Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
17.10.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 19.11.2008 [2008/47] |
09.11.2007 | (Expected) grant | published on 12.12.2007 [2007/50] |
01.11.2007 | Change: Renewal fee paid | |
01.11.2007 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
22.09.2007 | New entry: Payment of fee for grant | |
22.09.2007 | New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing | |
01.05.2007 | New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent | |
27.04.2007 | Change - German title | published on 30.05.2007 [2007/22] |
19.01.2007 | Definitive list of designations | published on 21.02.2007 [2007/08] |
04.11.2006 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
03.11.2006 | Request for examination filed | published on 06.12.2006 [2006/49] |
25.10.2006 | Amendment by applicant | |
12.05.2006 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 14.06.2006 [2006/24] |
03.03.2006 | New entry: Renewal fee paid |