EP1710162 - Packaging machine with simulated cams [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent revoked Status updated on 25.02.2011 Database last updated on 21.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.09.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, TR | published on 02.11.2011 [2011/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ILAPAK INTERNATIONAL S.A. 6926 Collina d'Oro / CH | [2007/43] |
Former [2006/41] | For all designated states ILAPAK Research & Development S.A. Via Grancia CH-6926 Montagnola / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Levy, Roger S. Via Pocobelli 27 6815 Melide TI / CH | [2006/41] | Representative(s) | Coletti, Raimondo, et al Barzanò & Zanardo Milano S.p.A. Via Borgonuovo, 10 20121 Milano / IT | [2011/10] |
Former [2008/26] | Faraggiana, Vittorio, et al Ing. Barzanò & Zanardo Milano S.p.A. Via Borgonuovo 10 20121 Milano / IT | ||
Former [2006/41] | Faraggiana, Vittorio Ingg. Guzzi & Ravizza S.r.l. Via Vincenzo Monti 8 20123 Milano / IT | Application number, filing date | 06006339.3 | 28.03.2006 | [2006/41] | Priority number, date | IT2005MI00119U | 08.04.2005 Original published format: IT MI20050119 U | [2006/41] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1710162 | Date: | 11.10.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/41] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1710162 | Date: | 04.06.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/23] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 31.05.2006 | Classification | IPC: | B65B51/30, B65B9/06 | [2006/41] | CPC: |
B65B51/30 (EP);
B65B9/067 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/41] | Title | German: | Verpackungsmaschine mit simulierten Nocken | [2006/41] | English: | Packaging machine with simulated cams | [2006/41] | French: | Machine d'emballage à cames simulées | [2006/41] | Examination procedure | 06.03.2007 | Examination requested [2007/16] | 24.05.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.08.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.11.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.03.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 11.03.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
16.02.2009
ADMISSIBLE Rovema Verpackungsmaschinen GmbH Industriestr. 1 D-35463 Fernwald / DE Opponent's representative Tappe, Hartmut Advotec. Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Georg-Schlosser-Strasse 6 35390 Giessen / DE | 02
03.03.2009
Müller Martini Holding AG Sonnenbergstrasse 13 6052 Hergiswil / CH Opponent's representative Sutter, Kurt E. Blum & Co. AG Patent- und Markenanwälte VSP Vorderberg 11 8044 Zürich / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2009/28] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
16.02.2009
ADMISSIBLE Rovema Verpackungsmaschinen GmbH Industriestr. 1 D-35463 Fernwald / DE Opponent's representative Tappe, Hartmut advotec. Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Georg-Schlosser-Strasse 6 35390 Giessen / DE | ||
02
03.03.2009
Müller Martini Holding AG Sonnenbergstrasse 13 6052 Hergiswil / CH Opponent's representative Sutter, Kurt E. Blum & Co. AG Patent- und Markenanwälte VSP Vorderberg 11 CH-8044 Zürich / CH | |||
Former [2009/15] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
16.02.2009
