EP1835233 - Expansion vessel having a bladder [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 12.09.2008 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.09.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 15.10.2008 [2008/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Winkelmann Sp. z o.o. Ul. Jaworzynska 277 59220 Legnica / PL | [2007/38] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Winkelmann, Heinrich Auf dem Westkamp 26 59227 Ahlen / DE | [2007/38] | Representative(s) | Meinke, Dabringhaus und Partner GbR Rosa-Luxemburg-Strasse 18 44141 Dortmund / DE | [2007/38] | Application number, filing date | 06005360.0 | 16.03.2006 | [2007/38] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1835233 | Date: | 19.09.2007 | Language: | DE | [2007/38] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.09.2006 | Classification | IPC: | F24D3/10 | [2007/38] | CPC: |
F24D3/1008 (EP);
F24D3/1016 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | (deleted) [2008/22] |
Former [2007/38] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Membrandruckausdehnungsgefäss | [2007/38] | English: | Expansion vessel having a bladder | [2007/38] | French: | Vase d'expansion avec membrane | [2007/38] | Examination procedure | 20.03.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2008/42] | 06.05.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2008/42] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2008 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]DE3544754 (VIESSMANN WERKE KG [DE]) [X] 1-4,6-12 * the whole document * [Y] 5; | [Y]US4437590 (LABRUNA ANTHONY J [US]) [Y] 5 * column 1, line 41 - line 50 * * column 2; figure 1 *; | [DA]DE2905887 (OTTO GEB KG) [DA] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]DE10347884 (REFLEX WINKELMANN GMBH & CO KG [DE]) [A] 1 * the whole document * | by applicant | DE2814162 | DE2905887 |