EP1722181 - Connection between cooled pipe and uncooled pipe in a double-pipe heat exchanger [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.11.2015 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.10.2017 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): BG, CY, HU, PT, TR | published on 15.11.2017 [2017/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ALFA LAVAL OLMI S.p.A. Viale Europa, 43 24040 Suisio (BG) / IT | [2015/01] |
Former [2013/19] | For all designated states ALFA LAVAL OLMI S.p.A. Viale Europa, 43 24040 Suisio (BG) / IT | ||
Former [2006/46] | For all designated states OLMI S.p.A. Viale Europa 29 24040 Suisio (BG) / IT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Galatello Adamo, Gaetano Via Della Fortuna 6 20035 Lissone MI / IT | 02 /
Zanardi, Luca Via Ghislandi 31 24125 Bergamo BG / IT | 03 /
Ricci, Pietro Via Bolzini 2 26013 Crema CR / IT | [2006/46] | Representative(s) | Alfa Laval Attorneys Alfa Laval Corporate AB Group Patent P.O. Box 73 221 00 Lund / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2015/01] | Alfa Laval Attorneys Alfa Laval Corporate AB Patent Department P.O. Box 73 221 00 Lund / SE | ||
Former [2012/36] | Locatelli, Massimo, et al Barzanò & Zanardo Milano S.p.A. Via Borgonuovo 10 20121 Milano / IT | ||
Former [2011/10] | Coletti, Raimondo, et al Barzanò & Zanardo Milano S.p.A. Via Borgonuovo, 10 20121 Milano / IT | ||
Former [2008/26] | Faraggiana, Vittorio, et al Ing. Barzanò & Zanardo Milano S.p.A. Via Borgonuovo 10 20121 Milano / IT | ||
Former [2006/46] | Faraggiana, Vittorio Ingg. Guzzi & Ravizza S.r.l. Via Vincenzo Monti 8 I-20123 Milano / IT | Application number, filing date | 06006670.1 | 30.03.2006 | [2006/46] | Priority number, date | IT2005MI00847 | 11.05.2005 Original published format: IT MI20050847 | [2006/46] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1722181 | Date: | 15.11.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/46] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1722181 | Date: | 23.11.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/47] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1722181 | Date: | 31.12.2014 | Language: | EN | [2015/01] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.10.2011 | Classification | IPC: | F28D7/10, F28F9/26 | [2006/46] | CPC: |
F28D7/106 (EP,US);
F28F9/26 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/46] | Title | German: | Verbindung zwischen gekühltem Rohr und ungekühltem Rohr in einem Doppelrohr- Wärmetauscher | [2014/36] | English: | Connection between cooled pipe and uncooled pipe in a double-pipe heat exchanger | [2006/46] | French: | Connexion entre tube refroidi et tube non refroidi dans un échangeur de chaleur à double tubes | [2006/46] |