Rovema Verpackungsmaschinen GmbH Industriestr. 1 D-35463 Fernwald / DE Opponent's representative Tappe, Hartmut advotec. Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Georg-Schlosser-Strasse 6 35390 Giessen / DE | ||
02
03.03.2009
ADMISSIBLE Müller Martini Holding AG Sonnenbergstrasse 13 6052 Hergiswil / CH Opponent's representative Sutter, Kurt E. Blum & Co. AG Patent- und Markenanwälte VSP Vorderberg 11 CH-8044 Zürich / CH | |||
Former [2009/13] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
16.02.2009
Rovema Verpackungsmaschinen GmbH Industriestr. 1 D-35463 Fernwald / DE Opponent's representative Tappe, Hartmut advotec. Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Georg-Schlosser-Strasse 6 35390 Giessen / DE | 13.05.2009 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 11.11.2009 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 09.09.2010 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 26.11.2010 | 12.11.2010 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked | 22.11.2010 | Legal effect of revocation of patent [2011/13] | 26.11.2010 | Date of oral proceedings | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 04.06.2008 | BE | 04.06.2008 | CH | 04.06.2008 | CY | 04.06.2008 | CZ | 04.06.2008 | DK | 04.06.2008 | EE | 04.06.2008 | FI | 04.06.2008 | LI | 04.06.2008 | LT | 04.06.2008 | LV | 04.06.2008 | PL | 04.06.2008 | RO | 04.06.2008 | SI | 04.06.2008 | SK | 04.06.2008 | TR | 04.06.2008 | BG | 04.09.2008 | SE | 04.09.2008 | GR | 05.09.2008 | IS | 04.10.2008 | PT | 04.11.2008 | HU | 05.12.2008 | IE | 28.03.2009 | LU | 28.03.2009 | MC | 31.03.2009 | FR | 23.11.2009 | [2011/43] |
Former [2011/32] | AT | 04.06.2008 | |
BE | 04.06.2008 | ||
CH | 04.06.2008 | ||
CZ | 04.06.2008 | ||
DK | 04.06.2008 | ||
EE | 04.06.2008 | ||
FI | 04.06.2008 | ||
LI | 04.06.2008 | ||
LT | 04.06.2008 | ||
LV | 04.06.2008 | ||
PL | 04.06.2008 | ||
RO | 04.06.2008 | ||
SI | 04.06.2008 | ||
SK | 04.06.2008 | ||
BG | 04.09.2008 | ||
SE | 04.09.2008 | ||
GR | 05.09.2008 | ||
IS | 04.10.2008 | ||
PT | 04.11.2008 | ||
HU | 05.12.2008 | ||
IE | 28.03.2009 | ||
LU | 28.03.2009 | ||
MC | 31.03.2009 | ||
FR | 23.11.2009 | ||
Former [2011/22] | AT | 04.06.2008 | |
BE | 04.06.2008 | ||
CH | 04.06.2008 | ||
CZ | 04.06.2008 | ||
DK | 04.06.2008 | ||
EE | 04.06.2008 | ||
FI | 04.06.2008 | ||
LI | 04.06.2008 | ||
LT | 04.06.2008 | ||
LV | 04.06.2008 | ||
PL | 04.06.2008 | ||
RO | 04.06.2008 | ||
SI | 04.06.2008 | ||
SK | 04.06.2008 | ||
BG | 04.09.2008 | ||
SE | 04.09.2008 | ||
GR | 05.09.2008 | ||
IS | 04.10.2008 | ||
PT | 04.11.2008 | ||
IE | 28.03.2009 | ||
LU | 28.03.2009 | ||
MC | 31.03.2009 | ||
FR | 23.11.2009 | ||
Former [2011/20] | AT | 04.06.2008 | |
BE | 04.06.2008 | ||
CH | 04.06.2008 | ||
CZ | 04.06.2008 | ||
DK | 04.06.2008 | ||
EE | 04.06.2008 | ||
FI | 04.06.2008 | ||
LI | 04.06.2008 | ||
LT | 04.06.2008 | ||
LV | 04.06.2008 | ||
PL | 04.06.2008 | ||
RO | 04.06.2008 | ||
SI | 04.06.2008 | ||
SK | 04.06.2008 | ||
BG | 04.09.2008 | ||
SE | 04.09.2008 | ||
GR | 05.09.2008 | ||
IS | 04.10.2008 | ||
PT | 04.11.2008 | ||
IE | 28.03.2009 | ||
MC | 31.03.2009 | ||
FR | 23.11.2009 | ||
Former [2011/02] | AT | 04.06.2008 | |
BE | 04.06.2008 | ||
CZ | 04.06.2008 | ||
DK | 04.06.2008 | ||
EE | 04.06.2008 | ||
FI | 04.06.2008 | ||
LT | 04.06.2008 | ||
LV | 04.06.2008 | ||
PL | 04.06.2008 | ||
RO | 04.06.2008 | ||
SI | 04.06.2008 | ||
SK | 04.06.2008 | ||
BG | 04.09.2008 | ||
SE | 04.09.2008 | ||
