EP1738737 - Dimensionally stable articles from cured condensation-crosslinked dental material [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.03.2013 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.04.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 29.05.2013 [2013/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kettenbach GmbH & CO. KG Im Heerfeld 7 35713 Eschenburg / DE | [2007/01] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bublewitz, Alexander. Dr Waldstrasse 27 35745 Herborn / DE | 02 /
Reber, Jens-Peter. Dr Goethestrasse 45 58540 Meinerzhagen / DE | [2007/01] | Representative(s) | Keil & Schaafhausen Patentanwälte PartGmbB Bockenheimer Landstraße 25 60325 Frankfurt am Main / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/20] | KEIL & SCHAAFHAUSEN Patentanwälte Cronstettenstraße 66 60322 Frankfurt am Main / DE | ||
Former [2007/01] | KEIL & SCHAAFHAUSEN Patentanwälte Cronstettenstrasse 66 60322 Frankfurt am Main / DE | Application number, filing date | 06004915.2 | 10.03.2006 | [2007/01] | Priority number, date | DE20051031201 | 01.07.2005 Original published format: DE102005031201 | [2007/01] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1738737 | Date: | 03.01.2007 | Language: | DE | [2007/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1738737 | Date: | 16.05.2012 | Language: | DE | [2012/20] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.11.2006 | Classification | IPC: | A61K6/10, A61K6/093 | [2007/01] | CPC: |
A61K6/90 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
A61K6/90, C08L83/12 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI [2007/36] |
Former [2007/01] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Zu formstabilen Formkörpern aushärtendes kondensationsvernetzendes Dentalmaterial | [2007/01] | English: | Dimensionally stable articles from cured condensation-crosslinked dental material | [2007/01] | French: | Articles indéformables de matériau dentaire réticulant par condensation | [2007/01] | Examination procedure | 30.01.2007 | Examination requested [2007/12] | 03.03.2007 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 10.10.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.02.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.12.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.02.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 23.02.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 10.10.2008 | Opposition(s) | 19.02.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | ES | 27.08.2012 | [2013/22] | Documents cited: | Search | [DY]EP1226808 (HERAEUS KULZER GMBH & CO KG [DE]) [DY] 1-21 * paragraphs [0007] , [0021] - paragraph [0022] * * example - * * claim - *; | [Y]EP0748621 (BAYER AG [DE]) [Y] 1-21 * page 3, line 42 - line 46 *; | [A]EP1402873 (HERAEUS KULZER GMBH & CO KG [DE]) [A] 1-21 * tables 1,3 * * claim - *; | [PX]WO2005077321 (KETTENBACH GMBH & CO KG [DE], et al) [PX] 1-21 * claim - * | by applicant | DE10104079 | EP0629819 | DE10139132 | US4906707 | EP0372561 | EP1303560 | EP0170865 | US4160778 | EP1339373 | DE3502594 | DE10061195 | EP0723807 | EP0541972 | EP0492412 | EP0492413 | EP0956908 | - Ullmann Encyclopädie der Technischen Chemie, vol. 21, page 523 | - ZM, vol. 93, no. 15, page 32 FF | WO1998EP01993 |