EP1827009 - Video encoder and decoder for an improved zapping service for mobile video reception [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 21.12.2012 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.12.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 23.01.2013 [2013/04] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Panasonic Corporation 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka 571-8501 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2008/47] | For all designated states Panasonic Corporation 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka 571-8501 / JP | ||
Former [2007/35] | For all designated states MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi, Osaka 571-8501 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kursawe, Thomas c/o Panasonic R & D Centre Germany GmbH (PRDCG) Monzastrasse 4C 63225 Langen / DE | 02 /
Scheid, Albrecht c/o Panasonic R & D Centre Germany GmbH (PRDCG) Monzastrasse 4C 63225 Langen / DE | 03 /
Düking, Sven c/o Panasonic R & D Centre Germany GmbH (PRDCG) Monzastrasse 4C 63225 Langen / DE | [2007/35] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstraße 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2007/35] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 06004030.0 | 28.02.2006 | [2007/35] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1827009 | Date: | 29.08.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/35] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.05.2006 | Classification | IPC: | H04N5/44 | [2007/35] | CPC: |
H04N21/44016 (EP,US);
H04N21/23424 (EP,US);
H04N21/2365 (EP,US);
H04N21/242 (EP,US);
H04N21/41407 (EP,US);
H04N21/4347 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2008/19] |
Former [2007/35] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Videokodierer und Dekodierer mit verbesserter Kanalumschaltung für mobilen Videoempfang | [2007/35] | English: | Video encoder and decoder for an improved zapping service for mobile video reception | [2007/35] | French: | Codeur et décodeur vidéo avec sélection de programme amelioré pour la réception mobile de vidéo | [2007/35] | Examination procedure | 17.01.2008 | Examination requested [2008/09] | 14.02.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.03.2008 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 04.04.2008 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 18.06.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.01.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 31.07.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2013/04] | 04.09.2012 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2013/04] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 14.02.2008 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.02.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.02.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.02.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.02.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP1107601 (THOMSON LICENSING SA [FR]); | [A]US2003014705 (SUZUKI YOSHINORI [JP], et al); | [A]WO2004049719 (KONINKL PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NV [NL], et al); | [A]EP1465433 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP]); | [X]WO2004110069 (KONINKL PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NV [NL], et al) |