EP1712393 - Protective cover, in particular for motor vehicles [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.07.2014 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.01.2017 | Change - lapse in a contracting state | published on 15.02.2017 [2017/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Volkswagen Aktiengesellschaft Berliner Ring 2 38440 Wolfsburg / DE | For all designated states Aydar, Nalan Blumenstrasse 37 71106 Magstadt / DE | [2012/28] |
Former [2006/42] | For all designated states Volkswagen Aktiengesellschaft 38436 Wolfsburg / DE | ||
For all designated states Aydar, Nalan Blumenstrasse 37 71106 Magstadt / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Aydar, Nalan Blumenstrasse 37 71106 Magstadt / DE | [2006/42] | Representative(s) | von Biedersee, Heidereich Brieffach 1770 38436 Wolfsburg / DE | [2013/38] |
Former [2006/42] | von Biedersee, Heidereich Brieffach 1770 38436 Wolfsburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 06006280.9 | 27.03.2006 | [2006/42] | Priority number, date | DE20052005785U | 11.04.2005 Original published format: DE 202005005785 U | [2006/42] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1712393 | Date: | 18.10.2006 | Language: | DE | [2006/42] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1712393 | Date: | 24.09.2008 | [2008/39] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1712393 | Date: | 18.09.2013 | Language: | DE | [2013/38] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.08.2008 | Classification | IPC: | B60J11/00 | [2006/42] | CPC: |
B60J11/06 (EP);
B62D25/2072 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/42] | Title | German: | Schutzhaube, insbesondere für Kraftfahrzeuge | [2006/42] | English: | Protective cover, in particular for motor vehicles | [2006/42] | French: | Carter de protection, en particulier pour véhicule automobile | [2006/42] | Examination procedure | 24.03.2009 | Examination requested [2009/19] | 08.05.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.09.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.07.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.11.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.07.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.11.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.04.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.08.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 05.08.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 08.05.2009 | Opposition(s) | 19.06.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/35] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 02.04.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 27.03.2006 | BG | 18.09.2013 | CY | 18.09.2013 | CZ | 18.09.2013 | DK | 18.09.2013 | EE | 18.09.2013 | ES | 18.09.2013 | FI | 18.09.2013 | IT | 18.09.2013 | LT | 18.09.2013 | LV | 18.09.2013 | MC | 18.09.2013 | NL | 18.09.2013 | PL | 18.09.2013 | PT | 18.09.2013 | RO | 18.09.2013 | SE | 18.09.2013 | SI | 18.09.2013 | SK | 18.09.2013 | TR | 18.09.2013 | GR | 19.12.2013 | IS | 18.01.2014 | AT | 27.03.2014 | GB | 27.03.2014 | IE | 27.03.2014 | LU | 27.03.2014 | BE | 31.03.2014 | FR | 31.03.2014 | [2017/07] |
