EP1762455 - Automatic central buffer coupling with an antenna for wireless signal transmission [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Opposition rejected Status updated on 04.11.2011 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.04.2015 | Change - lapse in a contracting state New state(s): CY, TR | published on 27.05.2015 [2015/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Voith Turbo Scharfenberg GmbH & Co. KG Gottfried-Linke-Strasse 205 38239 Salzgitter-Watenstedt / DE | [2007/11] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Prill, Thomas, Dipl.-Ing. Winterstrasse 16 30989 Gehrden / DE | 02 /
Krause, Reiner, Dipl.-Ing. Graugansweg 11 30916 Isernhagen / DE | 03 /
Kraft, Karl-Heinz, Prof. Dr. R.-Wagner-Weg 12 38302 Wolfenbüttel / DE | [2007/11] | Representative(s) | Rupprecht, Kay, et al Meissner Bolte Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Widenmayerstrasse 47 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2007/11] | Rupprecht, Kay, et al Meissner, Bolte & Partner GbR Widenmayerstrasse 48 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 06003184.6 | 16.02.2006 | [2007/11] | Priority number, date | EP20050019569 | 08.09.2005 Original published format: EP 05019569 | [2007/11] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1762455 | Date: | 14.03.2007 | Language: | DE | [2007/11] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1762455 | Date: | 16.07.2008 | Language: | DE | [2008/29] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.01.2007 | Classification | IPC: | B61L15/00, B61G5/10, H01Q1/32 | [2007/11] | CPC: |
B61G5/10 (EP,US);
B61L15/0036 (EP,US);
H01Q1/3233 (EP,US);
H01Q1/325 (EP,US);
H01Q9/40 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/11] | Title | German: | Automatische Mittelpufferkupplung mit einer Antenne zur drahtlosen Signalübertragung | [2007/21] | English: | Automatic central buffer coupling with an antenna for wireless signal transmission | [2007/11] | French: | Attelage automatique central avec une antenne pour la transmission de signaux par voie aerienne | [2007/11] |
Former [2007/11] | Automatische Mittelpufferkupplung mit einer Antenne zur drahtloser Signalübertragung | Examination procedure | 09.02.2007 | Examination requested [2007/12] | 26.03.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.05.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 28.05.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
06.04.2009
21.04.2009
ADMISSIBLE Siemens Aktiengesellschaft Wittelsbacherplatz 2 80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/20] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
06.04.2009
Siemens Aktiengesellschaft Wittelsbacherplatz 2 80333 München / DE | 03.06.2009 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 06.10.2009 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 24.09.2010 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 15.10.2010 | 15.10.2010 | Date of oral proceedings | 22.07.2011 | Date of despatch of rejection of opposition | 01.08.2011 | Legal effect of rejection of opposition [2011/49] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.05.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 29.02.2008 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   09.05.2008 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 16.07.2008 | CZ | 16.07.2008 | DK | 16.07.2008 | EE | 16.07.2008 | FI | 16.07.2008 | IE | 16.07.2008 | IT | 16.07.2008 | LT | 16.07.2008 | LV | 16.07.2008 | NL | 16.07.2008 | RO | 16.07.2008 | SI | 16.07.2008 | SK | 16.07.2008 | TR | 16.07.2008 | BG | 16.10.2008 | SE | 16.10.2008 | GR | 17.10.2008 | ES | 27.10.2008 | IS | 16.11.2008 | PT | 16.12.2008 | HU | 17.01.2009 | LU | 16.02.2009 | BE | 28.02.2009 | MC | 28.02.2009 | FR | 02.03.2009 | [2015/22] |
Former [2011/32] | CZ | 16.07.2008 | |
DK | 16.07.2008 | ||
EE | 16.07.2008 | ||
