Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2016250340 | ![]() | 01.09.2016 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US10457298 | 16.10.1998 | US201213587242 | 16.08.2012 | US12016199 | 16.02.1999 | US80254004 | 16.03.2004 | US201615131233 | 18.04.2016 | US7760508 | 20.03.2008 | US83265801 | 11.04.2001 | US9924201 | 15.10.1999 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9314534 | ![]() | 19.04.2016 | B2 | US2015011732 | 08.01.2015 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US10457298 | 16.10.1998 | US201213587242 | 16.08.2012 | US12016199 | 16.02.1999 | US80254004 | 16.03.2004 | US7760508 | 20.03.2008 | US83265801 | 11.04.2001 | US9924201 | 15.10.1999 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2009104150 | ![]() | 23.04.2009 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US10457298 | 16.10.1998 | US12016199 | 16.02.1999 | US80254004 | 16.03.2004 | US7760508 | 20.03.2008 | US83265801 | 11.04.2001 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | US7446173 | ![]() | 04.11.2008 | B2 | US2007098688 | 03.05.2007 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US10457298 | 16.10.1998 | US12016199 | 16.02.1999 | US80254004 | 16.03.2004 | US83265801 | 11.04.2001 | US9924201 | 15.10.1999 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP4616478B | ![]() | 19.01.2011 | B2 | JP2002527491 | 27.08.2002 | A | Priority number | Date | US10457298 | 16.10.1998 | US12016199 | 16.02.1999 | US9924201 | 15.10.1999 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2599503 | ![]() | 17.05.2017 | B1 | EP2599503 | 24.07.2013 | A3 | EP2599503 | 05.06.2013 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US10457298 | 16.10.1998 | US12016199 | 16.02.1999 | EP06003415 | 15.10.1999 | EP99970609 | 15.10.1999 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2260872 | ![]() | 30.08.2017 | B1 | EP2260872 | 27.04.2011 | A3 | EP2260872 | 15.12.2010 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US10457298 | 16.10.1998 | US12016199 | 16.02.1999 | EP06003415 | 15.10.1999 | EP99970609 | 15.10.1999 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1121156 | ![]() | 22.02.2006 | B1 | EP1121156 | 08.08.2001 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US10457298 | 16.10.1998 | US12016199 | 16.02.1999 | US9924201 | 15.10.1999 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU762616B | ![]() | 03.07.2003 | B2 | AU1446500 | 08.05.2000 | A | Priority number | Date | US10457298 | 16.10.1998 | US12016199 | 16.02.1999 | US9924201 | 15.10.1999 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1656952 | ![]() | 18.12.2013 | B1 | EP1656952 | 29.11.2006 | A3 | EP1656952 | 17.05.2006 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US10457298 | 16.10.1998 | US12016199 | 16.02.1999 | EP99970609 | 15.10.1999 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | BRPI9915542 | 25.05.2021 | C1 | BR9915542 | 31.10.2017 | B8 | BR9915542 | 07.06.2016 | B1 | BR9915542 | 14.08.2001 | A | Priority number | Date | US10457298 | 16.10.1998 | US12016199 | 16.02.1999 | US9924201 | 15.10.1999 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2345138 | 15.12.2009 | C | CA2345138 | 27.04.2000 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US10457298 | 16.10.1998 | US12016199 | 16.02.1999 | US9924201 | 15.10.1999 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | CY1105022T | 03.03.2010 | T1 | Priority number | Date | US10457298 | 16.10.1998 | US12016199 | 16.02.1999 | US9924201 | 15.10.1999 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | CY1115125T | 14.12.2016 | T1 | Priority number | Date | US10457298 | 16.10.1998 | US12016199 | 16.02.1999 | EP06003415 | 15.10.1999 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE69930015T | 12.10.2006 | T2 | DE69930015D1 | 27.04.2006 | D1 | Priority number | Date | US10457298 | 16.10.1998 | US12016199 | 16.02.1999 | US9924201 | 15.10.1999 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | DK1656952T | 20.01.2014 | T3 | Priority number | Date | US10457298 | 16.10.1998 | US12016199 | 16.02.1999 | EP99970609 | 15.10.1999 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | EA004789 | 31.05.2017 | B9 | EA004789 | 26.08.2004 | B1 | EA200100446 | 22.10.2001 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US10457298 | 16.10.1998 | US12016199 | 16.02.1999 | US9924201 | 15.10.1999 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | EE04967 | 15.02.2008 | B1 | EE200100220 | 17.06.2002 | A | Priority number | Date | US10457298 | 16.10.1998 | US12016199 | 16.02.1999 | US9924201 | 15.10.1999 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | EE05201 | 17.08.2009 | B1 | EE200700058 | 15.02.2008 | A | Priority number | Date | US10457298 | 16.10.1998 | US12016199 | 16.02.1999 | EEP200100220 | 15.10.1999 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | HK1042434 | 25.01.2008 | B | HK1042434 | 16.08.2002 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US10457298 | 16.10.1998 | US12016199 | 16.02.1999 | US9924201 | 15.10.1999 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | HU229888 | 28.11.2014 | B1 | HUP0200444 | 29.06.2002 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US10457298 | 16.10.1998 | US12016199 | 16.02.1999 | US9924201 | 15.10.1999 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | IL142282 | 08.03.2007 | A | Priority number | Date | US10457298 | 16.10.1998 | US12016199 | 16.02.1999 | US9924201 | 15.10.1999 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | IS2926B | 15.09.2015 | B | IS5913 | 30.03.2001 | A | Priority number | Date | US10457298 | 16.10.1998 | US12016199 | 16.02.1999 | US9924201 | 15.10.1999 