EP1834693 - Structured packing of woven tissue [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.12.2008 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.12.2010 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): GR | published on 12.01.2011 [2011/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states T & R engineering GmbH Marler Strasse 109 46282 Dorsten / DE | For all designated states BASF SE Carl-Bosch-Strasse 38 67056 Ludwigshafen am Rhein / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/10] | For all designated states T & R engineering GmbH Wieselweg 34 59071 Hamm / DE | ||
For all designated states BASF SE 67056 Ludwigshafen / DE | |||
Former [2007/38] | For all designated states T & R engineering GmbH Wieselweg 34 59071 Hamm / DE | ||
For all designated states Basf AG 67056 Ludwigshafen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Tüshaus, Rüdiger Söltener Landweg 174 46286 Dorsten / DE | 02 /
Rössler, Peter Wieselweg 34 59071 Hamm / DE | 03 /
Friese, Thorsten Nibelungenring 40 68199 Mannheim / DE | 04 /
Jödecke, Michael Johannes Kapper Strasse 8 67240 Bobenheim-Roxheim / DE | [2007/38] | Representative(s) | Griepenstroh, Jörg Bockermann Ksoll Griepenstroh Osterhoff Patentanwälte Bergstrasse 159 44791 Bochum / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2007/38] | Griepenstroh, Jörg Patentanwälte Bockermann, Ksoll Griepenstroh, Bergstrasse 159 44791 Bochum / DE | Application number, filing date | 06005263.6 | 15.03.2006 | [2007/38] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1834693 | Date: | 19.09.2007 | Language: | DE | [2007/38] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1834693 | Date: | 20.02.2008 | Language: | DE | [2008/08] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.07.2006 | Classification | IPC: | B01J19/32 | [2007/38] | CPC: |
B01J19/325 (EP,US);
B01J19/32 (EP,US);
B01J2219/3221 (EP,US);
B01J2219/32213 (EP,US);
B01J2219/32251 (EP,US);
B01J2219/32258 (EP,US);
B01J2219/32416 (EP,US);
B01J2219/32483 (EP,US);
B01J2219/32491 (EP,US);
Y10S261/72 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/38] | Title | German: | Gewebepackung | [2007/38] | English: | Structured packing of woven tissue | [2007/38] | French: | Corps de remplissage en tissu | [2007/38] | Examination procedure | 21.09.2006 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.09.2006 | Examination requested [2007/38] | 08.10.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.12.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 28.12.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 21.11.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/05] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 20.02.2008 | CZ | 20.02.2008 | DK | 20.02.2008 | EE | 20.02.2008 | FI | 20.02.2008 | IE | 20.02.2008 | LT | 20.02.2008 | LV | 20.02.2008 | PL | 20.02.2008 | RO | 20.02.2008 | SI | 20.02.2008 | SK | 20.02.2008 | TR | 20.02.2008 | AT | 15.03.2008 | LU | 15.03.2008 | MC | 31.03.2008 | BG | 20.05.2008 | SE | 20.05.2008 | GR | 21.05.2008 | IS | 20.06.2008 | PT | 21.07.2008 | HU | 21.08.2008 | [2011/02] |
Former [2010/40] | CY | 20.02.2008 | |
CZ | 20.02.2008 | ||
DK | 20.02.2008 | ||
EE | 20.02.2008 | ||
FI | 20.02.2008 | ||
IE | 20.02.2008 | ||
LT | 20.02.2008 | ||
LV | 20.02.2008 | ||
PL | 20.02.2008 | ||
