EP1835035 - A process for immobilizing cells on a resin [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.12.2010 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.09.2012 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): LU | published on 24.10.2012 [2012/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states EXPLORA Laboratories SA Via Rime, 38 6850 Mendrisio / CH | [2007/38] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Zuffi, Gabriele Via Rucellai, 14 21100 Varese / IT | 02 /
Monciardini, Simone Via Walder, 18 21100 Varese / IT | [2007/38] | Representative(s) | Zardi, Marco M. Zardi & Co. SA Via Pioda 6 6900 Lugano / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2008/37] | Zardi, Marco M. Zardi & Co. S.A. Via Pioda 6 6900 Lugano / CH | ||
Former [2007/38] | Zardi, Marco M. Zardi & Co. S.A. Via Pioda 6 6900 Lugano / CH | Application number, filing date | 06005241.2 | 15.03.2006 | [2007/38] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1835035 | Date: | 19.09.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/38] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1835035 | Date: | 17.02.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/07] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.09.2006 | Classification | IPC: | C12P19/40, C12N11/08, C12N15/70 | [2007/38] | CPC: |
C12N9/1077 (EP,US);
C12N11/091 (EP,US);
C12N11/082 (EP,US);
C12P19/40 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/38] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Immobilisierung von Zellen auf Harzen | [2007/38] | English: | A process for immobilizing cells on a resin | [2007/38] | French: | Procédé pour l'immobilisation de cellules sur une résine | [2007/38] | Examination procedure | 28.11.2006 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 28.11.2006 | Examination requested [2007/38] | 16.08.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.12.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.04.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.08.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.09.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.12.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 18.12.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 18.11.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/04] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 17.02.2010 | BE | 17.02.2010 | CY | 17.02.2010 | DK | 17.02.2010 | EE | 17.02.2010 | FI | 17.02.2010 | LT | 17.02.2010 | NL | 17.02.2010 | SE | 17.02.2010 | LU | 15.03.2010 | MC | 31.03.2010 | BG | 17.05.2010 | IS | 17.06.2010 | [2012/43] |
Former [2011/08] | AT | 17.02.2010 | |
BE | 17.02.2010 | ||
CY | 17.02.2010 | ||
DK | 17.02.2010 | ||
EE | 17.02.2010 | ||
FI | 17.02.2010 | ||
LT | 17.02.2010 | ||
NL | 17.02.2010 | ||
SE | 17.02.2010 | ||
MC | 31.03.2010 | ||
BG | 17.05.2010 | ||
IS | 17.06.2010 | ||
Former [2011/02] | AT | 17.02.2010 | |
BE | 17.02.2010 | ||
CY | 17.02.2010 | ||
EE | 17.02.2010 | ||
FI | 17.02.2010 | ||
LT | 17.02.2010 | ||
NL | 17.02.2010 | ||
SE | 17.02.2010 | ||
MC | 31.03.2010 | ||
BG | 17.05.2010 | ||
IS | 17.06.2010 | ||
Former [2010/45] | AT | 17.02.2010 | |
FI | 17.02.2010 | ||
LT | 17.02.2010 | ||
NL | 17.02.2010 | ||
MC | 31.03.2010 | ||
IS | 17.06.2010 | ||
Former [2010/40] | AT | 17.02.2010 | |
FI | 17.02.2010 | ||
LT | 17.02.2010 | ||
IS | 17.06.2010 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0361165 (CULTOR OY [FI]) [X] 1-4 * the whole document *; | [X]WO9744478 (XYROFIN OY [FI], et al) [X] 1-7,9 * the whole document *; | [X]WO0039307 (NORPHARMA SPA [IT], et al) [X] 17,18 * the whole document *; | [X]EP1439220 (KERYOS SPA [IT]) [X] 17,18 * the whole document *; | [X] - SPOLDI E ET AL, "RECOMBINANT BACTERIAL CELLS AS EFFICIENT BIOCATALYSTS FOR THE PRODUCTION OF NUCLEOSIDES", NUCLEOSIDES, NUCLEOTIDES AND NUCLEIC ACIDS, TAYLOR & FRANCIS, PHILADELPHIA, PA, US, (200104), vol. 20, no. 4-7, ISSN 1525-7770, pages 977 - 979, XP009009766 [X] 17,18 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1081/NCN-100002472 |