EP1840684 - Automation device and system with components communicating connectionless (radio frequency) using detachable radio module FM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 29.01.2010 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.01.2010 | Refusal of application | published on 03.03.2010 [2010/09] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Werner-von-Siemens-Str. 1 DE-80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2007/40] | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Wittelsbacherplatz 2 80333 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Donderer, Markus Lena-Christi-Strasse 6 92224 Amberg / DE | [2007/40] | Application number, filing date | 06006261.9 | 27.03.2006 | [2007/40] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1840684 | Date: | 03.10.2007 | Language: | DE | [2007/40] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.08.2006 | Classification | IPC: | G05B19/05, G05B19/418 | [2007/40] | CPC: |
G05B19/41855 (EP);
G05B19/054 (EP);
G05B2219/15052 (EP);
G05B2219/15117 (EP);
G05B2219/31251 (EP);
Y02P90/02 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2008/24] |
Former [2007/40] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Automatisierungsgerät sowie-system, enthält Automatisierungskomponenten die per lösbaren Funkmodulen drahtlos kommunizieren können | [2007/40] | English: | Automation device and system with components communicating connectionless (radio frequency) using detachable radio module FM | [2007/40] | French: | Dispositif et système d'automatisation dont les composants peuvent communiquer par liaison radio utilisant des modules radio détachables | [2007/40] | Examination procedure | 22.10.2007 | Examination requested [2007/49] | 23.11.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.03.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.03.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.04.2008 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 13.05.2008 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 25.07.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.01.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.05.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.10.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2010/09] | 25.10.2009 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2010/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE10032866 (ABB RESEARCH LTD [CH]) [A] 1-10 * paragraphs [0001] - [0019] *; | [A]DE10033335 (BATTENFELD GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-3* the whole document *; | [XA]EP1243990 (ABB RESEARCH LTD [CH]) [X] 1-3,6-8 * paragraph [0001] - paragraph [0018]; figures 1-3 * [A] 4,5,9,10; | [X]EP1291745 (SIEMENS ENERGY & AUTOMAT [US]) [X] 1-13 * the whole document *; | [XA]WO2005103851 (ENDRESS & HAUSER GMBH & CO KG [DE], et al) [X] 1-9 * paragraphs [0011] - [0014] - [2842]; figures 1-3 * [A] 10-13 |