Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
26.04.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 29.05.2013 [2013/22] |
22.03.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 24.04.2013 [2013/17] |
13.04.2012 | (Expected) grant | published on 16.05.2012 [2012/20] |
05.04.2012 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
02.03.2012 | New entry: Payment of fee for grant | |
02.03.2012 | New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing | |
07.12.2011 | New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent | |
29.03.2011 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
30.03.2010 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
04.03.2009 | New entry: Reply to examination report | |
10.10.2008 | Change - first examination report | published on 12.11.2008 [2008/46] |
07.10.2008 | New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit | |
10.04.2008 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
08.04.2008 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
03.08.2007 | Definitive list of designations | published on 05.09.2007 [2007/36] |
23.03.2007 | Amendment by applicant | |
23.03.2007 | Deletion: Despatch of examination report + time limit | |
09.03.2007 | First examination report | |
08.03.2007 | New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit | |
16.02.2007 | Request for examination filed | published on 21.03.2007 [2007/12] |
01.12.2006 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 03.01.2007 [2007/01] |