EP1700745 - Load carrier, particularly a bicycle carrier [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.07.2009 Database last updated on 03.05.2025 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.09.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, TR | published on 02.11.2011 [2011/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states EUFAB GmbH Champagne 6 42781 Haan / DE | [2006/37] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Becker, Alexander Elfenhang 14 42329 Wuppertal / DE | [2006/37] | Representative(s) | Paul, Dieter-Alfred, et al Paul & Albrecht Patentanwälte PartG mbB Stresemannallee 4b 41460 Neuss / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/40] | Paul, Dieter-Alfred, et al Paul & Albrecht Patentanwaltssozietät Hellersbergstrasse 18 41460 Neuss / DE | ||
Former [2006/37] | Paul, Dieter-Alfred, et al Patentanwalt, Hellersbergstrasse 18 41460 Neuss / DE | Application number, filing date | 06004093.8 | 01.03.2006 | [2006/37] | Priority number, date | DE20052004043U | 10.03.2005 Original published format: DE 202005004043 U | [2006/37] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1700745 | Date: | 13.09.2006 | Language: | DE | [2006/37] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1700745 | Date: | 27.08.2008 | Language: | DE | [2008/35] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.05.2006 | Classification | IPC: | B60R9/06, B60R9/10 | [2006/37] | CPC: |
B60R9/06 (EP);
B60R9/10 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/37] | Title | German: | Lastenträger, insbesondere Fahrradträger | [2006/37] | English: | Load carrier, particularly a bicycle carrier | [2006/37] | French: | Porte-charge, en particulier porte-bicyclette | [2006/37] | Examination procedure | 29.01.2007 | Examination requested [2007/12] | 01.03.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.06.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.05.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.07.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 07.07.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 28.05.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 27.08.2008 | CZ | 27.08.2008 | DK | 27.08.2008 | EE | 27.08.2008 | FI | 27.08.2008 | IE | 27.08.2008 | IT | 27.08.2008 | LT | 27.08.2008 | LV | 27.08.2008 | PL | 27.08.2008 | RO | 27.08.2008 | SI | 27.08.2008 | SK | 27.08.2008 | TR | 27.08.2008 | BG | 27.11.2008 | SE | 27.11.2008 | GR | 28.11.2008 | ES | 08.12.2008 | IS | 27.12.2008 | PT | 27.01.2009 | HU | 28.02.2009 | BE | 31.03.2009 | MC | 31.03.2009 | [2011/43] |
Former [2011/32] | CZ | 27.08.2008 | |
DK | 27.08.2008 | ||
EE | 27.08.2008 | ||
FI | 27.08.2008 | ||
IE | 27.08.2008 | ||
IT | 27.08.2008 | ||
LT | 27.08.2008 | ||
LV | 27.08.2008 | ||
PL | 27.08.2008 | ||
RO | 27.08.2008 | ||
SI | 27.08.2008 | ||
SK | 27.08.2008 | ||
BG | 27.11.2008 | ||
SE | 27.11.2008 | ||
GR | 28.11.2008 | ||
ES | 08.12.2008 | ||
IS | 27.12.2008 | ||
PT | 27.01.2009 | ||
