EP1712586 - Flame-retarded foamed plastic compositions and shaped articles [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.09.2008 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.02.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 30.03.2011 [2011/13] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Dai-Ichi Kogyo Seiyaku Co., Ltd. 55 Nishishichijo Higashikubo-cho Shimogyo-ku Kyoto-shi / JP | [2008/01] |
Former [2006/42] | For all designated states Dai-Ichi F R Co., Ltd. 12-1, 3-Chome Nihonbashi Chuo-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Onishi, Hideaki 12-1-705, Kojogaoka Otsu-shi Shiga / JP | 02 /
Morishita, Ken 1-4-206, Katsura-kaminohigashi-cho Nishikyo-ku Kyoto-shi Kyoto / JP | [2006/42] | Representative(s) | Reitstötter Kinzebach Patentanwälte Sternwartstraße 4 81679 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2006/42] | Reitstötter - Kinzebach Patentanwälte, Sternwartstrasse 4 81679 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 06007510.8 | 10.04.2006 | [2006/42] | Priority number, date | JP20050114100 | 12.04.2005 Original published format: JP 2005114100 | [2006/42] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1712586 | Date: | 18.10.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/42] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1712586 | Date: | 07.11.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/45] | Type: | B8 Corrected title page of specification | No.: | EP1712586 | Date: | 18.06.2008 | [2008/25] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.05.2006 | Classification | IPC: | C08K5/00, C08K5/3435, C08K5/3492 | [2006/42] | CPC: |
C08J9/0019 (EP,US);
C08K5/3432 (KR);
B29C43/003 (KR);
B29C44/00 (KR);
C08J5/00 (KR);
C08J9/0028 (EP,US);
C08J9/0066 (KR);
C08J9/141 (EP,US);
C08J9/20 (EP,US);
C08K3/16 (KR);
C08K5/0066 (EP,US);
C08K5/0083 (KR);
C08K5/3435 (EP,US);
C08K5/526 (EP,US);
C08L25/06 (KR);
C08J2201/03 (EP,US);
C08J2203/14 (EP,US);
C08J2325/06 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
C08K5/0066, C08L25/06 (EP,US);
C08K5/3435, C08L25/06 (US,EP);
C08K5/526, C08L25/06 (US,EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/42] | Title | German: | Flammhemmende, geschäumte Kunststoffzusammensetzungen und Formteile | [2006/42] | English: | Flame-retarded foamed plastic compositions and shaped articles | [2006/42] | French: | Compositions plastiques ignifuges en mousse et articles formés | [2006/42] | Examination procedure | 21.11.2006 | Examination requested [2007/01] | 22.12.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.04.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.05.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.09.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 18.09.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP07116569.0 / EP1889869 | Opposition(s) | 08.08.