EP1744075 - Rocking lever actuator, in particular for actuating a clutch [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.11.2010 Database last updated on 01.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.10.2012 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 21.11.2012 [2012/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Schaeffler Technologies AG & Co. KG Industriestrasse 1-3 91074 Herzogenaurach / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2010/39] | For all designated states Schaeffler Technologies GmbH & Co. KG Industriestrasse 1-3 91074 Herzogenaurach / DE | ||
Former [2007/03] | For all designated states LuK Lamellen und Kupplungsbau Beteiligungs KG Industriestrasse 3 77815 Bühl / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ahnert, Gerd Holunderweg 1 77880 Sasbach / DE | [2007/03] | Application number, filing date | 06007186.7 | 05.04.2006 | [2007/03] | Priority number, date | DE20051019793 | 28.04.2005 Original published format: DE102005019793 | [2007/03] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1744075 | Date: | 17.01.2007 | Language: | DE | [2007/03] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1744075 | Date: | 06.01.2010 | Language: | DE | [2010/01] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.12.2006 | Classification | IPC: | F16D65/14, F16D23/12 | [2007/03] | CPC: |
F16D29/005 (EP);
F16D28/00 (EP);
F16D2023/126 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/03] | Title | German: | Wipphebelaktor, insbesondere zur Betätigung einer Kupplung | [2007/03] | English: | Rocking lever actuator, in particular for actuating a clutch | [2007/03] | French: | Dispositif de commande avec un levier balancant, en particulier pour un embrayage | [2007/03] | Examination procedure | 17.07.2007 | Examination requested [2007/35] | 17.08.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.12.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.04.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.08.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.09.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.11.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 26.11.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 07.10.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/50] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.05.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 04.05.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 06.01.2010 | CZ | 06.01.2010 | DK | 06.01.2010 | EE | 06.01.2010 | FI | 06.01.2010 | IE | 06.01.2010 | IT | 06.01.2010 | LT | 06.01.2010 | LV | 06.01.2010 | NL | 06.01.2010 | PL | 06.01.2010 | RO | 06.01.2010 | SE | 06.01.2010 | SI | 06.01.2010 | SK | 06.01.2010 | TR | 06.01.2010 | LU | 05.04.2010 | BG | 06.04.2010 | GB | 06.04.2010 | GR | 07.04.2010 | ES | 17.04.2010 | BE | 30.04.2010 | CH | 30.04.2010 | FR | 30.04.2010 | LI | 30.04.2010 | MC | 30.04.2010 | IS | 06.05.2010 | PT | 06.05.2010 | HU | 07.07.2010 | [2012/47] |
Former [2012/43] | CY | 06.01.2010 | |
CZ | 06.01.2010 | ||
DK | 06.01.2010 | ||
EE | 06.01.2010 | ||
FI | 06.01.2010 | ||
IE | 06.01.2010 | ||
IT | 06.01.2010 | ||
LT | 06.01.2010 | ||
LV | 06.01.2010 | ||
NL | 06.01.2010 | ||
PL | 06.01.2010 | ||
RO | 06.01.2010 | ||
SE | 06.01.2010 | ||
SI | 06.01.2010 | ||
SK | 06.01.2010 | ||
LU | 05.04.2010 | ||
BG | 06.04.2010 | ||
GB | 06.04.2010 | ||
GR | 07.04.2010 | ||
ES | 17.04.2010 | ||
BE | 30.04.2010 | ||
CH | 30.04.2010 | ||
FR | 30.04.2010 | ||
LI | 30.04.2010 | ||
MC | 30.04.2010 | ||
IS | 06.05.2010 | ||
PT | 06.05.2010 | ||
HU | 07.07.2010 | ||
Former [2012/42] | CY | 06.01.2010 | |
CZ | 06.01.2010 | ||
