EP1691351 - Disk-shaped magnetic recording medium [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 02.11.2012 Database last updated on 03.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.11.2012 | Withdrawal of application | published on 05.12.2012 [2012/49] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FUJIFILM Corporation 26-30, Nishiazabu 2-chome Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2007/12] | For all designated states FUJIFILM Corporation 26-30, Nishiazabu 2-chome Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | ||
Former [2006/33] | For all designated states FUJI PHOTO FILM CO., LTD. 210 Nakanuma Minami-Ashigara-shi, Kanagawa-ken / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Komatsu, Kazunori 12-1, Ohgi-cho 2-chome Odawara-shi, Kanagawa / JP | 02 /
Wakamatsu, Satoshi 12-1, Ohgi-cho 2-chome Odawara-shi, Kanagawa / JP | [2006/33] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2006/33] | HOFFMANN EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 06002871.9 | 13.02.2006 | [2006/33] | Priority number, date | JP20050036768 | 14.02.2005 Original published format: JP 2005036768 | [2006/33] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1691351 | Date: | 16.08.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/33] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1691351 | Date: | 26.09.2007 | [2007/39] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.08.2007 | Classification | IPC: | G11B5/86, G11B5/596 | [2006/33] | CPC: |
G11B5/59633 (EP,US);
B82Y10/00 (EP,US);
G11B5/743 (EP,US);
G11B5/865 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2008/25] |
Former [2008/23] | |||
Former [2006/33] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Plattenförmiges magnetisches Aufzeichnungsmedium | [2006/33] | English: | Disk-shaped magnetic recording medium | [2006/33] | French: | Support d'enregistrement magnétique sous forme de disque | [2006/33] | Examination procedure | 26.03.2008 | Examination requested [2008/25] | 27.03.2008 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 02.04.2008 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 06.06.2008 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 30.10.2012 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2012/49] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.02.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.02.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.02.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.02.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.02.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JPH11213313 (TOSHIBA CORP) [X] 1* the whole document *; | [X]JP2003257001 (MITSUBISHI CHEM CORP) [X] 1-5 * the whole document *; | [X]EP1347441 (FUJI PHOTO FILM CO LTD [JP]) [X] 1-5 * figure - * * paragraphs [0008] - [0012] * * paragraphs [0027] - [0029] *; | [X]US2004257687 (ISHIDA TATSUAKI [JP], et al) [X] 1,2,5 * figures 5,6 * * paragraphs [0020] , [0021] , [0078] - [0082] * * the whole document * |