EP1696275 - Method for replenishing development replenisher in automatic developing machine for photosensitive lithographic printing plate precursor and automatic photosensitive lithographic printing plate precursor developing machine [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.02.2015 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.10.2017 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU, TR | published on 15.11.2017 [2017/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FUJIFILM Corporation 26-30, Nishiazabu 2-chome Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2007/12] | For all designated states FUJIFILM Corporation 26-30, Nishiazabu 2-chome Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | ||
Former [2006/35] | For all designated states FUJI PHOTO FILM CO., LTD. 210, Nakanuma Minami-Ashigara-shi, Kanagawa / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Sasayama, Hiroyuki c/o Fuji Photo Film Co., Ltd. 4000, Kawashiri Yoshida-cho, Haibara-gun, Shizuoka / JP | [2014/14] |
Former [2006/35] | 01 /
Sasayama, Hiroyuki c/o Fuji Photo Film Co., Ltd., 4000, Kawashiri Yoshida-cho, Haibara-gun, Shizuoka / JP | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2014/14] | HOFFMANN EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | ||
Former [2006/35] | HOFFMANN EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 06003593.8 | 22.02.2006 | [2006/35] | Priority number, date | JP20050047178 | 23.02.2005 Original published format: JP 2005047178 | [2006/35] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1696275 | Date: | 30.08.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/35] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1696275 | Date: | 29.12.2010 | [2010/52] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1696275 | Date: | 02.04.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/14] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.12.2010 | Classification | IPC: | G03F7/30 | [2006/35] | CPC: |
G03F7/3071 (EP,US);
Y10S101/43 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/35] | Title | German: | Verfahren zum Auffrischen eines Entwicklers in einem automatischen Entwicklergerät für eine lichtempfindliche lithografische Druckplattenvorstufe und automatisches Entwicklergerät für eine lichtempfindliche lithografische Druckplattenvorstufe | [2006/35] | English: | Method for replenishing development replenisher in automatic developing machine for photosensitive lithographic printing plate precursor and automatic photosensitive lithographic printing plate precursor developing machine | [2006/35] | French: | Procédé de régénération d'un développeur dans une machine de développement automatique pour un précurseur de plaque d'impression lithographique photosensible, et machine de développement automatique d'un précurseur de plaque d'impression lithographique photosensible | [2006/35] | Examination procedure | 28.06.2011 | Examination requested [2011/32] | 29.06.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 30.09.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.01.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 28.01.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 30.09.2013 | Opposition(s) | 06.01.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.02.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.02.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.02.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.02.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.02.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 20.02.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 18.02.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 22.02.2006 | AT | 02.04.2014 | BE | 02.04.2014 | CY | 02.04.2014 | CZ | 02.04.2014 | DK | 02.04.2014 | EE | 02.04.2014 | ES | 02.04.2014 | FI | 02.04.2014 | IT | 02.04.2014 | LT | 02.04.2014 | LV | 02.04.2014 | MC | 02.04.2014 | NL | 02.04.2014 | PL | 02.04.2014 | RO | 02.04.2014 | SE | 02.04.2014 | SI | 02.04.2014 | SK | 02.04.2014 | TR | 02.04.2014 | BG | 02.07.2014 | GR | 03.07.2014 | IS | 02.08.2014 | PT | 04.08.2014 | [2017/39] |