HU | 28.02.2009 | ||
BE | 31.03.2009 | ||
MC | 31.03.2009 | ||
Former [2011/02] | CZ | 27.08.2008 | |
DK | 27.08.2008 | ||
EE | 27.08.2008 | ||
FI | 27.08.2008 | ||
IE | 27.08.2008 | ||
IT | 27.08.2008 | ||
LT | 27.08.2008 | ||
LV | 27.08.2008 | ||
PL | 27.08.2008 | ||
RO | 27.08.2008 | ||
SI | 27.08.2008 | ||
SK | 27.08.2008 | ||
BG | 27.11.2008 | ||
SE | 27.11.2008 | ||
GR | 28.11.2008 | ||
ES | 08.12.2008 | ||
IS | 27.12.2008 | ||
PT | 27.01.2009 | ||
BE | 31.03.2009 | ||
MC | 31.03.2009 | ||
Former [2010/25] | CZ | 27.08.2008 | |
DK | 27.08.2008 | ||
EE | 27.08.2008 | ||
FI | 27.08.2008 | ||
IE | 27.08.2008 | ||
IT | 27.08.2008 | ||
LT | 27.08.2008 | ||
LV | 27.08.2008 | ||
PL | 27.08.2008 | ||
RO | 27.08.2008 | ||
SI | 27.08.2008 | ||
SK | 27.08.2008 | ||
BG | 27.11.2008 | ||
SE | 27.11.2008 | ||
ES | 08.12.2008 | ||
IS | 27.12.2008 | ||
PT | 27.01.2009 | ||
BE | 31.03.2009 | ||
MC | 31.03.2009 | ||
Former [2010/13] | CZ | 27.08.2008 | |
DK | 27.08.2008 | ||
EE | 27.08.2008 | ||
FI | 27.08.2008 | ||
IE | 27.08.2008 | ||
IT | 27.08.2008 | ||
LT | 27.08.2008 | ||
LV | 27.08.2008 | ||
RO | 27.08.2008 | ||
SI | 27.08.2008 | ||
SK | 27.08.2008 | ||
BG | 27.11.2008 | ||
SE | 27.11.2008 | ||
ES | 08.12.2008 | ||
IS | 27.12.2008 | ||
PT | 27.01.2009 | ||
BE | 31.03.2009 | ||
MC | 31.03.2009 | ||
Former [2010/01] | CZ | 27.08.2008 | |
DK | 27.08.2008 | ||
EE | 27.08.2008 | ||
FI | 27.08.2008 | ||
IE | 27.08.2008 | ||
IT | 27.08.2008 | ||
LT | 27.08.2008 | ||
LV | 27.08.2008 | ||
RO | 27.08.2008 | ||
SI | 27.08.2008 | ||
SK | 27.08.2008 | ||
BG | 27.11.2008 | ||
ES | 08.12.2008 | ||
IS | 27.12.2008 | ||
PT | 27.01.2009 | ||
MC | 31.03.2009 | ||
Former [2009/28] | CZ | 27.08.2008 | |
DK | 27.08.2008 | ||
FI | 27.08.2008 | ||
IE | 27.08.2008 | ||
LT | 27.08.2008 | ||
LV | 27.08.2008 | ||
RO | 27.08.2008 | ||
SI | 27.08.2008 | ||
SK | 27.08.2008 | ||
BG | 27.11.2008 | ||
ES | 08.12.2008 | ||
IS | 27.12.2008 | ||
PT | 27.01.2009 | ||
Former [2009/20] | DK | 27.08.2008 | |
FI | 27.08.2008 | ||
LT | 27.08.2008 | ||
LV | 27.08.2008 | ||
SI | 27.08.2008 | ||
ES | 08.12.2008 | ||
IS | 27.12.2008 | ||
Former [2009/14] | FI | 27.08.2008 | |
LT | 27.08.2008 | ||
LV | 27.08.2008 | ||
SI | 27.08.2008 | ||
ES | 08.12.2008 | ||
IS | 27.12.2008 | ||
Former [2009/10] | LT | 27.08.2008 | |
IS | 27.12.2008 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US3843001 (WILLIS H) [Y] 3,10-17 * the whole document *; | [XY]US4856686 (WORKENTINE LARRY [US]) [X] 1,2,4-9,18 * the whole document * [Y] 3,10-17; | [X]US5082037 (HAMMONS JAMES L [US], et al) [X] 1,2,4,6,8,9,18,19* the whole document *; | [XY]US6036070 (GAUTHIER DIANE BLAIS [CA], et al) [X] 1,2,4-9 * the whole document * [Y] 3,10-17; | [XY]US6145720 (COMEAU SERGE [CA]) [X] 1,2,4-9,18,19 * column 4 - column 6; figures 1-3 * [Y] 3,10-17; | [XY]US6390343 (JAIN VINOO KUMAR [US]) [X] 1,2,4-9 * the whole document * [Y] 3,10-17 | by applicant | DE4315292 | DE4403715 | EP1059205 | DE20214388U |