Former [2016/33] | HU | 27.03.2006 | |
BG | 18.09.2013 | ||
CY | 18.09.2013 | ||
CZ | 18.09.2013 | ||
DK | 18.09.2013 | ||
EE | 18.09.2013 | ||
ES | 18.09.2013 | ||
FI | 18.09.2013 | ||
IT | 18.09.2013 | ||
LT | 18.09.2013 | ||
LV | 18.09.2013 | ||
MC | 18.09.2013 | ||
NL | 18.09.2013 | ||
PL | 18.09.2013 | ||
PT | 18.09.2013 | ||
RO | 18.09.2013 | ||
SE | 18.09.2013 | ||
SI | 18.09.2013 | ||
SK | 18.09.2013 | ||
TR | 18.09.2013 | ||
GR | 19.12.2013 | ||
IS | 18.01.2014 | ||
AT | 27.03.2014 | ||
GB | 27.03.2014 | ||
IE | 27.03.2014 | ||
LU | 27.03.2014 | ||
BE | 31.03.2014 | ||
FR | 31.03.2014 | ||
Former [2016/32] | HU | 27.03.2006 | |
BG | 18.09.2013 | ||
CY | 18.09.2013 | ||
CZ | 18.09.2013 | ||
DK | 18.09.2013 | ||
EE | 18.09.2013 | ||
ES | 18.09.2013 | ||
FI | 18.09.2013 | ||
IT | 18.09.2013 | ||
LT | 18.09.2013 | ||
LV | 18.09.2013 | ||
MC | 18.09.2013 | ||
NL | 18.09.2013 | ||
PL | 18.09.2013 | ||
PT | 18.09.2013 | ||
RO | 18.09.2013 | ||
SE | 18.09.2013 | ||
SI | 18.09.2013 | ||
SK | 18.09.2013 | ||
GR | 19.12.2013 | ||
IS | 18.01.2014 | ||
AT | 27.03.2014 | ||
GB | 27.03.2014 | ||
IE | 27.03.2014 | ||
LU | 27.03.2014 | ||
BE | 31.03.2014 | ||
FR | 31.03.2014 | ||
Former [2016/30] | BG | 18.09.2013 | |
CY | 18.09.2013 | ||
CZ | 18.09.2013 | ||
DK | 18.09.2013 | ||
EE | 18.09.2013 | ||
ES | 18.09.2013 | ||
FI | 18.09.2013 | ||
IT | 18.09.2013 | ||
LT | 18.09.2013 | ||
LV | 18.09.2013 | ||
MC | 18.09.2013 | ||
NL | 18.09.2013 | ||
PL | 18.09.2013 | ||
PT | 18.09.2013 | ||
RO | 18.09.2013 | ||
SE | 18.09.2013 | ||
SI | 18.09.2013 | ||
SK | 18.09.2013 | ||
GR | 19.12.2013 | ||
IS | 18.01.2014 | ||
AT | 27.03.2014 | ||
GB | 27.03.2014 | ||
IE | 27.03.2014 | ||
LU | 27.03.2014 | ||
FR | 31.03.2014 | ||
Former [2016/27] | BG | 18.09.2013 | |
CY | 18.09.2013 | ||
CZ | 18.09.2013 | ||
DK | 18.09.2013 | ||
EE | 18.09.2013 | ||
ES | 18.09.2013 | ||
FI | 18.09.2013 | ||
IT | 18.09.2013 | ||
LT | 18.09.2013 | ||
LV | 18.09.2013 | ||
MC | 18.09.2013 | ||
NL | 18.09.2013 | ||
PL | 18.09.2013 | ||
RO | 18.09.2013 | ||
SE | 18.09.2013 | ||
SI | 18.09.2013 | ||
SK | 18.09.2013 | ||
GR | 19.12.2013 | ||
IS | 18.01.2014 | ||
AT | 27.03.2014 | ||
GB | 27.03.2014 | ||
IE | 27.03.2014 | ||
LU | 27.03.2014 | ||
FR | 31.03.2014 | ||
Former [2016/25] | BG | 18.09.2013 | |
CY | 18.09.2013 | ||
CZ | 18.09.2013 | ||
DK | 18.09.2013 | ||
EE | 18.09.2013 | ||
ES | 18.09.2013 | ||
