EP1708370 - Noise removal device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 18.02.2011 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.02.2011 | Withdrawal of application | published on 23.03.2011 [2011/12] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Pioneer Corporation 1-1, Shin-ogura Saiwai-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa 212-0031 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2011/01] | For all designated states Pioneer Corporation 1-1, Shin-ogura Saiwai-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa 212-0031 / JP | ||
Former [2006/40] | For all designated states Pioneer Corporation 4-1 Meguro 1-chome, Meguro-ku Tokyo 153-8654 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Suganuma, Hisashi c/oKawagoe Koujou Pioneer Corp. 25-1Aza Nishimachi Yamada Kawagoe-shi Saitama 350-8555 / JP | [2006/40] | Representative(s) | Bohnenberger, Johannes, et al Meissner Bolte Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Postfach 86 06 24 81633 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2006/40] | Bohnenberger, Johannes, et al Meissner, Bolte & Partner GbR, Postfach 86 06 24 81633 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 06006247.8 | 27.03.2006 | [2006/40] | Priority number, date | JP20050091876 | 28.03.2005 Original published format: JP 2005091876 | [2006/40] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1708370 | Date: | 04.10.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/40] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1708370 | Date: | 20.05.2009 | [2009/21] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.04.2009 | Classification | IPC: | H04B1/16, H03G3/34, H04B15/02 | [2009/21] | CPC: |
H04B15/025 (EP,US);
H03G3/345 (EP,US);
H04B1/1661 (EP,US);
H04H40/72 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2006/40] | H04B1/16 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2010/04] |
Former [2006/40] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zum Entfernen von Störungen | [2006/40] | English: | Noise removal device | [2006/40] | French: | Dispositif pour la suppression de bruit | [2006/40] | Examination procedure | 13.10.2009 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.10.2009 | Examination requested [2009/48] | 21.11.2009 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 29.12.2009 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 11.02.2011 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2011/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0405541 (PIONEER ELECTRONIC CORP [JP]) [A] 1-4 * column 6, line 46 - column 7, line 31; figure 3 *; | [AD]JPH1075190 (SANYO ELECTRIC CO) [AD] 1-4* the whole document *; | [A]EP1128550 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP [JP]) [A] 1-4 * column 5, line 30 - column 8, line 44; figures 5,6a,6b,7,8 * |