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | LTC2599503I | 25.06.2019 | I2 | LTPA2017030I | 25.10.2017 | I1 | Priority number | Date | US10457298 | 16.10.1998 | US12016199 | 16.02.1999 | EP06003415 | 15.10.1999 | EP99970609 | 15.10.1999 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | NO20011860L | 15.06.2001 | L | NO20011860D0 | 11.04.2001 | D0 | Priority number | Date | US10457298 | 16.10.1998 | US12016199 | 16.02.1999 | US9924201 | 15.10.1999 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | NZ510689 | 25.07.2003 | A | Priority number | Date | US10457298 | 16.10.1998 | US12016199 | 16.02.1999 | US9924201 | 15.10.1999 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | SI1121156T | 31.08.2006 | T1 | Priority number | Date | US10457298 | 16.10.1998 | US12016199 | 16.02.1999 | EP99970609 | 15.10.1999 | US9924201 | 15.10.1999 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | SI1656952T | 30.04.2014 | T1 | Priority number | Date | US10457298 | 16.10.1998 | US12016199 | 16.02.1999 | EP06003415 | 15.10.1999 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | SK287918B | 02.03.2012 | B6 | SK5062001 | 07.01.2002 | A3 | Priority number | Date | US10457298 | 16.10.1998 | US12016199 | 16.02.1999 | US9924201 | 15.10.1999 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | US6962978 | 08.11.2005 | B2 | US2003021765 | 30.01.2003 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US10457298 | 16.10.1998 | US12016199 | 16.02.1999 | US83265801 | 11.04.2001 | US9924201 | 15.10.1999 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO0023114 | ![]() | 05.07.2001 | A9 | WO0023114 | 28.09.2000 | A3 | WO0023114 | 27.04.2000 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US10457298 | 16.10.1998 | US12016199 | 16.02.1999 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR100630849B | ![]() | 04.10.2006 | B1 | KR20010103605 | 23.11.2001 | A | Priority number | Date | US10457298 | 16.10.1998 | US12016199 | 16.02.1999 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP5863865B | ![]() | 17.02.2016 | B2 | JP2014129420 | 10.07.2014 | A | Priority number | Date | US10457298 | 16.10.1998 | US12016199 | 16.02.1999 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2011093937 | ![]() | 12.05.2011 | A | Priority number | Date | US10457298 | 16.10.1998 | US12016199 | 16.02.1999 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP5396358B | ![]() | 22.01.2014 | B2 | JP2011026329 | 10.02.2011 | A | Priority number | Date | US10457298 | 16.10.1998 | US12016199 | 16.02.1999 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2007063283 | ![]() | 15.03.2007 | A | Priority number | Date | US10457298 | 16.10.1998 | US12016199 | 16.02.1999 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | ATE318149T | 15.03.2006 | T1 | Priority number | Date | US10457298 | 16.10.1998 | US12016199 | 16.02.1999 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN101062419B | 29.06.2016 | B | CN101062419 | 31.10.2007 | A | Priority number | Date | US10457298 | 16.10.1998 | US12016199 | 16.02.1999 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN1329082C | 01.08.2007 | C | CN1323225 | 21.11.2001 | A | Priority number | Date | US10457298 | 16.10.1998 | US12016199 | 16.02.1999 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | CZ299164 | 07.05.2008 | B6 | CZ20011329 | 12.09.2001 | A3 | Priority number | Date | US10457298 | 16.10.1998 | US12016199 | 16.02.1999 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | DK1121156T | 06.06.2006 | T3 | Priority number | Date | US10457298 | 16.10.1998 | US12016199 | 16.02.1999 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2257884T | 01.08.2006 | T3 | Priority number | Date | US10457298 | 16.10.1998 | US12016199 | 16.02.1999 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2447772T | 12.03.2014 | T3 | Priority number | Date | US10457298 | 16.10.1998 | US12016199 | 16.02.1999 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2630278T | 21.08.2017 | T3 | Priority number | Date | US10457298 | 16.10.1998 | US12016199 | 16.02.1999 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2653589T | 07.02.2018 | T3 | Priority number | Date | US10457298 | 16.10.1998 | US12016199 | 16.02.1999 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | HK1089393 | 01.12.2006 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US10457298 | 16.10.1998 | US12016199 | 16.02.1999 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | LT2599503T | 26.06.2017 | T | Priority number | Date | US10457298 | 16.10.1998 | US12016199 | 16.02.1999 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | PL206536B | 31.08.2010 | B1 | PL347968 | 22.04.2002 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US10457298 | 16.10.1998 | US12016199 | 16.02.1999 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | PT1121156E | 31.05.2006 | E | Priority number | Date | US10457298 | 16.10.1998 | US12016199 | 16.02.1999 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | PT1656952E | 21.02.2014 | E | Priority number | Date | US10457298 | 16.10.1998 | US12016199 | 16.02.1999 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | SG110047 | 28.04.2005 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US10457298 | 16.10.1998 | US12016199 | 16.02.1999 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | SG2008070138A | 30.08.2017 | A | Priority number | Date | US10457298 | 16.10.1998 | US12016199 | 16.02.1999 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | TR200101086T | 21.08.2001 | T2 | Priority number | Date | US10457298 | 16.10.1998 | US12016199 | 16.02.1999 | Type | ![]() | EP2260872 | EP2599503 | Type | ![]() | EP1121156 |