FI | 16.07.2008 | ||
IE | 16.07.2008 | ||
IT | 16.07.2008 | ||
LT | 16.07.2008 | ||
LV | 16.07.2008 | ||
NL | 16.07.2008 | ||
RO | 16.07.2008 | ||
SI | 16.07.2008 | ||
SK | 16.07.2008 | ||
BG | 16.10.2008 | ||
SE | 16.10.2008 | ||
GR | 17.10.2008 | ||
ES | 27.10.2008 | ||
IS | 16.11.2008 | ||
PT | 16.12.2008 | ||
HU | 17.01.2009 | ||
LU | 16.02.2009 | ||
BE | 28.02.2009 | ||
MC | 28.02.2009 | ||
FR | 02.03.2009 | ||
Former [2011/22] | CZ | 16.07.2008 | |
DK | 16.07.2008 | ||
EE | 16.07.2008 | ||
FI | 16.07.2008 | ||
IE | 16.07.2008 | ||
IT | 16.07.2008 | ||
LT | 16.07.2008 | ||
LV | 16.07.2008 | ||
NL | 16.07.2008 | ||
RO | 16.07.2008 | ||
SI | 16.07.2008 | ||
SK | 16.07.2008 | ||
BG | 16.10.2008 | ||
SE | 16.10.2008 | ||
GR | 17.10.2008 | ||
ES | 27.10.2008 | ||
IS | 16.11.2008 | ||
PT | 16.12.2008 | ||
LU | 16.02.2009 | ||
BE | 28.02.2009 | ||
MC | 28.02.2009 | ||
FR | 02.03.2009 | ||
Former [2011/02] | CZ | 16.07.2008 | |
DK | 16.07.2008 | ||
EE | 16.07.2008 | ||
FI | 16.07.2008 | ||
IE | 16.07.2008 | ||
IT | 16.07.2008 | ||
LT | 16.07.2008 | ||
LV | 16.07.2008 | ||
NL | 16.07.2008 | ||
RO | 16.07.2008 | ||
SI | 16.07.2008 | ||
SK | 16.07.2008 | ||
BG | 16.10.2008 | ||
SE | 16.10.2008 | ||
GR | 17.10.2008 | ||
ES | 27.10.2008 | ||
IS | 16.11.2008 | ||
PT | 16.12.2008 | ||
BE | 28.02.2009 | ||
MC | 28.02.2009 | ||
FR | 02.03.2009 | ||
Former [2010/25] | CZ | 16.07.2008 | |
DK | 16.07.2008 | ||
EE | 16.07.2008 | ||
FI | 16.07.2008 | ||
IE | 16.07.2008 | ||
IT | 16.07.2008 | ||
LT | 16.07.2008 | ||
LV | 16.07.2008 | ||
NL | 16.07.2008 | ||
RO | 16.07.2008 | ||
SI | 16.07.2008 | ||
SK | 16.07.2008 | ||
BG | 16.10.2008 | ||
SE | 16.10.2008 | ||
ES | 27.10.2008 | ||
IS | 16.11.2008 | ||
PT | 16.12.2008 | ||
BE | 28.02.2009 | ||
MC | 28.02.2009 | ||
FR | 02.03.2009 | ||
Former [2010/13] | CZ | 16.07.2008 | |
DK | 16.07.2008 | ||
EE | 16.07.2008 | ||
FI | 16.07.2008 | ||
IE | 16.07.2008 | ||
IT | 16.07.2008 | ||
LT | 16.07.2008 | ||
LV | 16.07.2008 | ||
NL | 16.07.2008 | ||
RO | 16.07.2008 | ||
SI | 16.07.2008 | ||
SK | 16.07.2008 | ||
BG | 16.10.2008 | ||
SE | 16.10.2008 | ||
ES | 27.10.2008 | ||
IS | 16.11.2008 | ||
PT | 16.12.2008 | ||
BE | 28.02.2009 | ||
MC | 28.02.2009 | ||
Former [2010/01] | CZ | 16.07.2008 | |
DK | 16.07.2008 | ||
EE | 16.07.2008 | ||
FI | 16.07.2008 | ||
IE | 16.07.2008 | ||
IT | 16.07.2008 | ||
LT | 16.07.2008 | ||
LV | 16.07.2008 | ||
NL | 16.07.2008 | ||
RO | 16.07.2008 | ||
SI | 16.07.2008 | ||
SK | 16.07.2008 | ||
BG | 16.10.2008 | ||
ES | 27.10.2008 | ||
IS | 16.11.2008 | ||
PT | 16.12.2008 | ||
MC | 28.02.2009 | ||
Former [2009/28] | CZ | 16.07.2008 | |
DK | 16.07.2008 | ||
EE | 16.07.2008 | ||
FI | 16.07.2008 | ||
IE | 16.07.2008 | ||
LT | 16.07.2008 | ||
LV | 16.07.2008 | ||
NL | 16.07.2008 | ||
RO | 16.07.2008 | ||
SI | 16.07.2008 | ||
SK | 16.07.2008 | ||
BG | 16.10.2008 | ||
ES | 27.10.2008 | ||
IS | 16.11.2008 | ||
PT | 16.12.2008 | ||
Former [2009/20] | DK | 16.07.2008 | |
FI | 16.07.2008 | ||
LT | 16.07.2008 | ||
LV | 16.07.2008 | ||
NL | 16.07.2008 | ||
SI | 16.07.2008 | ||
BG | 16.10.2008 | ||
ES | 27.10.2008 | ||
IS | 16.11.2008 | ||
PT | 16.12.2008 | ||
Former [2009/14] | FI | 16.07.2008 | |
LT | 16.07.2008 | ||
LV | 16.07.2008 | ||
NL | 16.07.2008 | ||
SI | 16.07.2008 | ||
BG | 16.10.2008 | ||
ES | 27.10.2008 | ||
IS | 16.11.2008 | ||
PT | 16.12.2008 | ||
Former [2009/12] | LT | 16.07.2008 | |
LV | 16.07.2008 | ||
NL | 16.07.2008 | ||
ES | 27.10.2008 | ||
IS | 16.11.2008 | ||
Former [2009/10] | LT | 16.07.2008 | |
NL | 16.07.2008 | ||
IS | 16.11.2008 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPH0911900 (NABCO LTD) [A] 1* figures 8,9 *; | [A]WO03028299 (HITACHI LTD [JP], et al) [A] 1-16 * abstract *; | [A]DE102004037849 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [A] 1-16 * the whole document * | by applicant | DE19926085 | EP0982215 | DE102004037849 |