EP1832717 - Method for influencing the blade tip flow of an axial turbomachine and annular channel for the main axial flow through a turbomachine [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 08.08.2008 Database last updated on 03.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.08.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 10.09.2008 [2008/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Werner-von-Siemens-Str. 1 DE-80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2007/37] | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Wittelsbacherplatz 2 80333 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bayere, Romain Sedanstrasse 24 45138 Essen / DE | 02 /
Blomeyer, Malte, Dr. Gracht 163 A 45472 Mülheim an der Ruhr / DE | 03 /
Cornelius, Christian, Dr. Sirrenbergstrasse 56 45549 Sprockhövel / DE | 04 /
Matthias, Torsten Eppinghofer Strasse 169 45468 Mülheim an der Ruhr / DE | 05 /
Sieber, Uwe, Dr. Im Fichtenhain 20 51059 Köln / DE | [2007/37] | Application number, filing date | 06004866.7 | 09.03.2006 | [2007/37] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1832717 | Date: | 12.09.2007 | Language: | DE | [2007/37] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.06.2006 | Classification | IPC: | F01D11/08, F01D11/10, F01D5/14, F01D17/10, F04D27/02, F04D29/68 | [2007/37] | CPC: |
F01D5/143 (EP);
F01D11/08 (EP);
F01D11/10 (EP);
F01D17/105 (EP);
F01D5/145 (EP);
F04D27/0207 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | [2008/21] |
Former [2007/37] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Verfahren zum Beeinflussen der spaltnahen Strömung einer axial durchströmten Strömungsmaschine sowie ringförmiger Strömungskanal für eine in Axialrichtung von einem Hauptstrom durchströmbare Strömungsmaschine | [2007/37] | English: | Method for influencing the blade tip flow of an axial turbomachine and annular channel for the main axial flow through a turbomachine | [2007/37] | French: | Procédé pour modifier le flux d'air de bout d'aube dans une turbomachine axiale et canal annulaire pour l'écoulement axial du fluide dans une turbomachine | [2007/37] | Examination procedure | 13.03.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2008/37] | 22.04.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2008/37] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2008 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JPH06207558 ; | [X]EP0606475 (EBARA CORP [JP]) [X] 1-4,8-16,19 * column 15, line 14 - line 31; figure 12 *; | [X]US4580943 (SCULLY ANDREW J [US]) [X] 1-4,8-16,19 * column 2, line 60 - line 66; figure . *; | [X]US5431533 (HOBBS DAVID E [US]) [X] 1,4,6,8-10,12,14-16,19 * figures 5-7 *; | [X]US3572960 (MCBRIDE JAMES W) [X] 1,4,8,9,14-16,19 * column 3, line 13 - line 22 * * column 4, line 39 - line 46; figure 1 *; | [X]DE881743 (MESSERSCHMITT BOELKOW BLOHM) [X] 1,4,8,9,14-16,19 * page 2, line 68 - line 76; figure . * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19941031), vol. 018, no. 569, Database accession no. (M - 1695), & JP06207558 A 19940726 (ISHIKAWAJIMA HARIMA HEAVY IND CO LTD) [X] 1-4,6,8-19 * abstract * | by applicant | EP0719907 | EP1286022 |