FI | 18.09.2013 | ||
IT | 18.09.2013 | ||
LT | 18.09.2013 | ||
LV | 18.09.2013 | ||
NL | 18.09.2013 | ||
PL | 18.09.2013 | ||
RO | 18.09.2013 | ||
SE | 18.09.2013 | ||
SI | 18.09.2013 | ||
SK | 18.09.2013 | ||
GR | 19.12.2013 | ||
IS | 18.01.2014 | ||
AT | 27.03.2014 | ||
GB | 27.03.2014 | ||
IE | 27.03.2014 | ||
LU | 27.03.2014 | ||
FR | 31.03.2014 | ||
Former [2015/38] | CY | 18.09.2013 | |
CZ | 18.09.2013 | ||
DK | 18.09.2013 | ||
EE | 18.09.2013 | ||
ES | 18.09.2013 | ||
FI | 18.09.2013 | ||
IT | 18.09.2013 | ||
LT | 18.09.2013 | ||
LV | 18.09.2013 | ||
NL | 18.09.2013 | ||
PL | 18.09.2013 | ||
RO | 18.09.2013 | ||
SE | 18.09.2013 | ||
SI | 18.09.2013 | ||
SK | 18.09.2013 | ||
GR | 19.12.2013 | ||
IS | 18.01.2014 | ||
AT | 27.03.2014 | ||
GB | 27.03.2014 | ||
IE | 27.03.2014 | ||
LU | 27.03.2014 | ||
FR | 31.03.2014 | ||
Former [2015/09] | CY | 18.09.2013 | |
CZ | 18.09.2013 | ||
DK | 18.09.2013 | ||
EE | 18.09.2013 | ||
ES | 18.09.2013 | ||
FI | 18.09.2013 | ||
IT | 18.09.2013 | ||
LT | 18.09.2013 | ||
LV | 18.09.2013 | ||
NL | 18.09.2013 | ||
PL | 18.09.2013 | ||
RO | 18.09.2013 | ||
SE | 18.09.2013 | ||
SI | 18.09.2013 | ||
SK | 18.09.2013 | ||
GR | 19.12.2013 | ||
IS | 18.01.2014 | ||
GB | 27.03.2014 | ||
IE | 27.03.2014 | ||
LU | 27.03.2014 | ||
FR | 31.03.2014 | ||
Former [2015/08] | CY | 18.09.2013 | |
CZ | 18.09.2013 | ||
DK | 18.09.2013 | ||
EE | 18.09.2013 | ||
ES | 18.09.2013 | ||
FI | 18.09.2013 | ||
IT | 18.09.2013 | ||
LT | 18.09.2013 | ||
LV | 18.09.2013 | ||
NL | 18.09.2013 | ||
PL | 18.09.2013 | ||
RO | 18.09.2013 | ||
SE | 18.09.2013 | ||
SI | 18.09.2013 | ||
SK | 18.09.2013 | ||
GR | 19.12.2013 | ||
IS | 18.01.2014 | ||
IE | 27.03.2014 | ||
LU | 27.03.2014 | ||
FR | 31.03.2014 | ||
Former [2015/07] | CY | 18.09.2013 | |
CZ | 18.09.2013 | ||
DK | 18.09.2013 | ||
EE | 18.09.2013 | ||
ES | 18.09.2013 | ||
FI | 18.09.2013 | ||
IT | 18.09.2013 | ||
LT | 18.09.2013 | ||
LV | 18.09.2013 | ||
NL | 18.09.2013 | ||
PL | 18.09.2013 | ||
RO | 18.09.2013 | ||
SE | 18.09.2013 | ||
SI | 18.09.2013 | ||
SK | 18.09.2013 | ||
GR | 19.12.2013 | ||
IS | 18.01.2014 | ||
IE | 27.03.2014 | ||
LU | 27.03.2014 | ||
Former [2014/48] | CY | 18.09.2013 | |
CZ | 18.09.2013 | ||
DK | 18.09.2013 | ||
EE | 18.09.2013 | ||
ES | 18.09.2013 | ||
FI | 18.09.2013 | ||
IT | 18.09.2013 | ||
LT | 18.09.2013 | ||
LV | 18.09.2013 | ||
NL | 18.09.2013 | ||
PL | 18.09.2013 | ||
RO | 18.09.2013 | ||
SE | 18.09.2013 | ||
SI | 18.09.2013 | ||
SK | 18.09.2013 | ||
GR | 19.12.2013 | ||
IS | 18.01.2014 | ||
LU | 27.03.2014 | ||
Former [2014/41] | CY | 18.09.2013 | |
CZ | 18.09.2013 | ||
DK | 18.09.2013 | ||
EE | 18.09.2013 | ||
ES | 18.09.2013 | ||
FI | 18.09.2013 | ||
IT | 18.09.2013 | ||
LT | 18.09.2013 | ||
LV | 18.09.2013 | ||
NL | 18.09.2013 | ||
PL | 18.09.2013 | ||
