EP1672707 - Light emitting device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2006/25] | Light emitting device and fluorescent substance therefor | ||
[2019/07] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.07.2020 Database last updated on 13.07.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 28.06.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 21.02.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 25.04.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.06.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 06.07.2022 [2022/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nichia Corporation 491-100, Oka Kaminaka-cho Anan-shi Tokushima 774-8601 / JP | [2019/31] |
Former [2006/25] | For all designated states Nichia Corporation 491-100, Oka, Kaminaka-cho Anan-shi, Tokushima 774-8601 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Murazaki Yoshinori c/o Nichia Corporation 491-100, Oka, Kaminaka-cho Anan-shi, Tokushima 774 - 8601 / JP | 02 /
Ichihara Takashi c/o Nichia Corporation 491-100, Oka, Kaminaka-cho Anan-shi, Tokushima 774- 8601 / JP | [2006/25] | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [2019/31] |
Former [2008/35] | Vossius & Partner Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | ||
Former [2006/25] | Vossius & Partner Siebertstrasse 4 81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 06003714.0 | 19.04.2002 | [2006/25] | Priority number, date | JP20010123457 | 20.04.2001 Original published format: JP 2001123457 | JP20010203240 | 04.07.2001 Original published format: JP 2001203240 | JP20010288070 | 21.09.2001 Original published format: JP 2001288070 | JP20010320201 | 18.10.2001 Original published format: JP 2001320201 | [2006/25] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1672707 | Date: | 21.06.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/25] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1672707 | Date: | 20.02.2008 | [2008/08] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1672707 | Date: | 31.07.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/31] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.01.2008 | Classification | IPC: | C09K11/80, C09K11/84, C09K11/81, C09K11/58, H01L33/00 | [2007/45] | CPC: |
H01L33/504 (EP,US);
C09K11/584 (EP,US);
C09K11/662 (EP,US);
C09K11/7734 (EP,US);
C09K11/7739 (EP,US);
C09K11/7774 (EP,US);
C09K11/7789 (EP,US);
H01L33/38 (EP,US);
H05B33/14 (EP,US);
H01L2224/45139 (EP,US);
H01L2224/48465 (EP,US);
H01L2224/4903 (EP,US);
H01L2224/73265 (EP,US);
H01L2924/00011 (EP,US);
H01L2924/00014 (EP);
| C-Set: |
H01L2224/45139, H01L2924/00 (EP,US);
H01L2224/45139, H01L2924/00014 (US,EP);
H01L2924/00011, H01L2924/01005 (US,EP);
H01L2924/00014, H01L2224/45015, H01L2924/207 (EP) |
Former IPC [2006/25] | H01L33/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2019/31] |
Former [2006/25] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | LED | [2019/07] | English: | Light emitting device | [2019/07] | French: | Dispositif électroluminescent | [2019/07] |
Former [2006/25] | LED und fluoreszierende Substanz dafür | ||
Former [2006/25] | Light emitting device and fluorescent substance therefor | ||
Former [2006/25] | Dispositif électroluminescent utilisant une substance fluorescente | Examination procedure | 19.08.2008 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.08.2008 | Examination requested [2008/41] | 14.11.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 04.05.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.04.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.08.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.06.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 14.12.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.02.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.06.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 19.06.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 19.06.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP02720511.1 / EP1394864 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20020720511) is 24.01.2011 | Opposition(s) | 03.06.