008 | ||
SI | 20.08.2008 | ||
IS | 20.12.2008 | ||
Former [2009/10] | LT | 20.08.2008 | |
IS | 20.12.2008 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4379988 (MATTATALL PATRICIO [US]) [A] 1-21 * column 1, line 5 - column 2, line 43 * * column 3, line 1 - column 5, line 26 *; | [A]DE29718104U (AUDIA AKUSTIK GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-21* page 1, line 1 - page 7, line 2 *; | [DY]EP0909113 (ACOUSTICON HOERSYSTEME GMBH [DE]) [DY] 1-21 * paragraph [0001] - paragraph [0012] * * paragraph [0015] - paragraph [0016] *; | [Y]EP0984541 (ERICSSON INC [US]) [Y] 1-21 * paragraph [0001] - paragraph [0015] * * paragraph [0018] - paragraph [0045] *; | [Y]US6291968 (NANTZ JOHN S [US], et al) [Y] 1-21 * column 1, line 5 - column 4, line 29 * | by applicant | DE19745101 |