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/42] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 07.11.2007 | BE | 07.11.2007 | CH | 07.11.2007 | CY | 07.11.2007 | CZ | 07.11.2007 | DK | 07.11.2007 | EE | 07.11.2007 | FI | 07.11.2007 | IT | 07.11.2007 | LI | 07.11.2007 | LT | 07.11.2007 | LV | 07.11.2007 | PL | 07.11.2007 | RO | 07.11.2007 | SI | 07.11.2007 | SK | 07.11.2007 | TR | 07.11.2007 | BG | 07.02.2008 | SE | 07.02.2008 | GR | 08.02.2008 | ES | 18.02.2008 | IS | 07.03.2008 | PT | 07.04.2008 | IE | 10.04.2008 | LU | 10.04.2008 | MC | 30.04.2008 | HU | 08.05.2008 | [2011/13] |
Former [2010/40] | AT | 07.11.2007 | |
BE | 07.11.2007 | ||
CH | 07.11.2007 | ||
CY | 07.11.2007 | ||
CZ | 07.11.2007 | ||
DK | 07.11.2007 | ||
EE | 07.11.2007 | ||
FI | 07.11.2007 | ||
LI | 07.11.2007 | ||
LT | 07.11.2007 | ||
LV | 07.11.2007 | ||
PL | 07.11.2007 | ||
RO | 07.11.2007 | ||
SI | 07.11.2007 | ||
SK | 07.11.2007 | ||
TR | 07.11.2007 | ||
BG | 07.02.2008 | ||
SE | 07.02.2008 | ||
GR | 08.02.2008 | ||
ES | 18.02.2008 | ||
IS | 07.03.2008 | ||
PT | 07.04.2008 | ||
IE | 10.04.2008 | ||
LU | 10.04.2008 | ||
MC | 30.04.2008 | ||
HU | 08.05.2008 | ||
Former [2010/33] | AT | 07.11.2007 | |
BE | 07.11.2007 | ||
CH | 07.11.2007 | ||
CY | 07.11.2007 | ||
CZ | 07.11.2007 | ||
DK | 07.11.2007 | ||
EE | 07.11.2007 | ||
FI | 07.11.2007 | ||
LI | 07.11.2007 | ||
LT | 07.11.2007 | ||
LV | 07.11.2007 | ||
PL | 07.11.2007 | ||
RO | 07.11.2007 | ||
SI | 07.11.2007 | ||
SK | 07.11.2007 | ||
BG | 07.02.2008 | ||
SE | 07.02.2008 | ||
GR | 08.02.2008 | ||
ES | 18.02.2008 | ||
IS | 07.03.2008 | ||
PT | 07.04.2008 | ||
IE | 10.04.2008 | ||
LU | 10.04.2008 | ||
MC | 30.04.2008 | ||
Former [2010/01] | AT | 07.11.2007 | |
BE | 07.11.2007 | ||
CH | 07.11.2007 | ||
CY | 07.11.2007 | ||
CZ | 07.11.2007 | ||
DK | 07.11.2007 | ||
EE | 07.11.2007 | ||
FI | 07.11.2007 | ||
LI | 07.11.2007 | ||
LT | 07.11.2007 | ||
LV | 07.11.2007 | ||
PL | 07.11.2007 | ||
RO | 07.11.2007 | ||
SI | 07.11.2007 | ||
SK | 07.11.2007 | ||
BG | 07.02.2008 | ||
SE | 07.02.2008 | ||
GR | 08.02.2008 | ||
ES | 18.02.2008 | ||
IS | 07.03.2008 | ||
PT | 07.04.2008 | ||
IE | 10.04.2008 | ||
MC | 30.04.2008 | ||
Former [2009/28] | AT | 07.11.2007 | |
BE | 07.11.2007 | ||
CH | 07.11.2007 | ||
CZ | 07.11.2007 | ||
DK | 07.11.2007 | ||
EE | 07.11.2007 | ||
FI | 07.11.2007 | ||
LI | 07.11.2007 | ||
LT | 07.11.2007 | ||
LV | 07.11.2007 | ||
PL | 07.11.2007 | ||
RO | 07.11.2007 | ||
SI | 07.11.2007 | ||
SK | 07.11.2007 | ||
BG | 07.02.2008 | ||
SE | 07.02.2008 | ||
GR | 08.02.2008 | ||
ES | 18.02.2008 | ||
IS | 07.03.2008 | ||
PT | 07.04.2008 | ||
IE | 10.04.2008 | ||
MC | 30.04.2008 | ||
Former [2009/11] | AT | 07.11.2007 | |
BE | 07.11.2007 | ||
CH | 07.11.2007 | ||
CZ | 07.11.2007 | ||
DK | 07.11.2007 | ||
EE | 07.11.2007 | ||
FI | 07.11.2007 | ||
LI | 07.11.2007 | ||
LT | 07.11.2007 | ||
LV | 07.11.2007 | ||
PL | 07.11.2007 | ||
RO | 07.11.2007 | ||
SI | 07.11.2007 | ||
SK | 07.11.2007 | ||
BG | 07.02.2008 | ||
SE | 07.02.2008 | ||
