EP1702631 - Polyolefin sutures having enhanced durability [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.05.2011 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.05.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 22.06.2011 [2011/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Tyco Healthcare Group LP 150 Glover Avenue Norwalk, Connecticut 06856 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2010/28] | For all designated states Tyco Healthcare Group LP 150 Glover Avenue Norwalk, CT 06856 / US | ||
Former [2006/38] | For all designated states Tyco Healthcare Group LP 150 Glover Avenue Norwalk, Connecticut 06856 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Cuevas, Brian J. 66 Rolling Green Middletown, CT 06457 / US | 02 /
Schiretz, Frank R. 131 Dove Lane Middletown, CT 06457 / US | 03 /
Cohen, Matthew D. 37 Old Wood Road Berlin, CT 06037 / US | 04 /
Hotter, Joseph 540 Mapple Shade Road Middletown, CT 06457 / US | [2006/38] | Representative(s) | Soames, Candida Jane, et al Maschio & Soames IP Limited 30 Carlton Crescent Southampton SO15 2EW / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2009/46] | Soames, Candida Jane, et al Edwards Angell Palmer & Dodge Innovations LLP 10 Carlton Crescent Southampton SO15 2EZ / GB | ||
Former [2006/38] | HOFFMANN EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 06005364.2 | 16.03.2006 | [2006/38] | Priority number, date | US20050081390 | 16.03.2005 Original published format: US 81390 | [2006/38] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1702631 | Date: | 20.09.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/38] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1702631 | Date: | 26.09.2007 | [2007/39] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1702631 | Date: | 14.07.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/28] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.08.2007 | Classification | IPC: | A61L17/04 | [2006/38] | CPC: |
A61L17/04 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IE, IT [2008/23] |
Former [2006/38] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Polyolefin-Nähfäden mit verbesserter Haltbarkeit | [2006/38] | English: | Polyolefin sutures having enhanced durability | [2006/38] | French: | Sutures polyoléfines à durabilitées ameliorées | [2006/38] | Examination procedure | 17.01.2008 | Examination requested [2008/09] | 25.03.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.07.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.02.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.05.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 11.05.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 15.04.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/25] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]WO9708238 (EXXON CHEMICAL PATENTS INC [US]) [X] 1-5 * page 1, line 13 - line 17 * * page 1, line 31 - line 34 * * page 9, line 20 - line 24 * * claims 1,2,7-11,13 * [Y] 6-8,10,11,13-18; | [Y]US2002177876 (ROBY MARK S [US], et al) [Y] 6-8,10,11,13-18 * page 1, paragraphs 2,7,11,15 * * page 2, paragraph 16 * * page 3, paragraph 30 * * claims 1-3,6,9,13-16,18 *; | [PX]WO2005080495 (EXXONMOBIL CHEM PATENTS INC [US], et al) [PX] 1-5,9,12 * page 5, line 12 - line 15 * * page 41, line 30 - page 42, line 8 * * page 61, line 22 - page 62, line 3 * * claims 1,17,18,20-23,39 * |