EP1710155 - Motorcycle with fuel cell [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2006/41] | Motorcycle with fuel cell and stack structure of fuel cell | ||
[2008/13] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.06.2009 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.06.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 22.07.2009 [2009/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HONDA MOTOR CO., LTD. 1-1, Minami-Aoyama, Minato-ku Tokyo 107-8556 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2008/33] | For all designated states HONDA MOTOR CO., LTD. 1-1, Minami-Aoyama 2-chome, Minato-ku Tokyo 107-8556 / JP | ||
Former [2006/41] | For all designated states HONDA MOTOR CO., Ltd. 1-1, Minami-Aoyama 2-chome, Minato-ku Tokyo 107-8556 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Makuta, Yohei c/o Honda R&D Co.,Ltd., 4-1 Chuo 1-chome Wako-shi, Saitama, 351-0193 / JP | 02 /
Horii, Yoshiyuki c/o Honda R&D Co.,Ltd., 4-1 Chuo 1-chome Wako-shi, Saitama, 351-0193 / JP | 03 /
Ikui, Kuniaki c/o Honda R&D Co.,Ltd., 4-1 Chuo 1-chome Wako-shi, Saitama, 351-0193 / JP | [2006/41] | Representative(s) | Rupp, Christian, et al Mitscherlich PartmbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Karlstraße 7 80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2006/41] | Rupp, Christian, et al Mitscherlich & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Sonnenstrasse 33 80331 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 06006920.0 | 31.03.2006 | [2006/41] | Priority number, date | JP20050107708 | 04.04.2005 Original published format: JP 2005107708 | JP20050136205 | 09.05.2005 Original published format: JP 2005136205 | JP20050152784 | 25.05.2005 Original published format: JP 2005152784 | [2006/41] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1710155 | Date: | 11.10.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/41] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1710155 | Date: | 03.01.2007 | [2007/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1710155 | Date: | 13.08.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/33] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.12.2006 | Classification | IPC: | B62M23/00, H01M8/24 | [2007/01] | CPC: |
H01M8/248 (EP,US);
B60L50/50 (KR);
B62K11/00 (KR);
H01M8/24 (KR);
H01M8/2475 (EP,US);
B62K2202/00 (EP,US);
B62K2204/00 (EP,US);
H01M2008/1095 (EP,US);
H01M2250/20 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2006/41] | B62M23/00, H01M8/10 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2007/36] |
Former [2006/41] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Motorrad mit Brennstoffzelle | [2008/13] | English: | Motorcycle with fuel cell | [2008/13] | French: | Motocyclette avec pile à combustible | [2008/13] |
Former [2006/41] | Motorrad mit Brennstoffzelle und Stapelstruktur für Brennstoffzelle | ||
Former [2006/41] | Motorcycle with fuel cell and stack structure of fuel cell | ||
Former [2006/41] | Motocyclette avec pile à combustible et structure d'empilement de pile à combustible | Examination procedure | 31.03.2006 | Examination requested [2006/41] | 15.12.2006 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.02.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.06.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.02.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.06.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 27.06.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP07116197.0 / EP1860721 | Opposition(s) | 14.05.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US6326765 (HUGHES PETER S [US], et al) [A] 1-3 * column 4, line 14 - column 4, line 31; figure 2a *; | [X]WO03094260 (GEN MOTORS CORP [US], et al) [X] 5-8 * paragraph [0036] - paragraph [0043]; figures 1,3 *; | [X]EP1398263 (ASIA PACIFIC FUEL CELL TECH [TW]) [X] 1,3 * figure 4 *; | [DPA]EP1526599 (HONDA MOTOR CO LTD [JP]) [DPA] 5-7* abstract *; | [PX]EP1627759 (HONDA MOTOR CO LTD [JP]) [PX] 1-3 * figures 2,3 * |