EP1681211 - Gas generator for air bags and air bag device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.10.2009 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.10.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 25.11.2009 [2009/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Daicel Chemical Industries, Ltd. Mainichi Intecio 3-4-5, Umeda Kita-ku, Osaka-shi Osaka 530-0001 / JP | [2008/01] |
Former [2006/29] | For all designated states DAICEL CHEMICAL INDUSTRIES, LTD. 1, Teppo-cho Sakai-shi, Osaka / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Iwai, Yasunori 7-23-705 Nakanohonmachi Shijyonawate-shi Osaka 575-0051 / JP | 02 /
Katsuda, Nobuyuki 4-2-2, Ohtsucho Ohtsu-ku Himeji-shi Hyogo 671-1146 / JP | 03 /
Nakashima, Yoshihiro 4-21-1, Takhamacho Hirohata-ku Himejii-shi Hyogo 671-1153 / JP | 04 /
Ohji, Nobuyuki; c/o Daicel Chemical Industries, Lt Harima Plant, 805 Umaba, Ibogawacho Tatsuno-shi, Hyogo 671-1681 / JP | [2006/44] |
Former [2006/29] | 01 /
Iwai, Yasunori 7-23-705 Nakanohonmachi Shijyonawate-shi Osaka 575-0051 / JP | ||
02 /
Katsuda, Nobuyuki 4-2-2, Ohtsucho Ohtsu-ku Himeji-shi Hyogo 671-1146 / JP | |||
03 /
Nakashima, Yoshihiro 4-21-1, Takhamacho Hirohata-ku Himejii-shi Hyogo 671-1153 / JP | |||
04 /
Ohji, Nobuyuki 500-323, Kamiyobe Yobe-ku Himeji-shi Hyogo 671-1262 / JP | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstraße 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2006/29] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 06007327.7 | 04.10.2000 | [2006/29] | Priority number, date | JP19990283422 | 04.10.1999 Original published format: JP 28342299 | JP19990283423 | 04.10.1999 Original published format: JP 28342399 | JP19990291982 | 14.10.1999 Original published format: JP 29198299 | JP20000288083 | 22.09.2000 Original published format: JP 2000288083 | JP20000289201 | 22.09.2000 Original published format: JP 2000289201 | [2006/29] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1681211 | Date: | 19.07.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/29] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1681211 | Date: | 27.09.2006 | [2006/39] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1681211 | Date: | 17.12.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/51] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.08.2006 | Classification | IPC: | B60R21/26 | [2006/29] | CPC: |
B60R21/2644 (EP,US);
B60R21/264 (KR);
B60R21/217 (KR);
B60R21/26 (KR);
B60R2021/2633 (EP,US);
B60R2021/2648 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2006/29] | Title | German: | Gasgenerator für Airbags und Airbagvorrichtung | [2006/29] | English: | Gas generator for air bags and air bag device | [2006/29] | French: | Génerateur de gaz pour coussins de sécurité gonflables et dispositif de coussin de sécurité gonflable | [2006/29] | Examination procedure | 06.04.2006 | Examination requested [2006/29] | 29.01.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.04.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.07.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.11.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.12.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.02.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.05.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.08.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 11.08.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP00964652.2 / EP1219509 | Opposition(s) | 18.09.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/48] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.04.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 06.04.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 06.04.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 06.04.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.10.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 30.10.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 30.10.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]DE29809062U (TRW AIRBAG SYS GMBH & CO KG [DE]) [Y] 1-4 * page 3, line 17 - page 4, line 27; figure 1 *; | [Y]DE19522847 (AUTOLIV DEV [DE]) [Y] 1-4 * column 1, line 1 - line 6 * * column 2, line 41 - line 44 *; | [A]US5936195 (WHEATLEY BRIAN K [US]) [A] 1-4 * abstract *; | [A]US5536340 (RAMASWAMY COODLY P [US]) [A] 1-4 * column 1, line 7 - column 2, line 13 * * column 6, line 36 - line 37; claim 11 *; | [Y]JPH05319199 ; | [Y]US5765866 (CANTERBERRY J B [US], et al) [Y] 5,6 * column 3, line 53 - column 4, line 4 * * column 11, line 53 - column 12, line 55; figure - *; | [X]US5756928 (ITO YUJI [JP], et al) [X] 5,6 * abstract *; | [X]EP0778181 (MORTON INT INC [US]) [X] 5,6 * abstract * | [Y] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19940307), vol. 018, no. 136, Database accession no. (M - 1572), & JP05319199 A 19931203 (TAKATA KK) [Y] 5,6 * abstract * | Examination | DE19502403 | WO9406735 |