EP1712828 - Body-mounted support [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.01.2009 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.12.2010 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): GR | published on 12.01.2011 [2011/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Camera Dynamics GmbH Erfurter Strasse 16 85386 Eching / DE | [2007/21] |
Former [2006/42] | For all designated states Sachtler GmbH & Co. KG Erfurter Strasse 16 85386 Eching / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hein, Dieter Dorfstrasse 40 86949 Windach-Hechenwang / DE | 02 /
Schaller, Curt Maxlrainstrasse 3 81541 München / DE | 03 /
Seipel, Roland Almweg 3 86565 Gachenbach/Sattelberg / DE | [2006/42] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastrasse 30 81925 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2006/42] | HOFFMANN EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 06007591.8 | 11.04.2006 | [2006/42] | Priority number, date | DE20051017487 | 15.04.2005 Original published format: DE102005017487 | [2006/42] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1712828 | Date: | 18.10.2006 | Language: | DE | [2006/42] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1712828 | Date: | 28.03.2007 | [2007/13] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1712828 | Date: | 05.03.2008 | Language: | DE | [2008/10] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.02.2007 | Classification | IPC: | F16M13/04 | [2006/42] | CPC: |
F16M13/04 (EP,US);
F16M11/2014 (EP,US);
F16M11/2092 (EP,US);
F16M11/24 (EP,US);
F16M2200/044 (EP,US);
F16M2200/063 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/42] | Title | German: | Körperstativ | [2006/42] | English: | Body-mounted support | [2006/42] | French: | Support à soutien corporel | [2006/42] | Examination procedure | 18.05.2007 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.06.2007 | Examination requested [2007/29] | 12.10.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.01.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 24.01.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 08.12.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/07] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 05.03.2008 | DK | 05.03.2008 | EE | 05.03.2008 | FI | 05.03.2008 | IE | 05.03.2008 | LT | 05.03.2008 | LV | 05.03.2008 | NL | 05.03.2008 | PL | 05.03.2008 | RO | 05.03.2008 | SI | 05.03.2008 | SK | 05.03.2008 | TR | 05.03.2008 | AT | 11.04.2008 | LU | 11.04.2008 | BE | 30.04.2008 | MC | 30.04.2008 | BG | 05.06.2008 | SE | 05.06.2008 | GR | 06.06.2008 | ES | 16.06.2008 | IS | 05.07.2008 | PT | 05.08.2008 | HU | 06.09.2008 | [2011/02] |
Former [2010/40] | CY | 05.03.2008 | |
DK | 05.03.2008 | ||
EE | 05.03.2008 | ||
FI | 05.03.2008 | ||
IE | 05.03.2008 | ||
LT | 05.03.2008 | ||
LV | 05.03.2008 | ||
NL | 05.03.2008 | ||
PL | 05.03.2008 | ||
RO | 05.03.2008 | ||
SI | 05.03.2008 | ||
SK | 05.03.2008 | ||
TR | 05.03.2008 | ||
AT | 11.04.2008 | ||
LU | 11.04.2008 | ||
BE | 30.04.2008 | ||
MC | 30.04.2008 | ||
BG | 05.06.2008 | ||
SE | 05.06.2008 | ||
ES | 16.06.2008 | ||
IS | 05.07.2008 | ||
PT | 05.08.2008 | ||
HU | 06.09.2008 | ||
Former [2010/33] | CY | 05.03.2008 | |
DK | 05.03.2008 | ||
EE | 05.03.2008 | ||
FI | 05.03.2008 | ||
IE | 05.03.2008 | ||
LT | 05.03.2008 | ||
LV | 05.03.2008 | ||
NL | 05.03.2008 | ||
PL | 05.03.2008 | ||
RO | 05.03.2008 | ||
SI | 05.03.2008 | ||
SK | 05.03.2008 | ||
AT | 11.04.2008 | ||
LU | 11.04.2008 | ||
BE | 30.04.2008 | ||
MC | 30.04.2008 | ||
BG | 05.06.2008 | ||
SE | 05.06.2008 | ||
ES | 16.06.2008 | ||
IS | 05.07.2008 | ||
PT | 05.08.2008 | ||
Former [2010/01] | CY | 05.03.2008 | |
DK | 05.03.2008 | ||
EE | 05.03.2008 | ||
FI | 05.03.2008 | ||
IE | 05.03.2008 | ||
LT | 05.03.2008 | ||
LV | 05.03.2008 | ||
NL | 05.03.2008 | ||
PL | 05.03.2008 | ||
RO | 05.03.2008 | ||
