EP1837071 - Use of shape memory materials for introducing and/or liberating reactants, catalysts and additives [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 22.08.2008 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.08.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 24.09.2008 [2008/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Mnemoscience GmbH Carlstrasse 50 52531 Uebach-Palenberg / DE | [2007/39] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Lendlein, Andreas Sundgauerstrasse 142 14167 Berlin / DE | [2007/39] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2007/39] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 06006056.3 | 23.03.2006 | [2007/39] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1837071 | Date: | 26.09.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/39] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.06.2006 | Classification | IPC: | B01J8/00, B01F15/02, B29C61/00 | [2007/39] | CPC: |
B01J33/00 (EP);
B01J13/02 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | (deleted) [2008/23] |
Former [2007/39] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Verwendung von Formgedächtnismaterialien zum Eintrag und/oder zur Freigabe von Reagenzien, Katalysatoren und Additiven | [2007/39] | English: | Use of shape memory materials for introducing and/or liberating reactants, catalysts and additives | [2007/39] | French: | Utilisation d'un matériau à mémoire de forme pour introduire et/ou libérer de réactifs, catalyseurs et additives | [2007/39] | Examination procedure | 27.03.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2008/39] | 07.05.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2008/39] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2008 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP1627933 (FIAT RICERCHE [IT]) [X] 1-3,5 * claim 1 *; | [X]WO2004015360 (QINETIQ LTD [GB], et al) [X] 1,6 * page 11, paragraphs 3,4 * * page 13, paragraph 1 - paragraph 4; claims 1-8 *; | [X]JPH03131335 ; | [A]EP1544524 (FORD GLOBAL TECH LLC [US]) [A] 6,7 * paragraph [0050]; claim 17 *; | [A]WO9942528 (MNEMOSCIENCE GMBH [DE], et al) [A] 1 * claim 1 *; | [A]US2003181853 (SEWARD KIRK PATRICK [US]) [A] 6 * paragraph [0042]; claim 1 *; | [A]US2004108479 (GARNIER FRANCIS [FR], et al) [A] 6 * paragraphs [0061] - [0064] - [0086] *; | [A]JPH02161326 | [X] - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1991, no. 28, Database accession no. 1991-205191, XP002384993 & JPH03131335 A 19910604 (NIPPON TANSANGASU K) [X] 1,6 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19900907), vol. 014, no. 415, Database accession no. (P - 1102), & JP02161326 A 19900621 (NISSIN ELECTRIC CO LTD) [A] 6 * abstract * |