Former [2006/46] | Verbindung zwischen gekühltes Rohr und ungekühltes Rohr in einem Doppelrohr- Wärmetauscher | Examination procedure | 11.05.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 11.05.2012 | Examination requested [2012/25] | 19.02.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.05.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.08.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.11.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 17.11.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 17.11.2014 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 19.02.2013 | Opposition(s) | 01.10.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/50] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 16.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 22.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 12.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 30.03.2006 | AT | 31.12.2014 | BE | 31.12.2014 | BG | 31.12.2014 | CY | 31.12.2014 | CZ | 31.12.2014 | DK | 31.12.2014 | EE | 31.12.2014 | ES | 31.12.2014 | FI | 31.12.2014 | LT | 31.12.2014 | LV | 31.12.2014 | MC | 31.12.2014 | NL | 31.12.2014 | PL | 31.12.2014 | RO | 31.12.2014 | SE | 31.12.2014 | SI | 31.12.2014 | SK | 31.12.2014 | TR | 31.12.2014 | IE | 30.03.2015 | LU | 30.03.2015 | CH | 31.03.2015 | GB | 31.03.2015 | LI | 31.03.2015 | GR | 01.04.2015 | IS | 30.04.2015 | PT | 01.05.2015 | [2017/39] |
Former [2016/24] | AT | 31.12.2014 | |
BE | 31.12.2014 | ||
CZ | 31.12.2014 | ||
DK | 31.12.2014 | ||
EE | 31.12.2014 | ||
ES | 31.12.2014 | ||
FI | 31.12.2014 | ||
LT | 31.12.2014 | ||
LV | 31.12.2014 | ||
MC | 31.12.2014 | ||
NL | 31.12.2014 | ||
PL | 31.12.2014 | ||
RO | 31.12.2014 | ||
SE | 31.12.2014 | ||
SI | 31.12.2014 | ||
SK | 31.12.2014 | ||
IE | 30.03.2015 | ||
LU | 30.03.2015 | ||
CH | 31.03.2015 | ||
GB | 31.03.2015 | ||
LI | 31.03.2015 | ||
GR | 01.04.2015 | ||
IS | 30.04.2015 | ||
Former [2016/12] | AT | 31.12.2014 | |
CZ | 31.12.2014 | ||
DK | 31.12.2014 | ||
EE | 31.12.2014 | ||
ES | 31.12.2014 | ||
FI | 31.12.2014 | ||
LT | 31.12.2014 | ||
LV | 31.12.2014 | ||
MC | 31.12.2014 | ||
NL | 31.12.2014 | ||
PL | 31.12.2014 | ||
RO | 31.12.2014 | ||
SE | 31.12.2014 | ||
SI | 31.12.2014 | ||
SK | 31.12.2014 | ||
IE | 30.03.2015 | ||
LU | 30.03.2015 | ||
CH | 31.03.2015 | ||
GB | 31.03.2015 | ||
LI | 31.03.2015 | ||
GR | 01.04.2015 | ||
IS | 30.04.2015 | ||
Former [2016/07] | AT | 31.12.2014 | |
CZ | 31.12.2014 | ||
DK | 31.12.2014 | ||
EE | 31.12.2014 | ||
ES | 31.12.2014 | ||
FI | 31.12.2014 | ||
LT | 31.12.2014 | ||
LV | 31.12.2014 | ||
MC | 31.12.2014 | ||
NL | 31.12.2014 | ||
PL | 31.12.2014 | ||
RO | 31.12.2014 | ||
SE | 31.12.2014 | ||
SK | 31.12.2014 | ||
IE | 30.03.2015 | ||
LU | 30.03.2015 | ||
CH | 31.03.2015 | ||
GB | 31.03.2015 | ||
LI | 31.03.2015 | ||
GR | 01.04.2015 | ||
IS | 30.04.2015 | ||
Former [2016/06] | AT | 31.12.2014 | |
CZ | 31.12.2014 | ||
DK | 31.12.2014 | ||
EE | 31.12.2014 | ||
ES | 31.12.2014 | ||
FI | 31.12.2014 | ||
LT | 31.12.2014 | ||
