EP1661487 - Toothbrush and method for production of such a toothbrush [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent maintained as amended Status updated on 25.02.2022 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.06.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 27.07.2022 [2022/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Trisa Holding AG Kantonsstrasse 6234 Triengen / CH | [2006/22] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Fischer, Franz Bätzenmoos 6234 Triegen / CH | 02 /
Strähler, Reto Kehlhofhöhe 3 6034 Adligenswil / CH | [2006/22] | Representative(s) | Schaad, Balass, Menzl & Partner AG Bellerivestrasse 20 Postfach 8034 Zürich / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2022/13] | Schaad, Balass, Menzl & Partner AG Dufourstrasse 101 Postfach 8034 Zürich / CH | ||
Former [2006/22] | Schaad, Balass, Menzl & Partner AG Dufourstrasse 101 Postfach 8034 Zürich / CH | Application number, filing date | 06002599.6 | 20.12.2002 | [2006/22] | Priority number, date | DE20011064336 | 28.12.2001 Original published format: DE 10164336 | [2006/22] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1661487 | Date: | 31.05.2006 | Language: | DE | [2006/22] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1661487 | Date: | 11.02.2009 | Language: | DE | [2009/07] | Type: | B2 New European patent specification | No.: | EP1661487 | Date: | 30.03.2022 | Language: | DE | [2022/13] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.04.2006 | Classification | IPC: | A46B9/06, A46B15/00 | [2006/22] | CPC: |
A46B9/06 (EP,KR,US);
A46B15/00 (EP,KR,US);
A46B15/0002 (EP,US);
A46B15/0032 (EP,US);
A46B3/06 (EP,US);
A46B7/04 (EP,US);
A46B7/10 (EP);
A46D1/00 (EP,US);
A46D1/0207 (EP);
A46D1/0238 (EP);
A46D3/005 (EP);
A61C17/3436 (EP,US);
A61C17/349 (EP,US);
H04L45/00 (EP,US);
H04L45/22 (EP,US);
H04L45/28 (EP,US);
H04L45/586 (EP,US);
H04L63/0209 (EP,US);
A46B2200/1026 (EP,US);
A46B2200/1066 (EP,US);
A46B9/04 (EP,US);
B29L2031/425 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SI, SK, TR [2022/13] |
Former [2006/22] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Zahnbürste und Verfahren zur Herstellung einer solchen Zahnbürste | [2006/22] | English: | Toothbrush and method for production of such a toothbrush | [2006/22] | French: | Brosse à dents et son procédé de fabrication | [2021/46] |
Former [2006/22] | Brosse a dents et son procede de fabrication | Examination procedure | 29.09.2006 | Examination requested [2006/46] | 21.11.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 31.05.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.06.2007 | Observations by third parties | 13.08.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.12.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 16.12.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP02782626.2 / EP1458261 | Divisional application(s) | EP09000395.5 / EP2060201 | EP10011399.2 / EP2338377 | EP10011550.0 / EP2335519 | EP10011706.8 / EP2335520 | EP14003428.1 / EP2842456 | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
11.11.2009
18.04.2016
WITHDRAWN G.B.Boucherie N.V. Stuivenbergstraat 104-106 8870 Izegem / BE Opponent's representative Prinz & Partner mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Rundfunkplatz 2 80335 München / DE | [2016/21] |
Former [2014/44] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
11.11.2009
19.11.2009
ADMISSIBLE G.B.Boucherie N.V. Stuivenbergstraat 104-106 8870 Izegem / BE Opponent's representative Prinz & Partner mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Rundfunkplatz 2 DE-80335 München / DE | ||
Former [2009/52] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
11.11.2009
19.11.2009