DK | 06.01.2010 | ||
EE | 06.01.2010 | ||
FI | 06.01.2010 | ||
IE | 06.01.2010 | ||
IT | 06.01.2010 | ||
LT | 06.01.2010 | ||
LV | 06.01.2010 | ||
NL | 06.01.2010 | ||
PL | 06.01.2010 | ||
RO | 06.01.2010 | ||
SE | 06.01.2010 | ||
SI | 06.01.2010 | ||
SK | 06.01.2010 | ||
BG | 06.04.2010 | ||
GB | 06.04.2010 | ||
GR | 07.04.2010 | ||
ES | 17.04.2010 | ||
BE | 30.04.2010 | ||
CH | 30.04.2010 | ||
FR | 30.04.2010 | ||
LI | 30.04.2010 | ||
MC | 30.04.2010 | ||
IS | 06.05.2010 | ||
PT | 06.05.2010 | ||
HU | 07.07.2010 | ||
Former [2012/33] | CY | 06.01.2010 | |
CZ | 06.01.2010 | ||
DK | 06.01.2010 | ||
EE | 06.01.2010 | ||
FI | 06.01.2010 | ||
IE | 06.01.2010 | ||
IT | 06.01.2010 | ||
LT | 06.01.2010 | ||
LV | 06.01.2010 | ||
NL | 06.01.2010 | ||
PL | 06.01.2010 | ||
RO | 06.01.2010 | ||
SE | 06.01.2010 | ||
SI | 06.01.2010 | ||
SK | 06.01.2010 | ||
BG | 06.04.2010 | ||
GB | 06.04.2010 | ||
GR | 07.04.2010 | ||
ES | 17.04.2010 | ||
BE | 30.04.2010 | ||
CH | 30.04.2010 | ||
FR | 30.04.2010 | ||
LI | 30.04.2010 | ||
MC | 30.04.2010 | ||
IS | 06.05.2010 | ||
PT | 06.05.2010 | ||
Former [2011/16] | CY | 06.01.2010 | |
CZ | 06.01.2010 | ||
DK | 06.01.2010 | ||
EE | 06.01.2010 | ||
FI | 06.01.2010 | ||
IE | 06.01.2010 | ||
IT | 06.01.2010 | ||
LT | 06.01.2010 | ||
LV | 06.01.2010 | ||
NL | 06.01.2010 | ||
PL | 06.01.2010 | ||
RO | 06.01.2010 | ||
SE | 06.01.2010 | ||
SI | 06.01.2010 | ||
SK | 06.01.2010 | ||
BG | 06.04.2010 | ||
GB | 06.04.2010 | ||
GR | 07.04.2010 | ||
ES | 17.04.2010 | ||
BE | 30.04.2010 | ||
CH | 30.04.2010 | ||
LI | 30.04.2010 | ||
MC | 30.04.2010 | ||
IS | 06.05.2010 | ||
PT | 06.05.2010 | ||
Former [2011/12] | CY | 06.01.2010 | |
CZ | 06.01.2010 | ||
DK | 06.01.2010 | ||
EE | 06.01.2010 | ||
FI | 06.01.2010 | ||
IE | 06.01.2010 | ||
LT | 06.01.2010 | ||
LV | 06.01.2010 | ||
NL | 06.01.2010 | ||
PL | 06.01.2010 | ||
RO | 06.01.2010 | ||
SE | 06.01.2010 | ||
SI | 06.01.2010 | ||
SK | 06.01.2010 | ||
BG | 06.04.2010 | ||
GR | 07.04.2010 | ||
ES | 17.04.2010 | ||
CH | 30.04.2010 | ||
LI | 30.04.2010 | ||
MC | 30.04.2010 | ||
IS | 06.05.2010 | ||
PT | 06.05.2010 | ||
Former [2011/08] | CY | 06.01.2010 | |
CZ | 06.01.2010 | ||
DK | 06.01.2010 | ||
EE | 06.01.2010 | ||
FI | 06.01.2010 | ||
IE | 06.01.2010 | ||
LT | 06.01.2010 | ||
LV | 06.01.2010 | ||
NL | 06.01.2010 | ||
PL | 06.01.2010 | ||
RO | 06.01.2010 | ||
SE | 06.01.2010 | ||
SI | 06.01.2010 | ||
SK | 06.01.2010 | ||
BG | 06.04.2010 | ||
GR | 07.04.2010 | ||
ES | 17.04.2010 | ||
MC | 30.04.2010 | ||
IS | 06.05.2010 | ||
PT | 06.05.2010 | ||
Former [2011/02] | CY | 06.01.2010 | |
CZ | 06.01.2010 | ||
EE | 06.01.2010 | ||
FI | 06.01.2010 | ||
IE | 06.01.2010 | ||
LT | 06.01.2010 | ||
LV | 06.01.2010 | ||
NL | 06.01.2010 | ||
PL | 06.01.2010 | ||
RO | 06.01.2010 | ||
SE | 06.01.2010 | ||
SI | 06.01.2010 | ||
SK | 06.01.2010 | ||
BG | 06.04.2010 | ||
GR | 07.04.2010 | ||
ES | 17.04.2010 | ||
MC | 30.04.2010 | ||
IS | 06.05.2010 | ||
PT | 06.05.2010 | ||
Former [2010/40] | FI | 06.01.2010 | |
LT | 06.01.2010 | ||
LV | 06.01.2010 | ||
NL | 06.01.2010 | ||
PL | 06.01.2010 | ||
SI | 06.01.2010 | ||
ES | 17.04.2010 | ||
IS | 06.05.2010 | ||
PT | 06.05.2010 | ||
Former [2010/33] | SI | 06.01.2010 | |
ES | 17.04.2010 | ||
Former [2010/25] | SI | 06.01.2010 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE3718973 (TEVES GMBH ALFRED [DE]) [X] 1-6,9,10,12,13,15 * figures 1,6,7 *; | [X]DE3718955 (TEVES GMBH ALFRED [DE]) [X] 1-10,12,13 * figures 1,2; claims 1,11 *; | [X]DE10308886 (LUCAS AUTOMOTIVE GMBH [DE]) [X] 1-10,12,13 * figures 1-7 *; | [X]EP1455106 (LUK LAMELLEN & KUPPLUNGSBAU [DE]) [X] 13,15-17* figures 35-48; claims 1,47 * | by applicant | DE102004009832 |