Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US7790781 | Global Dossier | 07.09.2010 | B2 | US2007004821 | 04.01.2007 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE102005031201 | 01.07.2005 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1738737 | Global Dossier | 16.05.2012 | B1 | EP1738737 | 03.01.2007 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE102005031201 | 01.07.2005 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE102005031201 | 25.01.2007 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE102005031201 | 01.07.2005 |