RO | 20.02.2008 | ||
SI | 20.02.2008 | ||
SK | 20.02.2008 | ||
TR | 20.02.2008 | ||
AT | 15.03.2008 | ||
LU | 15.03.2008 | ||
MC | 31.03.2008 | ||
BG | 20.05.2008 | ||
SE | 20.05.2008 | ||
IS | 20.06.2008 | ||
PT | 21.07.2008 | ||
HU | 21.08.2008 | ||
Former [2010/33] | CY | 20.02.2008 | |
CZ | 20.02.2008 | ||
DK | 20.02.2008 | ||
EE | 20.02.2008 | ||
FI | 20.02.2008 | ||
IE | 20.02.2008 | ||
LT | 20.02.2008 | ||
LV | 20.02.2008 | ||
PL | 20.02.2008 | ||
RO | 20.02.2008 | ||
SI | 20.02.2008 | ||
SK | 20.02.2008 | ||
AT | 15.03.2008 | ||
LU | 15.03.2008 | ||
MC | 31.03.2008 | ||
BG | 20.05.2008 | ||
SE | 20.05.2008 | ||
IS | 20.06.2008 | ||
PT | 21.07.2008 | ||
Former [2010/01] | CY | 20.02.2008 | |
CZ | 20.02.2008 | ||
DK | 20.02.2008 | ||
EE | 20.02.2008 | ||
FI | 20.02.2008 | ||
IE | 20.02.2008 | ||
LT | 20.02.2008 | ||
LV | 20.02.2008 | ||
PL | 20.02.2008 | ||
RO | 20.02.2008 | ||
SI | 20.02.2008 | ||
SK | 20.02.2008 | ||
AT | 15.03.2008 | ||
MC | 31.03.2008 | ||
BG | 20.05.2008 | ||
SE | 20.05.2008 | ||
IS | 20.06.2008 | ||
PT | 21.07.2008 | ||
Former [2009/28] | CZ | 20.02.2008 | |
DK | 20.02.2008 | ||
EE | 20.02.2008 | ||
FI | 20.02.2008 | ||
IE | 20.02.2008 | ||
LT | 20.02.2008 | ||
LV | 20.02.2008 | ||
PL | 20.02.2008 | ||
RO | 20.02.2008 | ||
SI | 20.02.2008 | ||
SK | 20.02.2008 | ||
MC | 31.03.2008 | ||
BG | 20.05.2008 | ||
SE | 20.05.2008 | ||
IS | 20.06.2008 | ||
PT | 21.07.2008 | ||
Former [2009/12] | CZ | 20.02.2008 | |
DK | 20.02.2008 | ||
EE | 20.02.2008 | ||
FI | 20.02.2008 | ||
IE | 20.02.2008 | ||
LT | 20.02.2008 | ||
LV | 20.02.2008 | ||
PL | 20.02.2008 | ||
RO | 20.02.2008 | ||
SI | 20.02.2008 | ||
SK | 20.02.2008 | ||
MC | 31.03.2008 | ||
SE | 20.05.2008 | ||
IS | 20.06.2008 | ||
PT | 21.07.2008 | ||
Former [2008/49] | CZ | 20.02.2008 | |
DK | 20.02.2008 | ||
FI | 20.02.2008 | ||
IE | 20.02.2008 | ||
LV | 20.02.2008 | ||
PL | 20.02.2008 | ||
RO | 20.02.2008 | ||
SI | 20.02.2008 | ||
SK | 20.02.2008 | ||
MC | 31.03.2008 | ||
SE | 20.05.2008 | ||
IS | 20.06.2008 | ||
PT | 21.07.2008 | ||
Former [2008/48] | DK | 20.02.2008 | |
FI | 20.02.2008 | ||
IE | 20.02.2008 | ||
LV | 20.02.2008 | ||
PL | 20.02.2008 | ||
SI | 20.02.2008 | ||
MC | 31.03.2008 | ||
SE | 20.05.2008 | ||
IS | 20.06.2008 | ||
Former [2008/46] | DK | 20.02.2008 | |
FI | 20.02.2008 | ||
LV | 20.02.2008 | ||
PL | 20.02.2008 | ||
SI | 20.02.2008 | ||
MC | 31.03.2008 | ||
SE | 20.05.2008 | ||
IS | 20.06.2008 | ||
Former [2008/44] | FI | 20.02.2008 | |
LV | 20.02.2008 | ||
PL | 20.02.2008 | ||
SI | 20.02.2008 | ||
IS | 20.06.2008 | ||
Former [2008/43] | FI | 20.02.2008 | |
PL | 20.02.2008 | ||
IS | 20.06.2008 | ||
Former [2008/36] | FI | 20.02.2008 | |
IS | 20.06.2008 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPH09177725 ; | [A]DE3222892 (MONTZ GMBH JULIUS [DE]) [A] 1-22* the whole document *; | [X]EP0401580 (HOECHST AG [DE]) [X] 1,2,4-9,19,20 * the whole document *; | [X]EP0416649 (VYZK USTAV CHEM ZARIZENI [CS]) [X] 1,19-22 * column 1, line 1 - column 3, line 17 * * column 5, line 53 - column 6, line 17; figures 1-4 * * abstract *; | [X]EP1033168 (NAGAOKA TADAYOSHI [JP]) [X] 1,2,19,20 * paragraphs [0001] , [0007] * * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19971128), vol. 1997, no. 11, & JP09177725 A 19970711 (ERIITEKU KK) [A] 1-22 * abstract * |