Former [2015/46] | AT | 02.04.2014 | |
BE | 02.04.2014 | ||
CY | 02.04.2014 | ||
CZ | 02.04.2014 | ||
DK | 02.04.2014 | ||
EE | 02.04.2014 | ||
ES | 02.04.2014 | ||
FI | 02.04.2014 | ||
IT | 02.04.2014 | ||
LT | 02.04.2014 | ||
LV | 02.04.2014 | ||
MC | 02.04.2014 | ||
NL | 02.04.2014 | ||
PL | 02.04.2014 | ||
RO | 02.04.2014 | ||
SE | 02.04.2014 | ||
SI | 02.04.2014 | ||
SK | 02.04.2014 | ||
BG | 02.07.2014 | ||
GR | 03.07.2014 | ||
IS | 02.08.2014 | ||
PT | 04.08.2014 | ||
Former [2015/36] | AT | 02.04.2014 | |
BE | 02.04.2014 | ||
CY | 02.04.2014 | ||
CZ | 02.04.2014 | ||
DK | 02.04.2014 | ||
EE | 02.04.2014 | ||
ES | 02.04.2014 | ||
FI | 02.04.2014 | ||
IT | 02.04.2014 | ||
LT | 02.04.2014 | ||
LV | 02.04.2014 | ||
NL | 02.04.2014 | ||
PL | 02.04.2014 | ||
RO | 02.04.2014 | ||
SE | 02.04.2014 | ||
SI | 02.04.2014 | ||
SK | 02.04.2014 | ||
BG | 02.07.2014 | ||
GR | 03.07.2014 | ||
IS | 02.08.2014 | ||
PT | 04.08.2014 | ||
Former [2015/18] | AT | 02.04.2014 | |
BE | 02.04.2014 | ||
CY | 02.04.2014 | ||
CZ | 02.04.2014 | ||
DK | 02.04.2014 | ||
EE | 02.04.2014 | ||
ES | 02.04.2014 | ||
FI | 02.04.2014 | ||
IT | 02.04.2014 | ||
LT | 02.04.2014 | ||
LV | 02.04.2014 | ||
NL | 02.04.2014 | ||
PL | 02.04.2014 | ||
RO | 02.04.2014 | ||
SE | 02.04.2014 | ||
SK | 02.04.2014 | ||
BG | 02.07.2014 | ||
GR | 03.07.2014 | ||
IS | 02.08.2014 | ||
PT | 04.08.2014 | ||
Former [2015/11] | AT | 02.04.2014 | |
BE | 02.04.2014 | ||
CY | 02.04.2014 | ||
CZ | 02.04.2014 | ||
DK | 02.04.2014 | ||
EE | 02.04.2014 | ||
ES | 02.04.2014 | ||
FI | 02.04.2014 | ||
LT | 02.04.2014 | ||
LV | 02.04.2014 | ||
NL | 02.04.2014 | ||
PL | 02.04.2014 | ||
RO | 02.04.2014 | ||
SE | 02.04.2014 | ||
SK | 02.04.2014 | ||
BG | 02.07.2014 | ||
GR | 03.07.2014 | ||
IS | 02.08.2014 | ||
PT | 04.08.2014 | ||
Former [2015/10] | AT | 02.04.2014 | |
BE | 02.04.2014 | ||
CY | 02.04.2014 | ||
CZ | 02.04.2014 | ||
DK | 02.04.2014 | ||
EE | 02.04.2014 | ||
ES | 02.04.2014 | ||
FI | 02.04.2014 | ||
LT | 02.04.2014 | ||
LV | 02.04.2014 | ||
NL | 02.04.2014 | ||
PL | 02.04.2014 | ||
SE | 02.04.2014 | ||
SK | 02.04.2014 | ||
BG | 02.07.2014 | ||
GR | 03.07.2014 | ||
IS | 02.08.2014 | ||
PT | 04.08.2014 | ||
Former [2015/08] | AT | 02.04.2014 | |
BE | 02.04.2014 | ||
CY | 02.04.2014 | ||
CZ | 02.04.2014 | ||
DK | 02.04.2014 | ||
ES | 02.04.2014 | ||
FI | 02.04.2014 | ||
LT | 02.04.2014 | ||
LV | 02.04.2014 | ||
NL | 02.04.2014 | ||
PL | 02.04.2014 | ||
SE | 02.04.2014 | ||
BG | 02.07.2014 | ||
GR | 03.07.2014 | ||
IS | 02.08.2014 | ||
PT | 04.08.2014 | ||
Former [2015/02] | AT | 02.04.2014 | |
CY | 02.04.2014 | ||
CZ | 02.04.2014 | ||
ES | 02.04.2014 | ||
FI | 02.04.2014 | ||
LT | 02.04.2014 | ||
LV | 02.04.2014 | ||
NL | 02.04.2014 | ||
PL | 02.04.2014 | ||
SE | 02.04.2014 | ||
BG | 02.07.2014 | ||
GR | 03.07.2014 | ||
IS | 02.08.2014 | ||
PT | 04.08.2014 | ||
Former [2014/51] | AT | 02.04.2014 | |
CY | 02.04.2014 | ||
CZ | 02.04.2014 | ||
ES | 02.04.2014 | ||
FI | 02.04.2014 | ||
LT | 02.04.2014 | ||
LV | 02.04.2014 | ||
NL | 02.04.2014 | ||
PL | 02.04.2014 | ||
SE | 02.04.2014 | ||
BG | 02.07.2014 | ||
GR | 03.07.2014 | ||
IS | 02.08.2014 | ||
Former [2014/50] | CY | 02.04.2014 | |
CZ | 02.04.2014 | ||
ES | 02.04.2014 | ||
FI | 02.04.2014 | ||
LT | 02.04.2014 | ||
LV | 02.04.2014 | ||
NL | 02.04.2014 | ||
PL | 02.04.2014 | ||
SE | 02.04.2014 | ||
BG | 02.07.2014 | ||
GR | 03.07.2014 | ||
IS | 02.08.2014 | ||
Former [2014/49] | CY | 02.04.2014 | |
CZ | 02.04.2014 | ||
FI | 02.04.2014 | ||
LT | 02.04.2014 | ||
BG | 02.07.2014 | ||
IS | 02.08.2014 | ||
Former [2014/48] | CY | 02.04.2014 | |
CZ | 02.04.2014 | ||
LT | 02.04.2014 | ||
BG | 02.07.2014 | ||
Former [2014/47] | CY | 02.04.2014 | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]EP1434101 (FUJI PHOTO FILM CO LTD [JP]) [AD] 1-4* the whole document *; | [AD]EP1437626 (FUJI PHOTO FILM CO LTD [JP]) [AD] 1-4 * the whole document *; | [XP]EP1566699 (FUJI PHOTO FILM CO LTD [JP]) [XP] 4 * paragraph [0237]; claim 1 * | by applicant | JPS6421451 |