EP1699002 - Interlayer film member for panel, panel and electronic tag [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 08.08.2008 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.08.2008 | Withdrawal of application | published on 10.09.2008 [2008/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nippon Sheet Glass Company, Limited 1-7 Kaigan 2-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 105-8552 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2006/36] | For all designated states Nippon Sheet Glass Company, Limited 1-7 Kaigan 2-chome, Minato-ku Tokyo 105-8552 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kokuryo, Kazuto c/o Zenic Inc. 1-17-14, Ohgaya Ohtsu Shiga 520-2144 / JP | 02 /
Ohara, Shohei Nippon Sheet Glass Co., Ltd. 1-7, Kaigan, 2-chome Minato-ku, Tokyo 105-8552 / JP | 03 /
Matsushita, Yoshimitsu Nippon Sheet Glass Co., Ltd. 1-7, Kaigan, 2-chome Minato-ku, Tokyo 105-8552 / JP | [2006/36] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/31] | HOFFMANN EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | ||
Former [2006/36] | HOFFMANN EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 06004405.4 | 03.03.2006 | [2006/36] | Priority number, date | JP20050061632 | 04.03.2005 Original published format: JP 2005061632 | [2006/36] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1699002 | Date: | 06.09.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/36] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.07.2006 | Classification | IPC: | G06K19/077, B32B17/10, H01Q1/12, B60J1/02, // G08B13/24, H05K5/00 | [2006/36] | CPC: |
G06K19/07758 (EP,US);
B32B17/10036 (EP,US);
B32B17/10761 (EP,US);
B32B17/10816 (EP,US);
G06K19/07749 (EP,US);
B32B2305/342 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/36] | Title | German: | Zwischenschichtfilm für eine Tafel, Tafel und elektronisches Etikett | [2006/36] | English: | Interlayer film member for panel, panel and electronic tag | [2006/36] | French: | Elément de film de couche intermédiaire pour panneau, panneau et étiquette électronique | [2006/36] | Examination procedure | 06.12.2006 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.12.2006 | Examination requested [2007/06] | 31.07.2008 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2008/37] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]NL9001777 (TEXAS INSTRUMENTS HOLLAND) [X] 1-4 * page 1, line 4 - page 3, line 17; figure . *; | [A]EP0608180 (SAINT GOBAIN VITRAGE [FR]) [A] 6-19* page 4, line 13 - page 5, line 54; figure -; claim - *; | [A]US5399847 (DROZ FRANCOIS [CH]) [A] 1 * column 12, line 33 - line 49; figures 10,11 *; | [X]US5879502 (GUSTAFSON AKE [CH]) [X] 1-3,6-8 * column 3, line 42 - column 5, line 17 *; | [XA]US6275157 (MAYS WESLEY M [US], et al) [X] 6-12,18,19 * column 2, line 53 - line 64 * * column 4, line 4 - line 43; figures 1,2,4 * * claim - * [A] 13-17; | [X]WO2004025553 (ASK SA [FR], et al) [X] 1,2 * page 6, line 33 - page 7, line 15 * * page 10, line 30 - page 11, line 12; figure - *; | [A]US2004238623 (ASP WAYNE [US]) [A] 1,6 * paragraph [0027] - paragraph [0031]; figure 1 *; | [PX]EP1628272 (NIPPON SHEET GLASS CO LTD [JP]) [PX] 6-8 * page 2, column 2, paragraph 15 - paragraph 17 * * page 3, column 3, paragraph 26 - paragraph 27 * * figure -; claim - * |