31.01.2014 |
Application deemed to be withdrawn |
published on 05.03.2014 [2014/10] |
28.10.2013 |
New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
24.07.2013 |
Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
25.03.2013 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
25.02.2013 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
28.09.2012 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
30.07.2012 |
Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
23.03.2012 |
First examination report |
|
21.03.2012 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
28.02.2012 |
New entry: Decision on request for further processing |
|
25.02.2012 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
24.02.2012 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 28.03.2012 [2012/13] |
24.02.2012 |
Change - designated states |
published on 28.03.2012 [2012/13] |
18.02.2012 |
New entry: Receipt of request for further processing |
|
18.02.2012 |
New entry: Fee payment for request for further processing |
|
14.02.2012 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
29.11.2011 |
New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
25.11.2011 |
Definitive list of designations |
published on 28.12.2011 [2011/52] |
21.10.2011 |
Change - representative |
published on 23.11.2011 [2011/47] |
12.08.2011 |
Change - representative |
published on 14.09.2011 [2011/37] |
18.03.2011 |
Publication of search report |
published on 20.04.2011 [2011/16] |
01.03.2011 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
03.02.2010 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
27.01.2009 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
08.01.2008 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
11.08.2006 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 13.09.2006 [2006/37] |