EP1717404 - Draft excluder particularly for doors and windows [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 07.12.2012 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.12.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 09.01.2013 [2013/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Geron, Luigi Via San Pietro 13 35010 Villa Del Conte (PD) / IT | [2006/44] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2006/44] | Representative(s) | Forattini, Amelia Internazionale Brevetti Ingg. ZINI, MARANESI & C. S.r.l. Piazza Castello 1 20121 Milano / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2006/44] | Forattini, Amelia Internazionale Brevetti Ingg. ZINI, MARANESI & C. S.r.l. Piazza Castello 1 20121 Milano / IT | Application number, filing date | 06005996.1 | 23.03.2006 | [2006/44] | Priority number, date | IT2005VI00122 | 26.04.2005 Original published format: IT VI20050122 | [2006/44] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1717404 | Date: | 02.11.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/44] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1717404 | Date: | 28.12.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/52] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.11.2011 | Classification | IPC: | E06B7/215, E06B7/21 | [2011/52] | CPC: |
E06B7/215 (EP);
E06B7/21 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2006/44] | E06B7/20 | Designated contracting states | (deleted) [2012/36] |
Former [2006/44] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Dichtungsstreifen insbesondere für Türen und Fenstern | [2006/44] | English: | Draft excluder particularly for doors and windows | [2006/44] | French: | Bande d'étanchéité notamment pour portes et fenêtres | [2006/44] | Examination procedure | 29.06.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2013/02] | 13.08.2012 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2013/02] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.02.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2629147 (SMITH FRANK R, et al) [A] 1-22* the whole document *; | [XY]EP1138865 (GERON LUIGI [IT]) [X] 1-16 * paragraph [0010]; figures 1,2,6,7 * [Y] 17-22; | [Y]EP1347146 (GERON LUIGI [IT]) [Y] 17-22 * paragraphs [0022] - [0029] - [0044] - [0049]; figures 1-12 * |