EP1681286 - Benzoxazole compounds, process for producing the same, and herbicides [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 08.05.2009 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.05.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 10.06.2009 [2009/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KYOYU AGRI CO., LTD. 14-10, Futago 6-chome, Takatsu-ku, Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa 213-0002 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2006/44] | For all designated states KYOYU AGRI CO., LTD 14-10 Futago 6 chome, Takatsu-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa 213-0002 / JP | ||
Former [2006/29] | For all designated states Ube Industries, Ltd. 1978-96, Oaza Kogushi Ube-shi Yamaguchi 755-8633 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Fukuda, Shohei Ube Research Lab., Ube Ind., Ltd. 1978-5 Oaza Kogushi Ube-shi Yamaguchi 755-8633 / JP | 02 /
Nakamura, Akira Ube Research Lab., Ube Ind., Ltd. 1978-5 Oaza Kogushi Ube-shi Yamaguchi 755-8633 / JP | 03 /
Shimizu, Motohisa Ube Research Lab., Ube Ind., Ltd. 1978-5 Oaza Kogushi Ube-shi Yamaguchi 755-8633 / JP | 04 /
Okada, Tatsuo Ube Research Lab., Ube Ind., Ltd. 1978-5 Oaza Kogushi Ube-shi Yamaguchi 755-8633 / JP | 05 /
Oohida, Satoshi Ube Research Lab., Ube Ind., Ltd. 1978-5 Oaza Kogushi Ube-shi Yamaguchi 755-8633 / JP | 06 /
Asahara, Takehiko Ube Research Lab., Ube Ind., Ltd. 1978-5 Oaza Kogushi Ube-shi Yamaguchi 755-8633 / JP | [2006/42] |
Former [2006/29] | 01 /
Fukuda, Shoei Ube Research Lab., Ube Ind., Ltd. 1978-5 Oaza Kogushi Ube-shi Yamaguchi 755-8633 / JP | ||
02 /
Nakamura, Akira Ube Research Lab., Ube Ind., Ltd. 1978-5 Oaza Kogushi Ube-shi Yamaguchi 755-8633 / JP | |||
03 /
Shimizu, Motohisa Ube Research Lab., Ube Ind., Ltd. 1978-5 Oaza Kogushi Ube-shi Yamaguchi 755-8633 / JP | |||
04 /
Okada, Tatsuo Ube Research Lab., Ube Ind., Ltd. 1978-5 Oaza Kogushi Ube-shi Yamaguchi 755-8633 / JP | |||
05 /
Oohida, Satoshi Ube Research Lab., Ube Ind., Ltd. 1978-5 Oaza Kogushi Ube-shi Yamaguchi 755-8633 / JP | |||
06 /
Asahara, Takehiko Ube Research Lab., Ube Ind., Ltd. 1978-5 Oaza Kogushi Ube-shi Yamaguchi 755-8633 / JP | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2006/29] | HOFFMANN EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 06007593.4 | 04.07.2001 | [2006/29] | Priority number, date | JP20000202687 | 04.07.2000 Original published format: JP 2000202687 | JP20000272759 | 08.09.2000 Original published format: JP 2000272759 | JP20000277674 | 13.09.2000 Original published format: JP 2000277674 | [2006/29] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1681286 | Date: | 19.07.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/29] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.06.2006 | Classification | IPC: | C07D263/56, C07D413/04, C07D413/12, C07D413/14, C07D417/12, C07D417/14, A01N43/76, A01N43/78, A01N43/80, A01N43/82, A01P13/00 | [2006/29] | CPC: |
C07D417/12 (EP,US);
A01N43/76 (EP,US);
A01N43/78 (EP,US);
A01N43/80 (EP,US);
A01N43/82 (EP,US);
C07D263/56 (EP,US);
C07D413/04 (EP,US);
C07D413/12 (EP,US);
C07D413/14 (EP,US);
C07D417/14 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2006/29] | Title | German: | Benzoxazol-Derivate, Verfahren zu ihrer Herstellung und Herbizide | [2006/29] | English: | Benzoxazole compounds, process for producing the same, and herbicides | [2006/29] | French: | Composes de benzoxazole, procede d'elaboration de ceux-ci et herbicides | [2006/29] | Examination procedure | 31.10.2006 | Examination requested [2006/50] | 01.12.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.04.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.08.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.12.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2009/24] | 21.01.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2009/24] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP01947807.2 / EP1302466 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.05.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.05.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.05.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.05.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 17.07.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 25.07.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US4576629 (MORLAND ROBERT B [US], et al) [X] 1-6 * column 1, line 5 - line 8; claim 1; compound 68 *; | [X]WO9729095 (HOECHST SCHERING AGREVO GMBH [DE]) [X] 1-6 * page 1; claim 1; table 16 *; | [X] - BHALLA M ET AL, "Synthesis and pharmacological evaluation of 1,2,4-triazine and its congeners", BOLLETTINO CHIMICO FARMACEUTICO, SOCIETA EDITORIALE FARMACEUTICA, MILANO, IT, (1995), vol. 134, no. 1, ISSN 0006-6648, pages 9 - 15, XP002955688 [X] 1 * compounds IIIC, 3C * | [X] - BHALLA, M. ET AL, "Synthesis of 1,3,4-thiadiazole[3,2,-a]-s-triazine-5,7-dithione derivatives and their pharmacological evaluation", BOLLETTINO CHIMICO FARMACEUTICO , 133(8), 521-6 CODEN: BCFAAI; ISSN: 0006-6648, (1994), XP009066901 [X] 1 * compounds 3C, 5C * | by applicant | DE2123705 | US3780054 | DE2558117 | EP0220025 | EP0241053 | EP0255047 | EP0419410 | WO9323402 | JPH1045735 | JPH10139767 | - HETEROCYCLE, (1995), vol. 41, pages 477 - 485 | - SYNTHETIC COMMU- NICATION, (1989), vol. 19, pages 2921 - 2924 | - JOURNAL OF MEDICINAL CHEMISTRY, (1987), vol. 30, pages 400 - 405 | - JOURNAL OF MEDICINAL CHEMISTRY, (1956), pages 1480 - 1498 | - JOURNAL OF MEDICINAL CHEMISTRY, (1985), pages 601 - 606 | - JOURNAL OF MEDICINAL CHEMISTRY, (1989), pages 1147 - 1156 |