EP1696482 - Semiconductor device package and method of manufacturing the same [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 19.06.2009 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.06.2009 | Withdrawal of application | published on 22.07.2009 [2009/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SHINKO ELECTRIC INDUSTRIES CO., LTD. 80 Oshimada-machi Nagano-shi, Nagano 381-2287 / JP | [2006/35] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Miyagawa, Hiroshi c/o Shinko Elec. Ind. Co., Ltd. 80, Oshimada-machi Nagano-shi Nagano 381-2287 / JP | 02 /
Otagiri, Mitsuhiro c/o Shinko Elec. Ind. Co., Ltd. 80, Oshimada-machi Nagano-shi Nagano 381-2287 / JP | [2006/35] | Representative(s) | Zimmermann, Gerd Heinrich, et al Zimmermann & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Postfach 330 920 80069 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2006/35] | Zimmermann, Gerd Heinrich, et al Zimmermann & Partner, P.O. Box 33 09 20 80069 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 06003427.9 | 20.02.2006 | [2006/35] | Priority number, date | JP20050042639 | 18.02.2005 Original published format: JP 2005042639 | [2006/35] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1696482 | Date: | 30.08.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/35] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1696482 | Date: | 23.01.2008 | [2008/04] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.01.2008 | Classification | IPC: | H01L23/13, H01L23/50, H01L23/498 | [2006/35] | CPC: |
H01L23/49827 (EP,US);
H01L21/50 (KR);
H01L23/13 (EP,US);
H01L23/49822 (EP,US);
H01L23/50 (EP,US);
H01L24/49 (EP,US);
H01L2224/32225 (EP,US);
H01L2224/48091 (EP,US);
H01L2224/48227 (EP,US);
H01L2224/48228 (EP,US);
H01L2224/4824 (EP,US);
H01L2224/49 (EP,US);
H01L2224/73215 (EP,US);
H01L24/48 (EP,US);
H01L2924/00014 (EP,US);
H01L2924/01004 (EP,US);
H01L2924/01005 (EP,US);
H01L2924/01006 (EP,US);
H01L2924/01015 (EP,US);
H01L2924/01019 (EP,US);
H01L2924/01028 (EP,US);
H01L2924/01029 (EP,US);
H01L2924/01033 (EP,US);
H01L2924/01078 (EP,US);
H01L2924/01079 (EP,US);
H01L2924/014 (EP,US);
H01L2924/15311 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
H01L2224/48091, H01L2924/00014 (US,EP);
H01L2224/73215, H01L2224/32225, H01L2224/4824 (US,EP);
H01L2924/00014, H01L2224/05599 (EP,US);
H01L2924/00014, H01L2224/45099 (EP,US);
H01L2924/15311, H01L2224/73215, H01L2224/32225, H01L2224/4824, H01L2924/00 (US,EP);
H01L2924/181, H01L2924/00012 (EP,US) (-) | Designated contracting states | DE [2008/40] |
Former [2006/35] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Halbleitervorrichtungsgehäuse und Verfahren zur dessen Herstellung | [2006/35] | English: | Semiconductor device package and method of manufacturing the same | [2006/35] | French: | Boîtier de dispositif à semi-conducteur et son procédé de fabrication | [2006/35] | Examination procedure | 18.06.2008 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.06.2008 | Examination requested [2008/31] | 24.07.2008 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 27.08.2008 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 04.06.2009 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2009/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.02.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.02.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]JPH04348591 (NEC TOYAMA LTD) [Y] 10-17 * abstract *; | [Y]US5825084 (LAU JOHN H [US], et al) [Y] 6 * column 5, line 46 - column 6, line 4; figure 4d *; | [X]US6232551 (CHANG SU YUAN [TW]) [X] 1-5,7-9 * column 2, line 36 - line 40 * * column 3, line 45 - line 50 * * column 4, line 38 - line 43 * * column 4, line 63 - line 66 * * column 5, line 10 - line 17 * * figure 7; claims 1,11 *; | [Y]US2001038905 (TAKADA MASARU [JP], et al) [Y] 12-17* paragraphs [0203] - [0232]; figures 8-16 *; | [XY]DE10201782 (INFINEON TECHNOLOGIES AG [DE]) [X] 1-5,7-9 * paragraphs [0005] - [0027]; figures 1-3; claim 6 * [Y] 6,10-17 |