EP1736044 - Method and apparatus for determining grain loss in a combine [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.07.2009 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.09.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, TR | published on 02.11.2011 [2011/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CLAAS Selbstfahrende Erntemaschinen GmbH Münsterstrasse 33 33428 Harsewinkel / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2006/52] | For all designated states CLAAS Selbstfahrende Erntemaschinen GmbH Münsterstrasse 33 33428 Harsewinkel / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Piontek, Michael Sandweg 2a 23701 Zarnekau / DE | [2006/52] | Application number, filing date | 06007074.5 | 03.04.2006 | [2006/52] | Priority number, date | DE20051028997 | 21.06.2005 Original published format: DE102005028997 | [2006/52] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1736044 | Date: | 27.12.2006 | Language: | DE | [2006/52] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1736044 | Date: | 03.09.2008 | Language: | DE | [2008/36] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.09.2006 | Classification | IPC: | A01D41/127 | [2006/52] | CPC: |
A01D41/1273 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/52] | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Ermittlung der Körnerverluste an einem Mähdrescher | [2006/52] | English: | Method and apparatus for determining grain loss in a combine | [2006/52] | French: | Procédé et dispositif de détermination des pertes de grain dans une moissonneuse-batteuse | [2006/52] | Examination procedure | 27.06.2007 | Examination requested [2007/32] | 07.08.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.12.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.06.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.07.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 18.07.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 04.06.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.05.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 03.09.2008 | CZ | 03.09.2008 | DK | 03.09.2008 | EE | 03.09.2008 | FI | 03.09.2008 | IE | 03.09.2008 | IT | 03.09.2008 | LT | 03.09.2008 | LV | 03.09.2008 | NL | 03.09.2008 | PL | 03.09.2008 | RO | 03.09.2008 | SI | 03.09.2008 | SK | 03.09.2008 | TR | 03.09.2008 | BG | 03.12.2008 | SE | 03.12.2008 | GR | 04.12.2008 | ES | 14.12.2008 | IS | 03.01.2009 | PT | 03.02.2009 | HU | 04.03.2009 | AT | 03.04.2009 | LU | 03.04.2009 | MC | 30.04.2009 | [2011/43] |
Former [2011/32] | CZ | 03.09.2008 | |
DK | 03.09.2008 | ||
EE | 03.09.2008 | ||
FI | 03.09.2008 | ||
IE | 03.09.2008 | ||
IT | 03.09.2008 | ||
LT | 03.09.2008 | ||
LV | 03.09.2008 | ||
NL | 03.09.2008 | ||
PL | 03.09.2008 | ||
RO | 03.09.2008 | ||
SI | 03.09.2008 | ||
SK | 03.09.2008 | ||
BG | 03.12.2008 | ||
SE | 03.12.2008 | ||
GR | 04.12.2008 | ||
ES | 14.12.2008 | ||
IS | 03.01.2009 | ||
PT | 03.02.2009 | ||
HU | 04.03.2009 | ||
AT | 03.04.2009 | ||
LU | 03.04.2009 | ||
MC | 30.04.2009 | ||
Former [2011/22] | CZ | 03.09.2008 | |
DK | 03.09.2008 | ||
EE | 03.09.2008 | ||
FI | 03.09.2008 | ||
IE | 03.09.2008 | ||
IT | 03.09.2008 | ||
LT | 03.09.2008 | ||
LV | 03.09.2008 | ||
NL | 03.09.2008 | ||
PL | 03.09.2008 | ||
RO | 03.09.2008 | ||