ADMISSIBLE G.B.Boucherie N.V. Stuivenbergstraat 104-106 8870 Izegem / BE Opponent's representative Prinz & Partner Patentanwälte Rundfunkplatz 2 80335 München / DE | 21.12.2009 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 29.06.2010 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 10.10.2013 | Date of oral proceedings | 16.12.2013 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 16.12.2013 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked | 02.10.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M04) | 09.02.2021 | Reply to a communication from the opposition division | 29.06.2021 | Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition | 09.07.2021 | Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition | 21.10.2021 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended | 20.01.2022 | Fee for printing new specification paid | Appeal following opposition | 04.02.2014 | Appeal received No. T0266/14 | 10.04.2014 | Statement of grounds filed | 20.02.2018 | Invitation to file observations in an appeal (Time limit: M02) [2018/08] | 17.04.2018 | Date of receipt of observations in an appeal [2018/16] | 02.07.2018 | Result of appeal procedure: continuation of opposition procedure | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.02.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.02.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.12.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 06.12.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 18.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 11.02.2009 | CZ | 11.02.2009 | DK | 11.02.2009 | EE | 11.02.2009 | FI | 11.02.2009 | SI | 11.02.2009 | SK | 11.02.2009 | BG | 11.05.2009 | GR | 12.05.2009 | PT | 13.07.2009 | AT | 20.12.2009 | LU | 20.12.2009 | MC | 01.07.2010 | TR | 20.12.2017 | SE | 21.12.2017 | [2022/30] |
Former [2018/41] | CY | 11.02.2009 | |
CZ | 11.02.2009 | ||
DK | 11.02.2009 | ||
EE | 11.02.2009 | ||
FI | 11.02.2009 | ||
SI | 11.02.2009 | ||
SK | 11.02.2009 | ||
BG | 11.05.2009 | ||
GR | 12.05.2009 | ||
PT | 13.07.2009 | ||
AT | 20.12.2009 | ||
LU | 20.12.2009 | ||
MC | 01.07.2010 | ||
SE | 21.12.2017 | ||
Former [2015/22] | CY | 11.02.2009 | |
CZ | 11.02.2009 | ||
DK | 11.02.2009 | ||
EE | 11.02.2009 | ||
FI | 11.02.2009 | ||
SI | 11.02.2009 | ||
SK | 11.02.2009 | ||
BG | 11.05.2009 | ||
GR | 12.05.2009 | ||
PT | 13.07.2009 | ||
AT | 20.12.2009 | ||
LU | 20.12.2009 | ||
MC | 01.07.2010 | ||
Former [2011/32] | CZ | 11.02.2009 | |
DK | 11.02.2009 | ||
EE | 11.02.2009 | ||
FI | 11.02.2009 | ||
SI | 11.02.2009 | ||
SK | 11.02.2009 | ||
BG | 11.05.2009 | ||
GR | 12.05.2009 | ||
PT | 13.07.2009 | ||
AT | 20.12.2009 | ||
LU | 20.12.2009 | ||
MC | 01.07.2010 | ||
Former [2011/22] | CZ | 11.02.2009 | |
DK | 11.02.2009 | ||
EE | 11.02.2009 | ||
FI | 11.02.2009 | ||
SI | 11.02.2009 | ||
SK | 11.02.2009 | ||
BG | 11.05.2009 | ||
GR | 12.05.2009 | ||
PT | 13.07.2009 | ||
LU | 20.12.2009 | ||
MC | 01.07.2010 | ||
Former [2011/02] | CZ | 11.02.2009 | |
DK | 11.02.2009 | ||
EE | 11.02.2009 | ||
FI | 11.02.2009 | ||
SI | 11.02.2009 | ||
SK | 11.02.2009 | ||
BG | 11.05.2009 | ||
GR | 12.05.2009 | ||
PT | 13.07.2009 | ||
MC | 01.07.2010 | ||
Former [2010/40] | CZ | 11.02.2009 | |
DK | 11.02.2009 | ||
EE | 11.02.2009 | ||
FI | 11.02.2009 | ||
SI | 11.02.2009 | ||
SK | 11.02.2009 | ||
BG | 11.05.2009 | ||
PT | 13.07.2009 | ||
MC | 01.07.2010 | ||
Former [2010/13] | CZ | 11.02.2009 | |
DK | 11.02.2009 | ||
EE | 11.02.2009 | ||
FI | 11.02.2009 | ||
SI | 11.02.2009 | ||
SK | 11.02.2009 | ||
BG | 11.05.2009 | ||
PT | 13.07.2009 | ||
Former [2010/01] | CZ | 11.02.2009 | |
DK | 11.02.2009 | ||
EE | 11.02.2009 | ||
FI | 11.02.2009 | ||
SI | 11.02.2009 | ||
SK | 11.02.2009 | ||
PT | 13.07.2009 | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]US5802656 (DAWSON PETER LEONARD [GB], et al) [X] 1-10,14-21,23-25 * column 6, line 37 - line 39 * * column 8, line 60 - line 63 * [Y] 11-13,22; | [A]WO0053054 (UNILEVER NV [NL], et al) [A] 22 * page 7, line 10 - line 16 *; | [A]WO0074522 (UNILEVER NV [NL], et al) [A] 4,6* page 4, line 12 - line 19 *; | [Y]DE10047699 (PIETZ HARTFRIED [DE]) [Y] 22 * column 2, line 30 - line 39 *; | [DY]DE20006311U (BOUCHERIE NV G B [BE]) [DY] 11-13 * page 2, line 21 - line 31 * | by applicant | WO0064307 | WO0121036 | other | EP0783850 | WO0121036 | US2001029639 | Opposition | US2042239 | EP0405204 | WO9615696 | WO9620654 | EP0783850 | WO9818364 | EP0972464 | WO0076369 | WO0121036 | DE20006311U | US2001029639 | - mündliche Offenbarung während der Brush Expo Messe vom 9-11 April 2000 |