EP1739043 - Paper processing apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 11.05.2007 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.08.2008 | Change - representative | published on 24.09.2008 [2008/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kabushiki Kaisha Toshiba 1-1 Shibaura 1-chome, Minato-ku Tokyo 105-8001 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2007/01] | For all designated states KABUSHIKI KAISHA TOSHIBA 1-1 Shibaura 1-chome, Minato-ku Tokyo 105-8001 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Yamamoto, Yoshihiro Intellectual Property Division Toshiba Corporation 1-1-1, Shibaura Minato-ku Tokyo 105-8001 / JP | [2007/01] | Representative(s) | Kramer Barske Schmidtchen Patentanwälte PartG mbB European Patent Attorneys Landsberger Strasse 300 80687 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/39] | Kramer - Barske - Schmidtchen European Patent Attorneys Landsberger Strasse 300 80687 München / DE | ||
Former [2007/01] | Kramer - Barske - Schmidtchen Radeckestrasse 43 81245 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 06005073.9 | 13.03.2006 | [2007/01] | Priority number, date | JP20050190678 | 29.06.2005 Original published format: JP 2005190678 | [2007/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1739043 | Date: | 03.01.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/01] | Classification | IPC: | B65H29/58 | [2007/01] | CPC: |
B65H29/58 (EP,US);
B65H2511/212 (EP,US);
B65H2553/60 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
B65H2511/212, B65H2220/01, B65H2220/11 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/01] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Papierverarbeitungsvorrichtung | [2007/01] | English: | Paper processing apparatus | [2007/01] | French: | Appareil de traitement de papier | [2007/01] | Examination procedure | 13.03.2006 | Examination requested [2007/01] | 27.04.2007 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2007/24] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | by applicant | JPH0891690 |