EP1734486 - Sheet identification apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 18.02.2011 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.02.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 23.03.2011 [2011/12] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kabushiki Kaisha Toshiba 1-1 Shibaura 1-chome, Minato-ku Tokyo 105-8001 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2006/51] | For all designated states KABUSHIKI KAISHA TOSHIBA 1-1 Shibaura 1-chome, Minato-ku Tokyo 105-8001 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Uno, Teruhiko c/o Kabushiki Kaisha Toshiba, 1-1 Shibaura 1-chome Minato-ku, Tokyo / JP | 02 /
Higashi, Ryuuji c/o Kabushiki Kaisha Toshiba, 1-1 Shibaura 1-chome Minato-ku, Tokyo / JP | 03 /
Kochiwa, Masahito c/o Kabushiki Kaisha Toshiba, 1-1 Shibaura 1-chome Minato-ku, Tokyo / JP | 04 /
Suzuki, Hidetake c/o Kabushiki Kaisha Toshiba, 1-1 Shibaura 1-chome Minato-ku, Tokyo / JP | [2006/51] | Representative(s) | Kramer Barske Schmidtchen Patentanwälte PartG mbB European Patent Attorneys Landsberger Strasse 300 80687 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/39] | Kramer - Barske - Schmidtchen European Patent Attorneys Landsberger Strasse 300 80687 München / DE | ||
Former [2006/51] | Kramer - Barske - Schmidtchen Radeckestrasse 43 81245 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 06004725.5 | 08.03.2006 | [2006/51] | Priority number, date | JP20050178086 | 17.06.2005 Original published format: JP 2005178086 | [2006/51] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1734486 | Date: | 20.12.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/51] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1734486 | Date: | 21.05.2008 | [2008/21] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.04.2008 | Classification | IPC: | G07D7/04, G07D7/16 | [2006/51] | CPC: |
G07D7/04 (EP,US);
G07D7/17 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, DE, FR, GB, IT [2009/05] |
Former [2006/51] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zur Blattidentifizierung | [2006/51] | English: | Sheet identification apparatus | [2006/51] | French: | Appareil d'identification de feuilles | [2006/51] | Examination procedure | 08.03.2006 | Examination requested [2006/51] | 11.07.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 22.11.2008 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 05.01.2009 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 19.01.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.10.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2011/12] | 05.11.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2011/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2010 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [YA]GB2309298 (MARS INC [US]); | [XY]WO9800815 (DE LA RUE SYST [GB]); | [YA]EP1221679 (RUE DE INT LTD [GB]) | by applicant | GB2309298 | WO9800815 | JPH11505353 | EP1221679 |