19.10.2012 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 21.11.2012 [2012/47] |
10.08.2012 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 12.09.2012 [2012/37] |
18.03.2011 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 20.04.2011 [2011/16] |
10.12.2010 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 12.01.2011 [2011/02] |
03.09.2010 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 06.10.2010 [2010/40] |
13.08.2010 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 15.09.2010 [2010/37] |
16.07.2010 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 18.08.2010 [2010/33] |
25.06.2010 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 28.07.2010 [2010/30] |
18.06.2010 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 21.07.2010 [2010/29] |
21.05.2010 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 23.06.2010 [2010/25] |
09.04.2010 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 12.05.2010 [2010/19] |
06.11.2009 |
Change - representative |
published on 09.12.2009 [2009/50] |
04.09.2009 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 07.10.2009 [2009/41] |
01.09.2009 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
01.09.2009 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
18.07.2009 |
Change: Renewal fee paid |
|
18.07.2009 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
22.04.2009 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
10.02.2009 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
15.12.2008 |
Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
08.08.2008 |
First examination report |
|
06.08.2008 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
09.04.2008 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
18.01.2008 |
Definitive list of designations |
published on 20.02.2008 [2008/08] |
15.12.2007 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
12.07.2007 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
11.05.2007 |
Publication of search report |
published on 13.06.2007 [2007/24] |
11.05.2007 |
Change - classification |
published on 13.06.2007 [2007/24] |
11.05.2007 |
Change - classification |
published on 13.06.2007 [2007/24] |
03.08.2006 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
02.06.2006 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 05.07.2006 [2006/27] |
02.06.2006 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 05.07.2006 [2006/27] |
14.04.2006 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|