EP1708263 - Cooling jacket [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.08.2011 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.08.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 07.09.2011 [2011/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hitachi, Ltd. 6-6, Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8280 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2008/47] | For all designated states Hitachi, Ltd. 6-6, Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8280 / JP | ||
Former [2006/40] | For all designated states Hitachi, Ltd. 6-6, Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Atarashi, Takayuki c/o Hitachi, Ltd. 12th Floor Marunouchi Center Bldg 6-1, Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8220 / JP | 02 /
Nakanishi, Masato c/o Hitachi, Ltd. 12th Floor Marunouchi Center Bldg 6-1, Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8220 / JP | [2008/44] |
Former [2006/40] | 01 /
Atarashi, Takayuki c/o Hitachi, Ltd. 12th Floor Marunouchi Center Bldg 1-6-1 Marunouchi Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8220 / JP | ||
02 /
Nakanishi, Masato c/o Hitachi, Ltd. 12th Floor Marunouchi Center Bldg 1-6-1 Marunouchi Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8220 / JP | Representative(s) | Beetz & Partner mbB Patentanwälte Prinzregentenstraße 54 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/38] | Beetz & Partner Patentanwälte Steinsdorfstrasse 10 80538 München / DE | ||
Former [2006/40] | Beetz & Partner Patentanwälte, Steinsdorfstrasse 10 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 06007046.3 | 03.04.2006 | [2006/40] | Priority number, date | JP20050105844 | 01.04.2005 Original published format: JP 2005105844 | [2006/40] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1708263 | Date: | 04.10.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/40] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1708263 | Date: | 29.09.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/39] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.07.2006 | Classification | IPC: | H01L23/473, H01L23/367 | [2006/40] | CPC: |
H01L23/473 (EP,US);
G06F1/20 (KR);
H01L23/3672 (EP,US);
H01L2924/0002 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
H01L2924/0002, H01L2924/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2007/24] |
Former [2006/40] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Kühlmantel | [2006/40] | English: | Cooling jacket | [2006/40] | French: | Carter de refroidissement | [2006/40] | Examination procedure | 04.04.2007 | Examination requested [2007/21] | 30.05.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 10.12.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.05.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.09.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 16.09.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 30.06.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 04.05.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2002070006 (MOK LAWRENCE SHUNGWEI [US], et al) [X] 1,3,5 * paragraph [0008] * * paragraph [0017] * * paragraph [0021] * * paragraph [0026] *; | [X]US4558395 (YAMADA MINORU [JP], et al) [X] 5 * figures 3,4 * * column 2, line 59 - column 3, line 6 * * column 3, line 45 * * column 4, line 42 - line 47 *; | [Y]US5132780 (HIGGINS III LEO M [US]) [Y] 1-4 * figures 1-8 * * column 5, line 1 - line 28 * * column 5, line 58 - column 6, line 3 *; | [Y]EP0641023 (IBM [US]) [Y] 1-4 * figures 1,3 * * column 4, line 22 - line 52 * * column 6, line 31 - line 46 * * column 7, line 19 - line 31 *; | [A]US2003029601 (JOHNSON ERIC ARTHUR [US], et al) [A] 2 * figure 4 *; | [A]EP1175135 (MITSUBISHI MATERIALS CORP [JP]) |