GR | 05.09.2008 | ||
IS | 04.10.2008 | ||
PT | 04.11.2008 | ||
IE | 28.03.2009 | ||
MC | 31.03.2009 | ||
FR | 23.11.2009 | ||
Former [2010/25] | AT | 04.06.2008 | |
BE | 04.06.2008 | ||
CZ | 04.06.2008 | ||
DK | 04.06.2008 | ||
EE | 04.06.2008 | ||
FI | 04.06.2008 | ||
LT | 04.06.2008 | ||
LV | 04.06.2008 | ||
PL | 04.06.2008 | ||
RO | 04.06.2008 | ||
SI | 04.06.2008 | ||
SK | 04.06.2008 | ||
BG | 04.09.2008 | ||
SE | 04.09.2008 | ||
IS | 04.10.2008 | ||
PT | 04.11.2008 | ||
IE | 28.03.2009 | ||
MC | 31.03.2009 | ||
FR | 23.11.2009 | ||
Former [2010/07] | AT | 04.06.2008 | |
BE | 04.06.2008 | ||
CZ | 04.06.2008 | ||
DK | 04.06.2008 | ||
EE | 04.06.2008 | ||
FI | 04.06.2008 | ||
LT | 04.06.2008 | ||
LV | 04.06.2008 | ||
PL | 04.06.2008 | ||
RO | 04.06.2008 | ||
SI | 04.06.2008 | ||
SK | 04.06.2008 | ||
BG | 04.09.2008 | ||
SE | 04.09.2008 | ||
IS | 04.10.2008 | ||
PT | 04.11.2008 | ||
IE | 28.03.2009 | ||
MC | 31.03.2009 | ||
Former [2010/01] | AT | 04.06.2008 | |
BE | 04.06.2008 | ||
CZ | 04.06.2008 | ||
DK | 04.06.2008 | ||
EE | 04.06.2008 | ||
FI | 04.06.2008 | ||
LT | 04.06.2008 | ||
LV | 04.06.2008 | ||
PL | 04.06.2008 | ||
RO | 04.06.2008 | ||
SI | 04.06.2008 | ||
SK | 04.06.2008 | ||
BG | 04.09.2008 | ||
SE | 04.09.2008 | ||
IS | 04.10.2008 | ||
PT | 04.11.2008 | ||
MC | 31.03.2009 | ||
Former [2009/28] | AT | 04.06.2008 | |
BE | 04.06.2008 | ||
CZ | 04.06.2008 | ||
DK | 04.06.2008 | ||
EE | 04.06.2008 | ||
FI | 04.06.2008 | ||
LT | 04.06.2008 | ||
LV | 04.06.2008 | ||
PL | 04.06.2008 | ||
RO | 04.06.2008 | ||
SI | 04.06.2008 | ||
SK | 04.06.2008 | ||
BG | 04.09.2008 | ||
SE | 04.09.2008 | ||
IS | 04.10.2008 | ||
PT | 04.11.2008 | ||
Former [2009/20] | AT | 04.06.2008 | |
BE | 04.06.2008 | ||
CZ | 04.06.2008 | ||
DK | 04.06.2008 | ||
FI | 04.06.2008 | ||
LT | 04.06.2008 | ||
LV | 04.06.2008 | ||
PL | 04.06.2008 | ||
RO | 04.06.2008 | ||
SI | 04.06.2008 | ||
SK | 04.06.2008 | ||
SE | 04.09.2008 | ||
IS | 04.10.2008 | ||
PT | 04.11.2008 | ||
Former [2009/14] | AT | 04.06.2008 | |
BE | 04.06.2008 | ||
CZ | 04.06.2008 | ||
FI | 04.06.2008 | ||
LT | 04.06.2008 | ||
LV | 04.06.2008 | ||
PL | 04.06.2008 | ||
RO | 04.06.2008 | ||
SI | 04.06.2008 | ||
SK | 04.06.2008 | ||
SE | 04.09.2008 | ||
IS | 04.10.2008 | ||
PT | 04.11.2008 | ||
Former [2009/13] | AT | 04.06.2008 | |
BE | 04.06.2008 | ||
CZ | 04.06.2008 | ||
FI | 04.06.2008 | ||
LT | 04.06.2008 | ||
LV | 04.06.2008 | ||
PL | 04.06.2008 | ||
SI | 04.06.2008 | ||
SK | 04.06.2008 | ||
SE | 04.09.2008 | ||
IS | 04.10.2008 | ||
Former [2009/10] | AT | 04.06.2008 | |
CZ | 04.06.2008 | ||
FI | 04.06.2008 | ||
LT | 04.06.2008 | ||
LV | 04.06.2008 | ||
PL | 04.06.2008 | ||
SI | 04.06.2008 | ||
SE | 04.09.2008 | ||
IS | 04.10.2008 | ||
Former [2009/07] | AT | 04.06.2008 | |
FI | 04.06.2008 | ||
LV | 04.06.2008 | ||
PL | 04.06.2008 | ||
SI | 04.06.2008 | ||
SE | 04.09.2008 | ||
Former [2008/50] | AT | 04.06.2008 | |
FI | 04.06.2008 | ||
LV | 04.06.2008 | ||
PL | 04.06.2008 | ||
SI | 04.06.2008 | ||
Former [2008/48] | SI | 04.06.2008 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US4729210 (GALLIANO MARIANO [CH]) [Y] 4-7 * column 3, lines 60-68; figures 2,3 *; | [XY]WO9738905 (TETRA PAK HOYER A S [DK], et al) [X] 1,3 * page 6; figures 4,5 * [Y] 4-7; | [X]US5689942 (SUGA YASUTAKA [JP]) [X] 1-3 * the whole document *; | [PX]EP1533106 (OPM S P A [IT]) [PX] 1,3* the whole document * |