EP1701224 - Connector, development cartridge, and image forming apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 01.10.2010 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.10.2010 | Withdrawal of application | published on 03.11.2010 [2010/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Seiko Epson Corporation 4-1, Nishishinjuku 2-chome Shinjuku-ku Tokyo 163-0811 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2006/37] | For all designated states SEIKO EPSON CORPORATION 4-1, Nishishinjuku 2-Chome Shinjuku-ku Tokyo 163-0811 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Okamoto, Katsumi c/o Seiko Epson Corporation 3-5,Owa 3-chome, Suwa-shi Nagano-ken 392-8502 / JP | 02 /
Shirokoshi, Junji c/o Seiko Epson Corporation 3-5,Owa 3-chome, Suwa-shi Nagano-ken 392-8502 / JP | 03 /
Aoki, Takeshi, c/o Seiko Epson Corporation 3-5,Owa 3-chome, Suwa-shi Nagano-ken 392-8502 / JP | [2006/37] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/31] | HOFFMANN EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | ||
Former [2006/37] | HOFFMANN EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 06007191.7 | 19.02.2003 | [2006/37] | Priority number, date | JP20020041139 | 19.02.2002 Original published format: JP 2002041139 | JP20020041140 | 19.02.2002 Original published format: JP 2002041140 | JP20020042877 | 20.02.2002 Original published format: JP 2002042877 | JP20020057178 | 04.03.2002 Original published format: JP 2002057178 | [2006/37] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1701224 | Date: | 13.09.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/37] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.07.2006 | Classification | IPC: | G03G21/18, H01R13/66 | [2006/37] | CPC: |
B41J2/17526 (EP,US);
G03G15/0126 (EP,US);
G03G21/1652 (EP,US);
G03G21/1885 (EP,US);
H01R12/714 (EP,US);
H01R13/631 (EP,US);
G03G2215/0177 (EP,US);
G03G2221/166 (EP,US);
G03G2221/1815 (EP,US);
G03G2221/1823 (EP,US);
H01R12/83 (EP,US);
H01R13/665 (EP,US);
H01R13/6658 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/37] | Title | German: | Stecker, Entwicklerkartusche und Bilderzeugungsvorrichtung | [2006/37] | English: | Connector, development cartridge, and image forming apparatus | [2006/37] | French: | Connecteur, cartouche de développement et appareil de formation d'images | [2006/37] | Examination procedure | 26.01.2007 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.03.2007 | Examination requested [2007/17] | 27.09.2010 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2010/44] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP03003182.7 / EP1338931 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.04.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.04.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.02.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.02.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 23.02.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4222622 (GRIFFIN WENDELL L, et al) [A] 1-5* column 3, line 5 - column 4, line 16; figures 2,3 *; | [A]US4903167 (LICHTENSPERGER ERNST [DE]) [A] 1-5 * column 1, line 64 - column 3, line 19; figures 1-3 *; | [YA]DE4111912 (KLOECKNER MOELLER GMBH [DE]) [Y] 1,3-5 * the whole document * [A] 2; | [YA]US5697802 (KAWABE EIJI [JP]) [Y] 1,3-5 * column 1, line 11 - column 2, line 34; figures 43,44 * [A] 2; | [YA]US6014533 (KAWANA TAKASHI [JP]) [Y] 1,3-5 * column 4, line 9 - column 10, line 22; figures 1,6-10,12,13,15 * * column 1, line 7 - line 31 * [A] 2 |