GR | 08.02.2008 | ||
ES | 18.02.2008 | ||
IS | 07.03.2008 | ||
PT | 07.04.2008 | ||
MC | 30.04.2008 | ||
Former [2008/51] | AT | 07.11.2007 | |
BE | 07.11.2007 | ||
CH | 07.11.2007 | ||
CZ | 07.11.2007 | ||
DK | 07.11.2007 | ||
LI | 07.11.2007 | ||
LT | 07.11.2007 | ||
LV | 07.11.2007 | ||
PL | 07.11.2007 | ||
RO | 07.11.2007 | ||
SI | 07.11.2007 | ||
SK | 07.11.2007 | ||
BG | 07.02.2008 | ||
SE | 07.02.2008 | ||
ES | 18.02.2008 | ||
IS | 07.03.2008 | ||
PT | 07.04.2008 | ||
MC | 30.04.2008 | ||
Former [2008/42] | AT | 07.11.2007 | |
BE | 07.11.2007 | ||
CH | 07.11.2007 | ||
CZ | 07.11.2007 | ||
DK | 07.11.2007 | ||
LI | 07.11.2007 | ||
LT | 07.11.2007 | ||
LV | 07.11.2007 | ||
PL | 07.11.2007 | ||
RO | 07.11.2007 | ||
SI | 07.11.2007 | ||
SK | 07.11.2007 | ||
BG | 07.02.2008 | ||
SE | 07.02.2008 | ||
ES | 18.02.2008 | ||
IS | 07.03.2008 | ||
PT | 07.04.2008 | ||
Former [2008/40] | AT | 07.11.2007 | |
BE | 07.11.2007 | ||
CH | 07.11.2007 | ||
CZ | 07.11.2007 | ||
DK | 07.11.2007 | ||
LI | 07.11.2007 | ||
LT | 07.11.2007 | ||
LV | 07.11.2007 | ||
PL | 07.11.2007 | ||
RO | 07.11.2007 | ||
SI | 07.11.2007 | ||
SK | 07.11.2007 | ||
BG | 07.02.2008 | ||
SE | 07.02.2008 | ||
ES | 18.02.2008 | ||
IS | 07.03.2008 | ||
Former [2008/35] | AT | 07.11.2007 | |
CH | 07.11.2007 | ||
CZ | 07.11.2007 | ||
DK | 07.11.2007 | ||
LI | 07.11.2007 | ||
LT | 07.11.2007 | ||
LV | 07.11.2007 | ||
PL | 07.11.2007 | ||
SI | 07.11.2007 | ||
BG | 07.02.2008 | ||
SE | 07.02.2008 | ||
ES | 18.02.2008 | ||
IS | 07.03.2008 | ||
Former [2008/29] | AT | 07.11.2007 | |
CH | 07.11.2007 | ||
LI | 07.11.2007 | ||
LT | 07.11.2007 | ||
LV | 07.11.2007 | ||
PL | 07.11.2007 | ||
SI | 07.11.2007 | ||
BG | 07.02.2008 | ||
SE | 07.02.2008 | ||
ES | 18.02.2008 | ||
IS | 07.03.2008 | ||
Former [2008/27] | CH | 07.11.2007 | |
LI | 07.11.2007 | ||
LT | 07.11.2007 | ||
LV | 07.11.2007 | ||
PL | 07.11.2007 | ||
SI | 07.11.2007 | ||
BG | 07.02.2008 | ||
SE | 07.02.2008 | ||
ES | 18.02.2008 | ||
IS | 07.03.2008 | ||
Former [2008/26] | CH | 07.11.2007 | |
LI | 07.11.2007 | ||
LT | 07.11.2007 | ||
PL | 07.11.2007 | ||
SI | 07.11.2007 | ||
BG | 07.02.2008 | ||
SE | 07.02.2008 | ||
ES | 18.02.2008 | ||
IS | 07.03.2008 | ||
Former [2008/24] | CH | 07.11.2007 | |
LI | 07.11.2007 | ||
LT | 07.11.2007 | ||
PL | 07.11.2007 | ||
BG | 07.02.2008 | ||
SE | 07.02.2008 | ||
ES | 18.02.2008 | ||
IS | 07.03.2008 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0366057 (PENNWALT CORP [US]) [X] 1-10 * the whole document *; | [X]WO9006691 (GREAT LAKES CHEMICAL CORP [US]) [X] 1-10 * the whole document *; | [X]US4973610 (HAHN KLAUS [DE], et al) [X] 1-10 * the whole document *; | [Y]EP0416843 (ETHYL CORP [US]) [Y] 1-10* the whole document *; | [X]EP0775719 (UNION CARBIDE CHEM PLASTIC [US]) [X] 1-10 * the whole document *; | [Y]WO9745477 (BASF AG [DE], et al) [Y] 1-10 * the whole document *; | [X]WO9828361 (CIBA GEIGY AG [CH], et al) [X] 1-10 * the whole document * |