EP1834755 - Welding method and apparatus for compensation of position and angle [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.04.2009 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.09.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, TR | published on 02.11.2011 [2011/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Oxenfarth, Hans Wulfhorststrasse 28 58256 Ennepetal / DE | [2007/38] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2007/38] | Representative(s) | Dörner, Lothar Patentanwälte Dörner & Kötter PartG mbB Körnerstrasse 27 58095 Hagen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2007/38] | Dörner, Lothar Stresemannstrasse 15 58095 Hagen / DE | Application number, filing date | 06005467.3 | 17.03.2006 | [2007/38] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1834755 | Date: | 19.09.2007 | Language: | DE | [2007/38] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1834755 | Date: | 11.06.2008 | Language: | DE | [2008/24] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.06.2007 | Classification | IPC: | B29C65/78, // B29C65/20 | [2007/38] | CPC: |
B29C65/20 (EP,US);
B25J9/1682 (EP,US);
B29C65/1432 (EP,US);
B29C65/1464 (EP,US);
B29C65/7802 (EP,US);
B29C66/53246 (EP,US);
B29C66/712 (EP,US);
B29C66/8169 (EP,US);
B29C66/863 (EP,US);
G01S17/88 (EP,US);
B29C2791/001 (EP,US);
B29C49/04 (EP,US);
B29C65/08 (EP,US);
B29C66/0042 (EP,US);
B29C66/0044 (EP,US);
B29C66/8163 (EP,US);
B29C66/8167 (EP,US);
B29C66/8322 (EP,US);
B29L2031/7172 (EP,US);
B60K15/03177 (EP,US);
G01S13/881 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/38] | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zum lage- und winkelkompensierten Schweissen | [2007/38] | English: | Welding method and apparatus for compensation of position and angle | [2007/38] | French: | Procédé et dispositif de soudage pour compenser la position et l'angle | [2007/38] | Examination procedure | 27.09.2007 | Examination requested [2007/46] | 25.10.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.11.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.01.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.03.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 27.03.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 12.03.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.02.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 11.06.2008 | DK | 11.06.2008 | EE | 11.06.2008 | FI | 11.06.2008 | IE | 11.06.2008 | LT | 11.06.2008 | LV | 11.06.2008 | NL | 11.06.2008 | SI | 11.06.2008 | TR | 11.06.2008 | BG | 11.09.2008 | SE | 11.09.2008 | GR | 12.09.2008 | ES | 22.09.2008 | IS | 11.10.2008 | PT | 11.11.2008 | HU | 12.12.2008 | [2011/43] |
Former [2011/32] | DK | 11.06.2008 | |
EE | 11.06.2008 | ||
FI | 11.06.2008 | ||
IE | 11.06.2008 | ||
LT | 11.06.2008 | ||
LV | 11.06.2008 | ||
NL | 11.06.2008 | ||
SI | 11.06.2008 | ||
BG | 11.09.2008 | ||
SE | 11.09.2008 | ||
GR | 12.09.2008 | ||
ES | 22.09.2008 | ||
IS | 11.10.2008 | ||
PT | 11.11.2008 | ||
HU | 12.12.2008 | ||
Former [2011/02] | DK | 11.06.2008 | |
EE | 11.06.2008 | ||
FI | 11.06.2008 | ||
IE | 11.06.2008 | ||
LT | 11.06.2008 | ||
LV | 11.06.2008 | ||
NL | 11.06.2008 | ||
SI | 11.06.2008 | ||
BG | 11.09.2008 | ||
SE | 11.09.2008 | ||
GR | 12.09.2008 | ||
ES | 22.09.2008 | ||
IS | 11.10.2008 | ||
PT | 11.11.2008 | ||
Former [2009/28] | DK | 11.06.2008 | |
EE | 11.06.2008 | ||
FI | 11.06.2008 | ||
IE | 11.06.2008 | ||
LT | 11.06.2008 | ||
LV | 11.06.2008 | ||
NL | 11.06.2008 | ||
SI | 11.06.2008 | ||
BG | 11.09.2008 | ||
SE | 11.09.2008 | ||
ES | 22.09.2008 | ||
IS | 11.10.2008 | ||
PT | 11.11.2008 | ||
Former [2009/20] | DK | 11.06.2008 | |
FI | 11.06.2008 | ||
LT | 11.06.2008 | ||
LV | 11.06.2008 | ||
NL | 11.06.2008 | ||
SI | 11.06.2008 | ||
SE | 11.09.2008 | ||
ES | 22.09.2008 | ||
IS | 11.10.2008 | ||
PT | 11.11.2008 | ||
Former [2009/14] | FI | 11.06.2008 | |
LT | 11.06.2008 | ||
LV | 11.06.2008 | ||
NL | 11.06.2008 | ||
SI | 11.06.2008 | ||
SE | 11.09.2008 | ||
ES | 22.09.2008 | ||
IS | 11.10.2008 | ||
PT | 11.11.2008 | ||
Former [2009/13] | FI | 11.06.2008 | |
LT | 11.06.2008 | ||
LV | 11.06.2008 | ||
NL | 11.06.2008 | ||
SI | 11.06.2008 | ||
SE | 11.09.2008 | ||
ES | 22.09.2008 | ||
IS | 11.10.2008 | ||
Former [2009/10] | FI | 11.06.2008 | |
LT | 11.06.2008 | ||
LV | 11.06.2008 | ||
NL | 11.06.2008 | ||
SI | 11.06.2008 | ||
SE | 11.09.2008 | ||
IS | 11.10.2008 | ||
Former [2009/07] | FI | 11.06.2008 | |
LV | 11.06.2008 | ||
NL | 11.06.2008 | ||
SI | 11.06.2008 | ||
SE | 11.09.2008 | ||
Former [2009/01] | FI | 11.06.2008 | |
LV | 11.06.2008 | ||
NL | 11.06.2008 | ||
SI | 11.06.2008 | ||
Former [2008/50] | FI | 11.06.2008 | |
LV | 11.06.2008 | ||
SI | 11.06.2008 | ||
Former [2008/48] | SI | 11.06.2008 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP1110702 (BIELOMATIK LEUZE & CO [DE]) [A] 1-12 * claims 1-6 * * abstract ** figure 4a *; | [A]US2002062161 (DUSTERHOFT CARSTEN [DE]) [A] 1-12 * paragraphs [0007] , [0026] , [0028] , [0031] , [0033] , [0050] * * figures 1-5 *; | [A]JP2003011229 (YL KOGYO KK) [A] 1-12 * abstract * * figures 1,4-10 * |