EP1703316 - Optical beam splitting element and projector comprising such an element [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 21.03.2008 Database last updated on 21.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.03.2008 | Withdrawal of application | published on 23.04.2008 [2008/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Seiko Epson Corporation 4-1, Nishi-Shinjuku 2-chome Shinjuku-ku Tokyo 163-0811 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2006/38] | For all designated states SEIKO EPSON CORPORATION 4-1, Nishi-shinjuku 2-chome Shinjuku-ku Tokyo 163-0811 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hara, Kazuhiro c/o Seiko Epson Corporation 3-5 Owa 3-chome Suwa-shi Nagano-ken 392-8502 / JP | 02 /
Uehara, Takehiko c/o Seiko Epson Corporation 3-5 Owa 3-chome Suwa-shi Nagano-ken 392-8502 / JP | 03 /
Mukaiyama, Hiroyuki c/o Seiko Epson Corporation 3-5 Owa 3-chome Suwa-shi Nagano-ken 392-8502 / JP | [2006/38] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastrasse 30 81925 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2006/38] | HOFFMANN EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 06005368.3 | 16.03.2006 | [2006/38] | Priority number, date | JP20050076858 | 17.03.2005 Original published format: JP 2005076858 | JP20050268119 | 15.09.2005 Original published format: JP 2005268119 | [2006/38] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1703316 | Date: | 20.09.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/38] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.08.2006 | Classification | IPC: | G02F1/13363, G02B27/28, H04N9/31, // G02F1/1335 | [2006/38] | CPC: |
H04N9/3105 (EP,US);
G02B27/283 (EP,US);
G02F1/13363 (EP,US);
G02F1/133512 (EP,US);
G02F1/133637 (EP,US);
G02F1/133638 (EP,US);
G02F2413/04 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2007/21] |
Former [2006/38] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Optisches, strahlteilendes Bauelement und Projektor mit einem solchen Element | [2006/38] | English: | Optical beam splitting element and projector comprising such an element | [2006/38] | French: | Elément optique diviseur de faisceaux et projecteur pour un tel élément | [2006/38] | Examination procedure | 20.11.2006 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.01.2007 | Examination requested [2007/12] | 10.03.2008 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2008/17] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]WO2005008332 (SEIKO EPSON CORP [JP]) [Y] 1-6 * abstract *; | [PY]US2005078278 (UEHARA KATSUYUKI [JP], et al) [PY] 1-6 * paragraphs [0033] , [0037] , [0038] , [0045] - [0047] * * figures 1,3A-3D,4A,4B *; | [Y]US6081346 (TERAJIMA AKIROU [JP], et al) [Y] 1-6 * column 8, line 29 - line 43 * * figure 5 *; | [Y]EP1011014 (NORITSU KOKI CO LTD [JP]) [Y] 1-6 * figures 7,8 * * paragraphs [0076] - [0080] * | by applicant | JPS643834 |