EP1690512 - Stent-graft delivery system and assembly method [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 21.12.2007 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.09.2008 | Change - applicant | published on 08.10.2008 [2008/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Medtronic Vascular, Inc. 3576 Unocal Place Santa Rosa, CA 95403 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2008/41] | For all designated states Medtronic Vascular, Inc. 3576 Unocal Place Santa Rosa CA 95403 / US | ||
Former [2006/33] | For all designated states Medtronic Vascular, Inc. 3576 Unocal Place Santa Rosa, California 95403 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Rust, Matthew 4900 Fernglen Drive Santa Rosa, CA 95405 / US | [2006/33] | Representative(s) | Zimmermann, Gerd Heinrich, et al Zimmermann & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Postfach 330 920 80069 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/30] | Zimmermann, Gerd Heinrich, et al Zimmermann & Partner Postfach 330 920 80069 München / DE | ||
Former [2006/33] | Zimmermann, Gerd Heinrich, et al Zimmermann & Partner, Postfach 33 09 20 80069 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 06002670.5 | 09.02.2006 | [2006/33] | Priority number, date | US20050056743 | 11.02.2005 Original published format: US 56743 | [2006/33] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1690512 | Date: | 16.08.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/33] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.04.2006 | Classification | IPC: | A61F2/06, A61F2/84 | [2006/33] | CPC: |
A61F2/95 (EP,US);
A61F2/07 (EP,US);
A61F2/89 (EP,US);
A61F2002/075 (EP,US);
A61F2002/9665 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | (deleted) [2007/17] |
Former [2006/33] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zur Einführung eines Stent-Grafts und Herstellungsverfahren dafür | [2006/33] | English: | Stent-graft delivery system and assembly method | [2006/33] | French: | Système de mise en place d'un stent-greffe et méthode d'assemblage associée | [2006/33] | Examination procedure | 17.02.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2008/04] | 03.08.2007 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2008/04] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 26.04.2007 | DE   M01   Not yet paid | 26.04.2007 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | 26.04.2007 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | 26.04.2007 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 26.04.2007 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 26.04.2007 | M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]WO0207795 (GRAYZEL JEFFREY [US], et al) [Y] 1-21 * pages 5,6 * * pages 13-16 * * figures 1,7-10 *; | [Y]EP1300120 (JOMED NV [NL]) [Y] 6,18 * paragraph [0019]; claim 5 *; | [Y]EP1327422 (MEDTRONIC AVE INC [US]) [Y] 16 * paragraph [0009] *; | [XY]US6607551 (SULLIVAN JASON R [US], et al) [X] 1-5,7,8,10,11,13,14,17,21 * column 3 * * column 6, line 63 - column 7, line 8 * * columns 8-11 * * column 12, line 63 - column 13, line 20 * * figures 3,4 * [Y] 6,9,12,15,16,18-20; | [Y]EP1344548 (JOMED N V [NL]) [Y] 1-21* the whole document *; | [Y]US2004116938 (FORBER SIMON JOHN [FR], et al) [Y] 15 * paragraphs [0024] , [0025]; figures 3,4 *; | [XY]US2004204749 (GUNDERSON RICHARD [US]) [X] 1-3,5,7,11,13,17-21 * paragraphs [0003] , [0015] , [0016] , [0031] - [0043] - [0041] - [0044]; figures 1-3,7; claim 1 * [Y] 4,6,8-10,12,14-16; | [Y]US2004249435 (ANDREAS BERNARD [US], et al) [Y] 1-21 * paragraphs [0012] , [0017] , [0018] , [0033] - [0039] - [0048] , [0049] , [0052] , [0053]; figures 7,8 * |