SI | 05.03.2008 | ||
SK | 05.03.2008 | ||
AT | 11.04.2008 | ||
BE | 30.04.2008 | ||
MC | 30.04.2008 | ||
BG | 05.06.2008 | ||
SE | 05.06.2008 | ||
ES | 16.06.2008 | ||
IS | 05.07.2008 | ||
PT | 05.08.2008 | ||
Former [2009/28] | DK | 05.03.2008 | |
EE | 05.03.2008 | ||
FI | 05.03.2008 | ||
IE | 05.03.2008 | ||
LT | 05.03.2008 | ||
LV | 05.03.2008 | ||
NL | 05.03.2008 | ||
PL | 05.03.2008 | ||
RO | 05.03.2008 | ||
SI | 05.03.2008 | ||
SK | 05.03.2008 | ||
BE | 30.04.2008 | ||
MC | 30.04.2008 | ||
BG | 05.06.2008 | ||
SE | 05.06.2008 | ||
ES | 16.06.2008 | ||
IS | 05.07.2008 | ||
PT | 05.08.2008 | ||
Former [2009/19] | DK | 05.03.2008 | |
EE | 05.03.2008 | ||
FI | 05.03.2008 | ||
IE | 05.03.2008 | ||
LT | 05.03.2008 | ||
LV | 05.03.2008 | ||
NL | 05.03.2008 | ||
PL | 05.03.2008 | ||
RO | 05.03.2008 | ||
SI | 05.03.2008 | ||
SK | 05.03.2008 | ||
BE | 30.04.2008 | ||
MC | 30.04.2008 | ||
SE | 05.06.2008 | ||
ES | 16.06.2008 | ||
IS | 05.07.2008 | ||
PT | 05.08.2008 | ||
Former [2009/12] | DK | 05.03.2008 | |
EE | 05.03.2008 | ||
FI | 05.03.2008 | ||
IE | 05.03.2008 | ||
LT | 05.03.2008 | ||
LV | 05.03.2008 | ||
NL | 05.03.2008 | ||
PL | 05.03.2008 | ||
RO | 05.03.2008 | ||
SI | 05.03.2008 | ||
SK | 05.03.2008 | ||
MC | 30.04.2008 | ||
SE | 05.06.2008 | ||
ES | 16.06.2008 | ||
IS | 05.07.2008 | ||
PT | 05.08.2008 | ||
Former [2009/09] | DK | 05.03.2008 | |
EE | 05.03.2008 | ||
FI | 05.03.2008 | ||
IE | 05.03.2008 | ||
LV | 05.03.2008 | ||
NL | 05.03.2008 | ||
PL | 05.03.2008 | ||
RO | 05.03.2008 | ||
SI | 05.03.2008 | ||
SK | 05.03.2008 | ||
MC | 30.04.2008 | ||
SE | 05.06.2008 | ||
ES | 16.06.2008 | ||
IS | 05.07.2008 | ||
PT | 05.08.2008 | ||
Former [2009/08] | DK | 05.03.2008 | |
FI | 05.03.2008 | ||
IE | 05.03.2008 | ||
LV | 05.03.2008 | ||
NL | 05.03.2008 | ||
PL | 05.03.2008 | ||
RO | 05.03.2008 | ||
SI | 05.03.2008 | ||
SK | 05.03.2008 | ||
MC | 30.04.2008 | ||
SE | 05.06.2008 | ||
ES | 16.06.2008 | ||
IS | 05.07.2008 | ||
PT | 05.08.2008 | ||
Former [2009/05] | FI | 05.03.2008 | |
LV | 05.03.2008 | ||
NL | 05.03.2008 | ||
PL | 05.03.2008 | ||
RO | 05.03.2008 | ||
SI | 05.03.2008 | ||
SK | 05.03.2008 | ||
MC | 30.04.2008 | ||
SE | 05.06.2008 | ||
ES | 16.06.2008 | ||
IS | 05.07.2008 | ||
PT | 05.08.2008 | ||
Former [2008/49] | FI | 05.03.2008 | |
LV | 05.03.2008 | ||
NL | 05.03.2008 | ||
PL | 05.03.2008 | ||
RO | 05.03.2008 | ||
SI | 05.03.2008 | ||
SK | 05.03.2008 | ||
MC | 30.04.2008 | ||
SE | 05.06.2008 | ||
ES | 16.06.2008 | ||
PT | 05.08.2008 | ||
Former [2008/46] | FI | 05.03.2008 | |
LV | 05.03.2008 | ||
PL | 05.03.2008 | ||
SI | 05.03.2008 | ||
SE | 05.06.2008 | ||
ES | 16.06.2008 | ||
Former [2008/44] | FI | 05.03.2008 | |
LV | 05.03.2008 | ||
PL | 05.03.2008 | ||
SI | 05.03.2008 | ||
ES | 16.06.2008 | ||
Former [2008/43] | FI | 05.03.2008 | |
PL | 05.03.2008 | ||
ES | 16.06.2008 | ||
Former [2008/36] | FI | 05.03.2008 | |
ES | 16.06.2008 | Documents cited: | Search | [DA]US4017168 (BROWN GARRETT W); | [DA]US4156512 (BROWN GARRETT W [US]); | [DA]US4208028 (BROWN GARRETT [US], et al); | [DA]US4394075 (BROWN GARRETT [US], et al); | [DA]DE3416823 (KREUZER FRIEDHELM); | [DA]DE8316534U (KREUZER, FRIEDHELM, 8000 MUENCHEN, DE); | [A]US4523732 (BIBER KLAUS [DE], et al) [A] 1-5,9-11 * column 3, line 4 - line 47; figures 3,4 *; | [Y]GB2230946 (MICROCOMPUTER ACCESSORIES INC [US]) [Y] 1-7,9,10,12,13 * page 9, line 5 - page 14, line 14; figures 2,8,10-12 *; | [X]WO9525927 (BROWN GARRETT W [US]) [X] 1-5,9,11-13 * page 27, line 11 - page 30, line 7; figures 3,5,12,13 *; | [YD]US6030130 (PADDOCK GEORGE K [US], et al) [YD] 1-7,9,10,12,13 * column 1, line 22 - column 2, line 7; figures 1,2 *; | [PA]EP1586925 (LEICA MICROSYSTEMS SCHWEIZ AG [CH]) [PA] 1-6,9,10 * paragraph [0024] - paragraph [0028]; figures 1,3-5 * | by applicant | US4017168 | US4156512 | US4208028 | US4394075 | DE3416823 | DE8316534U | US6030130 |