LV | 31.12.2014 | ||
MC | 31.12.2014 | ||
NL | 31.12.2014 | ||
PL | 31.12.2014 | ||
RO | 31.12.2014 | ||
SE | 31.12.2014 | ||
SK | 31.12.2014 | ||
LU | 30.03.2015 | ||
CH | 31.03.2015 | ||
LI | 31.03.2015 | ||
GR | 01.04.2015 | ||
IS | 30.04.2015 | ||
Former [2015/49] | AT | 31.12.2014 | |
CZ | 31.12.2014 | ||
DK | 31.12.2014 | ||
EE | 31.12.2014 | ||
ES | 31.12.2014 | ||
FI | 31.12.2014 | ||
LT | 31.12.2014 | ||
LV | 31.12.2014 | ||
MC | 31.12.2014 | ||
NL | 31.12.2014 | ||
PL | 31.12.2014 | ||
RO | 31.12.2014 | ||
SE | 31.12.2014 | ||
SK | 31.12.2014 | ||
LU | 30.03.2015 | ||
GR | 01.04.2015 | ||
IS | 30.04.2015 | ||
Former [2015/47] | AT | 31.12.2014 | |
CZ | 31.12.2014 | ||
ES | 31.12.2014 | ||
FI | 31.12.2014 | ||
LT | 31.12.2014 | ||
LV | 31.12.2014 | ||
MC | 31.12.2014 | ||
NL | 31.12.2014 | ||
PL | 31.12.2014 | ||
RO | 31.12.2014 | ||
SE | 31.12.2014 | ||
SK | 31.12.2014 | ||
LU | 30.03.2015 | ||
GR | 01.04.2015 | ||
IS | 30.04.2015 | ||
Former [2015/46] | AT | 31.12.2014 | |
CZ | 31.12.2014 | ||
ES | 31.12.2014 | ||
FI | 31.12.2014 | ||
LT | 31.12.2014 | ||
LV | 31.12.2014 | ||
MC | 31.12.2014 | ||
NL | 31.12.2014 | ||
PL | 31.12.2014 | ||
RO | 31.12.2014 | ||
SE | 31.12.2014 | ||
SK | 31.12.2014 | ||
GR | 01.04.2015 | ||
IS | 30.04.2015 | ||
Former [2015/38] | AT | 31.12.2014 | |
CZ | 31.12.2014 | ||
ES | 31.12.2014 | ||
FI | 31.12.2014 | ||
LT | 31.12.2014 | ||
LV | 31.12.2014 | ||
NL | 31.12.2014 | ||
PL | 31.12.2014 | ||
RO | 31.12.2014 | ||
SE | 31.12.2014 | ||
SK | 31.12.2014 | ||
GR | 01.04.2015 | ||
IS | 30.04.2015 | ||
Former [2015/37] | CZ | 31.12.2014 | |
ES | 31.12.2014 | ||
FI | 31.12.2014 | ||
LT | 31.12.2014 | ||
LV | 31.12.2014 | ||
NL | 31.12.2014 | ||
PL | 31.12.2014 | ||
RO | 31.12.2014 | ||
SE | 31.12.2014 | ||
SK | 31.12.2014 | ||
GR | 01.04.2015 | ||
Former [2015/36] | CZ | 31.12.2014 | |
ES | 31.12.2014 | ||
FI | 31.12.2014 | ||
LT | 31.12.2014 | ||
LV | 31.12.2014 | ||
NL | 31.12.2014 | ||
RO | 31.12.2014 | ||
SE | 31.12.2014 | ||
GR | 01.04.2015 | ||
Former [2015/33] | ES | 31.12.2014 | |
FI | 31.12.2014 | ||
LT | 31.12.2014 | ||
LV | 31.12.2014 | ||
NL | 31.12.2014 | ||
SE | 31.12.2014 | ||
GR | 01.04.2015 | ||
Former [2015/29] | FI | 31.12.2014 | |
LT | 31.12.2014 | ||
LV | 31.12.2014 | ||
NL | 31.12.2014 | ||
SE | 31.12.2014 | ||
GR | 01.04.2015 | ||
Former [2015/24] | FI | 31.12.2014 | |
LT | 31.12.2014 | ||
LV | 31.12.2014 | ||
SE | 31.12.2014 | ||
GR | 01.04.2015 | ||
Former [2015/23] | FI | 31.12.2014 | |
LT | 31.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/20] | LT | 31.12.2014 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR1590170 (STEIN & ROUBAIX) [A] 1-17* figure - *; | [A]US5690168 (CIZMAR LLOYD EDWARD [US], et al) [A] 1-17 * figure - *; | [I]EP1310758 (OLMI SPA [IT]) [I] 1-17 * figures 1, 3 * * column 1, line 3 - line 7 * * column 2, line 46 - line 49 * * line 25 - column 3, line 28 * |