EP1700855 - A process for the preparation of tazarotene [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.03.2016 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.06.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, HU | published on 11.07.2018 [2018/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FIDIA FARMACEUTICI S.p.A. Via Ponte della Fabbrica 3/A 35031 Abano Terme (PD) / IT | [2015/18] |
Former [2006/37] | For all designated states SOLMAG S.p.A. Via della Vittoria 89 Cassino d'Alberi 26837 Mulazzano LO / IT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Frigoli, Samuele Via C. Menotti 170 20025 Legnano / IT | 02 /
Fuganti, Claudio Via G.B. Nazari 8 20129 Milano / IT | 03 /
Serra, Stefano Via A. Casati 15 20040 Usmate-Velate / IT | 04 /
Pizzocaro, Francesco Via XX Settembre 43 20024 Garbagnate M. SE. / IT | 05 /
Bedeschi, Angelo Via XX Settembre 43 20024 Garbagnate M. SE. / IT | 06 /
Tubertini, Paolo Via XX Settembre 43 20024 Garbagnate M. SE. / IT | [2006/37] | Representative(s) | Minoja, Fabrizio, et al Bianchetti & Minoja S.r.l. Via Plinio, 63 20129 Milano / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2015/19] | Bianchetti, Giuseppe Bianchetti Bracco Minoja S.r.l. Via Plinio 63 20129 Milano / IT | ||
Former [2006/37] | Bianchetti, Giuseppe Bianchetti Bracco Minoja S.r.l. Via Plinio, 63 20129 Milano / IT | Application number, filing date | 06004552.3 | 07.03.2006 | [2006/37] | Priority number, date | IT2005MI00357 | 08.03.2005 Original published format: IT MI20050357 | [2006/37] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1700855 | Date: | 13.09.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/37] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1700855 | Date: | 06.05.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/19] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.08.2006 | Classification | IPC: | C07D409/06 | [2006/37] | CPC: |
C07D409/06 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2015/19] |
Former [2006/37] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Ein Verfahren zur Herstellung von Tazaroten | [2006/37] | English: | A process for the preparation of tazarotene | [2006/37] | French: | Un procédé pour la préparation de tazarotene | [2006/37] | Examination procedure | 13.03.2007 | Examination requested [2007/17] | 14.05.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 11.10.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.11.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.03.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 27.03.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 27.03.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 14.05.2007 | Opposition(s) | 09.02.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/15] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 18.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 27.03.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 07.03.2006 | CY | 06.05.2015 | CZ | 06.05.2015 | EE | 06.05.2015 | LT | 06.05.2015 | LV | 06.05.2015 | MC | 06.05.2015 | SI | 06.05.2015 | SK | 06.05.2015 | BG | 06.08.2015 | GR | 07.08.2015 | IS | 06.09.2015 | PT | 07.09.2015 | [2018/28] |
Former [2016/49] | CZ | 06.05.2015 | |
EE | 06.05.2015 | ||
LT | 06.05.2015 | ||
LV | 06.05.2015 | ||
MC | 06.05.2015 | ||
SI | 06.05.2015 | ||
SK | 06.05.2015 | ||
BG | 06.08.2015 | ||
GR | 07.08.2015 | ||
IS | 06.09.2015 | ||
PT | 07.09.2015 | ||
Former [2016/24] | CZ | 06.05.2015 | |
EE | 06.05.2015 | ||
LT | 06.05.2015 | ||
LV | 06.05.2015 | ||
SI | 06.05.2015 | ||
SK | 06.05.2015 | ||
BG | 06.08.2015 | ||
GR | 07.08.2015 | ||
IS | 06.09.2015 | ||
PT | 07.09.2015 | ||
Former [2016/10] | CZ | 06.05.2015 | |
EE | 06.05.2015 | ||
LT | 06.05.2015 | ||
LV | 06.05.2015 | ||
SK | 06.05.2015 | ||
BG | 06.08.2015 | ||
GR | 07.08.2015 | ||
IS | 06.09.2015 | ||
PT | 07.09.2015 | ||
Former [2016/09] | EE | 06.05.2015 | |
LT | 06.05.2015 | ||
LV | 06.05.2015 | ||
BG | 06.08.2015 | ||
GR | 07.08.2015 | ||
IS | 06.09.2015 | ||
PT | 07.09.2015 | ||
Former [2015/50] | LT | 06.05.2015 | |
LV | 06.05.2015 | ||
BG | 06.08.2015 | ||
GR | 07.08.2015 | ||
IS | 06.09.2015 | ||
PT | 07.09.2015 | ||
Former [2015/49] | LT | 06.05.2015 | |
LV | 06.05.2015 | ||
GR | 07.08.2015 | ||
PT | 07.09.2015 | Documents cited: | Search | [DA]EP0419132 (ALLERGAN INC [US]) [DA] 1-13 * the whole document *; | JP2003313166 [ ] (MITSUI CHEMICALS INC); | [E]WO2006040644 (RANBAXY LAB LTD [IN], et al) [E] 13 * page 39 - page 40; claim 9 *; | [X] - OCHI, TAKAHIKO ET AL, "Di(substituted pyridinyl)acetylenes, and their liquid crystal compositions and displays", CA, CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS SERVICE, COLUMBUS, OHIO, US, Database accession no. 2003:868107, URL: STN, XP002390248 [X] 13 * abstract; and the compounds with the Registry -Numbers [220882-43-9] and [622374-63-4] * | [PX] - FRIGOLI, SAMUELE ET AL, "A Practical and Efficient Process for the Preparation of Tazarotene", ORGANIC PROCESS RESEARCH & DEVELOPMENT , 9(5), 646-650 CODEN: OPRDFK; ISSN: 1083-6160, (2005), XP002390244 [PX] 1-13 * the whole document * | by applicant | EP0284261 | EP0284288 | US5023341 | US5089509 | US5659042 | US5717094 | - NEGISHI, AND.; ANASTASIA, L., CHEM. REV., (2003), vol. 103, pages 1979 - 2017 | - SONOGASHIRA, K.; TOHDA, Y.; HAGIHARA N., TETRAHEDRON LETT., (1975), vol. 50, pages 4467 - 4470 | - BLEICHER, L.S. ET AL., J. ORG. CHEM., (1998), vol. 63, pages 1109 - 1118 | - J. ORG. CHEM., (1985), vol. 50, pages 1763 - 1765 | - MADESCLAIRE, M., TETRAHEDRON, (1988), vol. 44, pages 6537 - 6580 |