EP1691588 - Apparatus and method for production of extreme ultraviolet (EUV) radiation [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 21.05.2010 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.05.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 23.06.2010 [2010/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states XTREME technologies GmbH Göschwitzer Strasse 25 07745 Jena / DE | [2006/33] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Gäbel, Kai, Dr. Biberweg 22 07749 Jena / DE | 02 /
Kleinschmidt, Jürgen, Dr. Kalklage 24 37077 Göttingen / DE | [2006/33] | Representative(s) | Freitag, Joachim, et al Patentanwälte Oehmke & Kollegen Neugasse 13 07743 Jena / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/29] | Freitag, Joachim, et al Patentanwälte Oehmke & Kollegen Neugasse 13 07743 Jena / DE | ||
Former [2008/27] | Oehmke, Volker, et al Patentanwälte Oehmke & Kollegen, Neugasse 13 07743 Jena / DE | ||
Former [2006/33] | Bertram, Helmut, et al Patentanwälte OEHMKE & KOLLEGEN Neugasse 13 07743 Jena / DE | Application number, filing date | 06002837.0 | 13.02.2006 | [2006/33] | Priority number, date | DE20051007884 | 15.02.2005 Original published format: DE102005007884 | [2006/33] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1691588 | Date: | 16.08.2006 | Language: | DE | [2006/33] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1691588 | Date: | 27.05.2009 | [2009/22] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.04.2009 | Classification | IPC: | H05G2/00 | [2006/33] | CPC: |
H05G2/003 (EP,US);
H05G2/005 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | (deleted) [2010/05] |
Former [2006/33] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Vorrichtung und Verfahren zur Erzeugung von extrem ultravioletter (EUV-) Strahlung | [2006/33] | English: | Apparatus and method for production of extreme ultraviolet (EUV) radiation | [2006/33] | French: | Dispositif et procédé pour la génération de rayonnement ultraviolet extrême (EUV) | [2006/33] | Examination procedure | 29.12.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2010/25] | 28.01.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2010/25] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.02.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.02.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.02.2010 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3777208 (RYASON P) [A] 1; | [A]US2002070353 (RICHARDSON MARTIN [US]) [A] 1 * figure 2 *; | [A]US2003068012 (AHMAD IMTIAZ [DE], et al) [A] 1; | [A]US2003183787 (IKEUCHI MITSURU [JP]) [A] 1; | [A]US2004105082 (KOSHELEV KONSTANTIN NIKOLAEVIT [RU], et al) [A] 1* figures 17A-E * |