SI | 03.09.2008 | ||
SK | 03.09.2008 | ||
BG | 03.12.2008 | ||
SE | 03.12.2008 | ||
GR | 04.12.2008 | ||
ES | 14.12.2008 | ||
IS | 03.01.2009 | ||
PT | 03.02.2009 | ||
AT | 03.04.2009 | ||
LU | 03.04.2009 | ||
MC | 30.04.2009 | ||
Former [2011/02] | CZ | 03.09.2008 | |
DK | 03.09.2008 | ||
EE | 03.09.2008 | ||
FI | 03.09.2008 | ||
IE | 03.09.2008 | ||
IT | 03.09.2008 | ||
LT | 03.09.2008 | ||
LV | 03.09.2008 | ||
NL | 03.09.2008 | ||
PL | 03.09.2008 | ||
RO | 03.09.2008 | ||
SI | 03.09.2008 | ||
SK | 03.09.2008 | ||
BG | 03.12.2008 | ||
SE | 03.12.2008 | ||
GR | 04.12.2008 | ||
ES | 14.12.2008 | ||
IS | 03.01.2009 | ||
PT | 03.02.2009 | ||
AT | 03.04.2009 | ||
MC | 30.04.2009 | ||
Former [2010/40] | CZ | 03.09.2008 | |
DK | 03.09.2008 | ||
EE | 03.09.2008 | ||
FI | 03.09.2008 | ||
IE | 03.09.2008 | ||
IT | 03.09.2008 | ||
LT | 03.09.2008 | ||
LV | 03.09.2008 | ||
NL | 03.09.2008 | ||
PL | 03.09.2008 | ||
RO | 03.09.2008 | ||
SI | 03.09.2008 | ||
SK | 03.09.2008 | ||
BG | 03.12.2008 | ||
SE | 03.12.2008 | ||
ES | 14.12.2008 | ||
IS | 03.01.2009 | ||
PT | 03.02.2009 | ||
AT | 03.04.2009 | ||
MC | 30.04.2009 | ||
Former [2010/25] | CZ | 03.09.2008 | |
DK | 03.09.2008 | ||
EE | 03.09.2008 | ||
FI | 03.09.2008 | ||
IE | 03.09.2008 | ||
IT | 03.09.2008 | ||
LT | 03.09.2008 | ||
LV | 03.09.2008 | ||
NL | 03.09.2008 | ||
PL | 03.09.2008 | ||
RO | 03.09.2008 | ||
SI | 03.09.2008 | ||
SK | 03.09.2008 | ||
BG | 03.12.2008 | ||
SE | 03.12.2008 | ||
ES | 14.12.2008 | ||
IS | 03.01.2009 | ||
PT | 03.02.2009 | ||
MC | 30.04.2009 | ||
Former [2010/13] | CZ | 03.09.2008 | |
DK | 03.09.2008 | ||
EE | 03.09.2008 | ||
FI | 03.09.2008 | ||
IE | 03.09.2008 | ||
IT | 03.09.2008 | ||
LT | 03.09.2008 | ||
LV | 03.09.2008 | ||
NL | 03.09.2008 | ||
RO | 03.09.2008 | ||
SI | 03.09.2008 | ||
SK | 03.09.2008 | ||
BG | 03.12.2008 | ||
SE | 03.12.2008 | ||
ES | 14.12.2008 | ||
IS | 03.01.2009 | ||
PT | 03.02.2009 | ||
Former [2010/01] | CZ | 03.09.2008 | |
DK | 03.09.2008 | ||
EE | 03.09.2008 | ||
FI | 03.09.2008 | ||
IE | 03.09.2008 | ||
IT | 03.09.2008 | ||
LT | 03.09.2008 | ||
LV | 03.09.2008 | ||
NL | 03.09.2008 | ||
RO | 03.09.2008 | ||
SI | 03.09.2008 | ||
SK | 03.09.2008 | ||
BG | 03.12.2008 | ||
ES | 14.12.2008 | ||
IS | 03.01.2009 | ||
PT | 03.02.2009 | ||
Former [2009/28] | CZ | 03.09.2008 | |
FI | 03.09.2008 | ||
IE | 03.09.2008 | ||
LT | 03.09.2008 | ||
LV | 03.09.2008 | ||
NL | 03.09.2008 | ||
RO | 03.09.2008 | ||
SI | 03.09.2008 | ||
SK | 03.09.2008 | ||
BG | 03.12.2008 | ||
ES | 14.12.2008 | ||
IS | 03.01.2009 | ||
PT | 03.02.2009 | ||
Former [2009/14] | FI | 03.09.2008 | |
LT | 03.09.2008 | ||
LV | 03.09.2008 | ||
NL | 03.09.2008 | ||
SI | 03.09.2008 | ||
ES | 14.12.2008 | ||
Former [2009/12] | LT | 03.09.2008 | |
LV | 03.09.2008 | ||
NL | 03.09.2008 | ||
ES | 14.12.2008 | ||
Former [2009/10] | LT | 03.09.2008 | |
NL | 03.09.2008 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]DD52020 (P. FEIFFER) [Y] 7 * the whole document *; | [A]US4393704 (BARTKO RICHARD [CA]) [A] 1,4* the whole document *; | [XA]US5951395 (PETER JEFFREY [US]) [X] 4,5 * column 5, line 13 - column 8, line 34; figures 1-5 * [A] 1; | [DXAY]DE10062114 (KLUESENDORF-FEIFFER ANDREA [DE]) [DX] 4-6,8 * the whole document * [A] 1 [Y] 7 | by applicant | DE10062114 |