RO | 18.09.2013 | ||
SE | 18.09.2013 | ||
SI | 18.09.2013 | ||
SK | 18.09.2013 | ||
GR | 19.12.2013 | ||
IS | 18.01.2014 | ||
Former [2014/38] | CY | 18.09.2013 | |
CZ | 18.09.2013 | ||
EE | 18.09.2013 | ||
ES | 18.09.2013 | ||
FI | 18.09.2013 | ||
IT | 18.09.2013 | ||
LT | 18.09.2013 | ||
LV | 18.09.2013 | ||
NL | 18.09.2013 | ||
PL | 18.09.2013 | ||
RO | 18.09.2013 | ||
SE | 18.09.2013 | ||
SI | 18.09.2013 | ||
SK | 18.09.2013 | ||
GR | 19.12.2013 | ||
IS | 18.01.2014 | ||
Former [2014/24] | CY | 18.09.2013 | |
CZ | 18.09.2013 | ||
EE | 18.09.2013 | ||
ES | 18.09.2013 | ||
FI | 18.09.2013 | ||
LT | 18.09.2013 | ||
LV | 18.09.2013 | ||
NL | 18.09.2013 | ||
PL | 18.09.2013 | ||
RO | 18.09.2013 | ||
SE | 18.09.2013 | ||
SI | 18.09.2013 | ||
SK | 18.09.2013 | ||
GR | 19.12.2013 | ||
IS | 18.01.2014 | ||
Former [2014/23] | CY | 18.09.2013 | |
CZ | 18.09.2013 | ||
EE | 18.09.2013 | ||
ES | 18.09.2013 | ||
FI | 18.09.2013 | ||
LT | 18.09.2013 | ||
LV | 18.09.2013 | ||
NL | 18.09.2013 | ||
RO | 18.09.2013 | ||
SE | 18.09.2013 | ||
SI | 18.09.2013 | ||
SK | 18.09.2013 | ||
GR | 19.12.2013 | ||
IS | 18.01.2014 | ||
Former [2014/22] | CY | 18.09.2013 | |
ES | 18.09.2013 | ||
FI | 18.09.2013 | ||
LT | 18.09.2013 | ||
LV | 18.09.2013 | ||
NL | 18.09.2013 | ||
RO | 18.09.2013 | ||
SE | 18.09.2013 | ||
SI | 18.09.2013 | ||
GR | 19.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/18] | CY | 18.09.2013 | |
ES | 18.09.2013 | ||
FI | 18.09.2013 | ||
LT | 18.09.2013 | ||
LV | 18.09.2013 | ||
SE | 18.09.2013 | ||
SI | 18.09.2013 | ||
GR | 19.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/12] | CY | 10.07.2013 | |
ES | 18.09.2013 | ||
FI | 18.09.2013 | ||
LT | 18.09.2013 | ||
LV | 18.09.2013 | ||
SE | 18.09.2013 | ||
SI | 18.09.2013 | ||
GR | 19.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/11] | CY | 10.07.2013 | |
FI | 18.09.2013 | ||
LT | 18.09.2013 | ||
SE | 18.09.2013 | ||
Former [2014/10] | CY | 10.07.2013 | |
LT | 18.09.2013 | ||
SE | 18.09.2013 | ||
Former [2014/09] | LT | 18.09.2013 | |
SE | 18.09.2013 | ||
Former [2014/08] | LT | 18.09.2013 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5725933 (NISHIYAMA HIDETOSHI [JP]) [A] 1,18* column 3, line 33 - column 7, line 4 *; | [DX]DE20306825U (HEILAND HEINRICH GMBH [DE]) [DX] 1-4,6,9-12,14-17 * page 4, line 9 - page 14, line 9; figure - *; | [X]WO2004091954 (HEILAND HEINRICH GMBH [DE], et al) [X] 1-4,9-12,14,16,17 * page 6, line 3 - page 11, line 10; figure - *; | [X]DE202004014337U (HEILAND HEINRICH GMBH [DE]) [X] 1,3-6,9-12,14-17 * paragraph [0026] - paragraph [0039]; figure - *; | [PDX]DE20319938U (AYDAR NALAN [DE], et al) [PDX] 1,3,4,6,9,11,12,14-17 * page 9, line 5 - page 14, line 9; figure - * | by applicant | DE20306825U | WO2004091954 | DE202004014337U | DE20319938U |