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.04.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 20.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 24.04.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 25.02.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 21.04.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 27.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 23.04.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 13.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 10.04.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | 30.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 15 | 10.04.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 16 | 11.04.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 17 | 15.04.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 18 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 31.07.2019 | CY | 31.07.2019 | DK | 31.07.2019 | ES | 31.07.2019 | FI | 31.07.2019 | IT | 31.07.2019 | MC | 31.07.2019 | NL | 31.07.2019 | SE | 31.07.2019 | TR | 31.07.2019 | GR | 01.11.2019 | PT | 02.12.2019 | IE | 19.04.2020 | LU | 19.04.2020 | BE | 30.04.2020 | CH | 30.04.2020 | LI | 30.04.2020 | [2022/27] |
Former [2021/20] | AT | 31.07.2019 | |
DK | 31.07.2019 | ||
ES | 31.07.2019 | ||
FI | 31.07.2019 | ||
IT | 31.07.2019 | ||
MC | 31.07.2019 | ||
NL | 31.07.2019 | ||
SE | 31.07.2019 | ||
TR | 31.07.2019 | ||
GR | 01.11.2019 | ||
PT | 02.12.2019 | ||
IE | 19.04.2020 | ||
LU | 19.04.2020 | ||
BE | 30.04.2020 | ||
CH | 30.04.2020 | ||
LI | 30.04.2020 | ||
Former [2021/12] | AT | 31.07.2019 | |
DK | 31.07.2019 | ||
ES | 31.07.2019 | ||
FI | 31.07.2019 | ||
IT | 31.07.2019 | ||
MC | 31.07.2019 | ||
NL | 31.07.2019 | ||
SE | 31.07.2019 | ||
TR | 31.07.2019 | ||
GR | 01.11.2019 | ||
PT | 02.12.2019 | ||
LU | 19.04.2020 | ||
BE | 30.04.2020 | ||
CH | 30.04.2020 | ||
LI | 30.04.2020 | ||
Former [2021/08] | AT | 31.07.2019 | |
DK | 31.07.2019 | ||
ES | 31.07.2019 | ||
FI | 31.07.2019 | ||
IT | 31.07.2019 | ||
MC | 31.07.2019 | ||
NL | 31.07.2019 | ||
SE | 31.07.2019 | ||
TR | 31.07.2019 | ||
GR | 01.11.2019 | ||
PT | 02.12.2019 | ||
LU | 19.04.2020 | ||
CH | 30.04.2020 | ||
LI | 30.04.2020 | ||
Former [2020/52] | AT | 31.07.2019 | |
DK | 31.07.2019 | ||
ES | 31.07.2019 | ||
FI | 31.07.2019 | ||
IT | 31.07.2019 | ||
MC | 31.07.2019 | ||
NL | 31.07.2019 | ||
SE | 31.07.2019 | ||
TR | 31.07.2019 | ||
GR | 01.11.2019 | ||
PT | 02.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/24] | AT | 31.07.2019 | |
DK | 31.07.2019 | ||
ES | 31.07.2019 | ||
FI | 31.07.2019 | ||
IT | 31.07.2019 | ||
NL | 31.07.2019 | ||
SE | 31.07.2019 | ||
TR | 31.07.2019 | ||
GR | 01.11.2019 | ||
PT | 02.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/22] | AT | 31.07.2019 | |
DK | 31.07.2019 | ||
ES | 31.07.2019 | ||
FI | 31.07.2019 | ||
NL | 31.07.2019 | ||
SE | 31.07.2019 | ||
TR | 31.07.2019 | ||
GR | 01.11.2019 | ||
PT | 02.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/17] | AT | 31.07.2019 | |
ES | 31.07.2019 | ||
FI | 31.07.2019 | ||
NL | 31.07.2019 | ||
SE | 31.07.2019 | ||
TR | 31.07.2019 | ||
GR | 01.11.2019 | ||
PT | 02.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/11] | AT | 31.07.2019 | |
ES | 31.07.2019 | ||
FI | 31.07.2019 | ||
NL | 31.07.2019 | ||
SE | 31.07.2019 | ||
GR | 01.11.2019 | ||
PT | 02.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/10] | AT | 31.07.2019 | |
FI | 31.07.2019 | ||
NL | 31.07.2019 | ||
SE | 31.07.2019 | ||
PT | 02.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/09] | FI | 31.07.2019 | |
NL | 31.07.2019 | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]US3513103 (SHAFFER FRANCIS N) [X] 8-13 * columns 1-2; example - * [A] 15,16,18; | [X]FR2401518 (PHILIPS NV [NL]) [X] 13* table 1 *; | [XA]GB2054258 (GTE PROD CORP) [X] 8-14,17 * pages 2-3 * [A] 15,16,18; | [X]EP0936682 (NICHIA KAGAKU KOGYO KK [JP]) [X] 1-7 * pages 3-10; example -; claim - *; | [X]US6084250 (JUESTEL THOMAS [DE], et al) [X] 1-7 * columns 1-4; example - *; | [X]GB2347018 (HEWLETT PACKARD CO [US]) [X] 1-7 * pages 2-10; claim - * |