EP1793006 - Nucleic acid ligands and improved methods for producing the same [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 05.11.2010 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.11.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 08.12.2010 [2010/49] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GILEAD SCIENCES, INC. 333 Lakeside Drive Foster City, CA 94404 / US | [2007/23] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Gold, Larry 1033 5th Street Boulder, CO 80303 / US | 02 /
Pieken, Wolfgang 7308 Mt. Meeker Road Longmont, CO 80503 / US | 03 /
Tasset, Diane 2742 Alpenglow Road Stevensville, Montana 59870 / US | 04 /
Janjic, Nebojsa 6973 Carter Trail Boulder, CO 80301 / US | 05 /
Kirschenheuter, Gary P. 12679 W. 84th Drive Arvada, CO 80005 / US | 06 /
Polisky, Barry 3275 6th Street Boulder, CO 80304 / US | 07 /
Jayasena, Sumedha 1759 Bridle Oaks Court Thousand Oaks, CA 91362 / US | 08 /
Biesecker, Greg 8239 Kincross Way Boulder, CO 80301 / US | 09 /
Smith, Drew 3010 15th Street Boulder, CO 80304 / US | 10 /
Jenison, Robert D. 3260 47th Street 208 Boulder, CO 80301 / US | [2007/23] | Representative(s) | Dörries, Hans Ulrich df-mp Dörries Frank-Molnia & Pohlman Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Theatinerstrasse 16 80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2007/23] | Dörries, Hans Ulrich Dörries, Frank-Molnia & Pohlman, Triftstrasse 13 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 06006842.6 | 08.09.1994 | [2007/23] | Priority number, date | US19930117991 | 08.09.1993 Original published format: US 117991 | US19930134028 | 07.10.1993 Original published format: US 134028 | US19940199507 | 22.02.1994 Original published format: US 199507 | US19940233012 | 25.04.1994 Original published format: US 233012 | US19940234997 | 28.04.1994 Original published format: US 234997 | [2007/23] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1793006 | Date: | 06.06.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/23] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1793006 | Date: | 22.08.2007 | [2007/34] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.07.2007 | Classification | IPC: | C12Q1/68, C07H21/02, C07H21/04, C12N15/10 | [2007/23] | CPC: |
C12N15/115 (EP);
A61P11/00 (EP);
A61P29/00 (EP);
A61P35/00 (EP);
A61P35/04 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
A61P7/00 (EP);
A61P7/02 (EP);
A61P9/00 (EP);
A61P9/10 (EP);
C07H19/06 (EP);
C07H19/10 (EP);
C07H21/00 (EP);
C07K14/001 (EP);
C12N15/1048 (EP);
C12Q1/37 (EP);
C12Q1/6811 (EP);
C12Q1/6876 (EP);
G01N33/532 (EP);
G01N33/535 (EP);
G01N33/56988 (EP);
G01N33/68 (EP);
G01N33/6803 (EP);
C12N2310/16 (EP);
C40B40/00 (EP);
G01N2333/8125 (EP);
G01N2333/96433 (EP);
G01N2333/96436 (EP);
G01N2333/96486 (EP);
G01N2333/966 (EP);
G01N2333/974 (EP)
(-)
| C-Set: |
C12Q1/6811, C12Q2525/101 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2007/23] | Title | German: | Nukleïnesaüreliganden und Produktionsverfahren dafür | [2010/09] | English: | Nucleic acid ligands and improved methods for producing the same | [2007/23] | French: | Ligands d'acide nucléique et méthode pour les produire | [2007/23] |
Former [2007/23] | Nukleïnesaüreliganden und Produktion Verfahren dafür | Examination procedure | 21.02.2008 | Examination requested [2008/14] | 20.03.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 30.09.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.02.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.06.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2010/49] | 21.07.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2010/49] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP94927409.6 / EP0724647 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 31.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 31.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 31.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 31.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 31.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 08.09.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 05.09.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | 15.09.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 15 | 11.09.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 16 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2010 | 17   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO9119813 (UNIV COLORADO FOUNDATION [US]) [X] 1-4,7,8,10-12 * page 9, lines 8-12 * * page 24, lines 20-24 * * page 25, lines 5-7 *; | [PX] - JELLINEK D ET AL, High-affinity RNA ligands to basic fibroblast growth factor inhibit receptor binding, PROCEEDINGS OF THE NATIONAL ACADEMY OF SCIENCES OF USA, NATIONAL ACADEMY OF SCIENCE, WASHINGTON, DC, US, PAGE(S) 11227-11231, (1993), ISSN 0027-8424, XP002168305 [PX] 1-4,7,8,10-12 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1073/pnas.90.23.11227 |